Gregerson, Keshia et al v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Keshia Gregerson and Chase Hendrickson
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2024cv00106
Filed: February 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William M Conley
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge William M. Conley attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 6/3/2024. Dispositive Motions due 1/31/2025. Settlement Letters due 5/23/2025. Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures and Motions in Limine due 5/30/2025. Responses due 6/13/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/24/2025 at 02:30 PM. Second Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/8/2025 at 02:30 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 7/14/2025 at 09:00 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/9/2024. (voc)
April 9, 2024 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 4/9/2024 [:10] (cak)
April 8, 2024 Filing 20 Notice by Plaintiffs Keshia Gregerson, Chase Hendrickson re #9 Motion to Compel , #16 Brief in Opposition, #12 Affidavit, #18 Brief in Reply, #15 Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Appraisal and Stay Proceedings, #10 Brief in Opposition, #19 Declaration Attorney Justin F. Wallace Letter to Judge re Auto Owners' Motion to Compel Appraisal and Stay Proceedings. (Wallace, Justin)
April 5, 2024 Filing 19 Declaration of Travis Heiting re #9 Motion to Compel (Attachments: #1 Spring Brook Construction) (Ridley, Terence) Modified on 4/8/2024: Filed using Declaration (not related to a motion). (lak)
April 5, 2024 Filing 18 Brief in Reply by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company in Support of #9 Motion to Compel Appraisal and Stay Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Disregard, #2 Exhibit 2 - Cert Copy of Policy) (Ridley, Terence) Modified on 4/5/2024. (lak)
April 4, 2024 Filing 17 Discovery Plan (Ridley, Terence)
March 27, 2024 Filing 16 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiffs Keshia Gregerson, Chase Hendrickson re: #15 Motion for Leave to File filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company (Wallace, Justin)
March 27, 2024 Filing 15 Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Appraisal and Stay Proceedings by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Ridley, Terence)
March 22, 2024 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance Of Counsel filed by Linda Knight for Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Knight, Linda)
March 22, 2024 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance Of Counsel filed by Terence M. Ridley for Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Ridley, Terence)
March 22, 2024 Filing 12 Affidavit of Justin F. Wallace filed by Plaintiffs Keshia Gregerson, Chase Hendrickson re: #9 Motion to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Fire Damage Photo, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Fire Damage Photo, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Spring Brook Construction Letter dated August 8, 2023, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Email Correspondence with Travis Heiting dated January 10, 2024) (Wallace, Justin)
March 21, 2024 Filing 11 Disregard. Modified on 3/21/2024. (lak)
March 21, 2024 Filing 10 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiffs Keshia Gregerson, Chase Hendrickson re: #9 Motion to Compel filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company (Wallace, Justin)
March 14, 2024 Filing 9 Motion to Compel by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company. Response due 3/21/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Portion of Policy with Appraisal Clause, #2 Exhibit Demand Letter) (Pliner, David)
March 12, 2024 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2024 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (voc)
March 8, 2024 Filing 8 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Portion of Policy with Appraisal Clause, #2 Exhibit Demand Letter) (Pliner, David)
March 7, 2024 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Keshia Gregerson, Chase Hendrickson. (Wallace, Justin)
February 23, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Mark T Budzinski for Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Budzinski, Mark)
February 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER accepting #4 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer, extension granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 02/22/2024. (rks)
February 21, 2024 Filing 4 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Pliner, David)
February 21, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Pliner, David)
February 21, 2024 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
February 21, 2024 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lak)
February 16, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Pliner, David)
February 16, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Columbia County Circuit Court, case number 24-cv-14. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number 2386), filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Disregard) (Pliner, David) Modified on 2/16/2024: Deleted duplicate case 24cv107. Deleted addresses of all parties. Deleted duplicate defendants from database. Corrected stats. Receipt number to be verified. (lak) Modified on 2/21/2024: Information sent for receipting 2/20/2024. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregerson, Keshia et al v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keshia Gregerson
Represented By: Justin F. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chase Hendrickson
Represented By: Justin F. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: David J. Pliner
Represented By: Linda Knight
Represented By: Mark T Budzinski
Represented By: Terence M. Ridley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?