SemiLED Innovations LLC v. Menard, Inc.
Plaintiff: SemiLED Innovations LLC
Defendant: Menard, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2024cv00099
Filed: February 14, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #32 Motion to Stay Deadlines Pending Final Settlement Agreement. All existing deadlines and hearing dates are struck. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/9/2024. (jls)
April 9, 2024 Filing 32 Joint Motion to Stay Deadlines Pending Final Settlement Agreement by Defendant Menard, Inc.. Response due 4/16/2024. (Meyer, Charles)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #28 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys W. Anthony Andrews and John Edward Motylinski withdrawn from the case. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 03/12/2024. (acd)
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond is extended to April 10, 2024. The telephonic preliminary pretrial conference is moved to April 24, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/5/2024. (jls)
March 5, 2024 Filing 29 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer and Motion to Reschedule the Preliminary Pretrial Conference by Defendant Menard, Inc. Response due 3/12/2024. (Meyer, Charles) Modified on 3/5/2024. (lak)
February 16, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines: Menard, Inc. answer due 3/11/2024. See Minute Entry from ILND, dkt. #21 . (jat)
February 14, 2024 Filing 28 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Charles Johnson Meyer re: Defendant Menard, Inc. (Meyer, Charles) Modified on 2/14/2024: Not signed by counsel who want to withdraw. (lak)
February 14, 2024 Filing 27 Notice of Appearance filed by Charles Johnson Meyer for Defendant Menard, Inc.. (Meyer, Charles)
February 14, 2024 Filing 26 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:23-cv-16737. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (lak)
February 14, 2024 Filing 25 TRANSFERRED to the USDC Western District of Wisconsin the electronic record. (jj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/14/2024.]
February 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: The parties' stipulated request to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin #23 is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action forthwith to the United States District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin. Venue in the Western District of Wisconsin is proper under 28 U.S.C. 1400(b) because defendant resides in that district. See TC Heartland LLC v. Kraft Foods Group Brands LLC, 581 U.S. 258, 26869 (2017). Based on the parties' agreement, the court concludes that venue for this action is more appropriate in the Western District of Wisconsin. Accordingly, in the interests of justice, this action is hereby transferred forthwith to the United States District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) for all further proceedings. Defendant's previously filed motion to transfer #15 is denied as moot. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 2/14/2024. Mailed notice.(jj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/14/2024.]
February 14, 2024 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
February 14, 2024 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lak)
February 14, 2024 Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 3/13/2024 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (lak)
February 8, 2024 Filing 23 MOTION by Plaintiff SemiLED Innovations LLC to transfer case to Western District of Wisconsin (Stipulated) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Key, Cecil) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/14/2024.]
January 30, 2024 Filing 22 STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by SemiLED Innovations LLC (Bennett, David) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/14/2024.]
January 29, 2024 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The court has reviewed the parties' status report #18 , which proposes a briefing schedule on defendant's motion to transfer venue #15 . The court adopts the parties' proposed briefing schedule. Plaintiff's response should by filed by 2/16/2024. Defendant's reply should be filed by 2/23/2024. If any party requires an extension of this briefing schedule, that party may file a motion for an extension of time. Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint is extended to 3/11/2024, without objection. (rao, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/14/2024.]
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Cecil E. Key's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of SemiLED Innovations LLC #19 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 1/29/2024: Mailed notice. (rc, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/14/2024.]
January 29, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AILNDC-21574735. (Key, Cecil) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/14/2024.]
January 24, 2024 Filing 18 STATUS Report (Joint) re Dkt. #17 by SemiLED Innovations LLC (Bennett, David) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/14/2024.]
January 19, 2024 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The court has received defendant's motion to transfer venue under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) #15 . By 1/24/2024, the parties should file a joint status report proposing a briefing schedule on the motion. (rao, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/14/2024.]
January 5, 2024 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Andrews, W.) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/14/2024.]
January 5, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendant Menard, Inc. to transfer case /Venue under 28 USC 1404(a) (Andrews, W.) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/14/2024.]
January 4, 2024 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Defendant's agreed motion to extend time to answer or otherwise plead #11 is granted. Defendant to answer or otherwise plead to plaintiff's complaint by 2/7/24. The parties are directed to file the initial joint status report by 2/9/24. (Attachments: #1 Outline for the Initial Joint Status Report) (rao, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/14/2024.]
January 4, 2024 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Menard, Inc. by John Edward Motylinski (Motylinski, John) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/14/2024.]
January 4, 2024 Filing 12 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Menard, Inc. (Andrews, W.) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/14/2024.]
January 4, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant Menard, Inc. for extension of time t Answer or Otherwise Plead (Andrews, W.) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/14/2024.]
January 4, 2024 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Menard, Inc. by W. Anthony Andrews (Andrews, W.) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/14/2024.]
December 28, 2023 Filing 9 ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/28/2023: Mailed notice. (tg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/14/2024.]
December 19, 2023 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The parties are directed to file an initial joint status report by 1/31/2024. (Attachments: #1 Outline for the Initial Joint Status Report) (rao, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/14/2024.]
December 18, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SemiLED Innovations LLC as to Menard, Inc. on 12/18/2023, answer due 1/8/2024. (Kalberg, Steven) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/14/2024.]
December 15, 2023 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Menard, Inc.. (axk, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/14/2024.]
December 14, 2023 Filing 6 MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (gcy, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/14/2024.]
December 14, 2023 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Menard, Inc. (axk, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/14/2024.]
December 13, 2023 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff SemiLED Innovations LLC by Steven G Kalberg (Kalberg, Steven) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/14/2024.]
December 13, 2023 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff SemiLED Innovations LLC by David Randolph Bennett (Bennett, David) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/14/2024.]
December 13, 2023 Filing 3 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by SemiLED Innovations LLC (Bennett, David) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/14/2024.]
December 13, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Bennett, David) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/14/2024.]
December 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed by SemiLED Innovations LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21420123. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 8,963,196, #3 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 9,530,942, #4 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent No. 8,309,971, #5 Exhibit D - U.S. Patent No. 7,128,454)(Bennett, David) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/14/2024.]
December 13, 2023 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 1). (rc, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/14/2024.]
December 13, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (rc, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/14/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SemiLED Innovations LLC v. Menard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SemiLED Innovations LLC
Represented By: Cecil E. Key
Represented By: Steven G Kalberg
Represented By: David Randolph Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menard, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Johnson Meyer
Represented By: W. Anthony Andrews
Represented By: John Edward Motylinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?