City of Wausau v. AGC Chemicals Americas Inc. et al
Plaintiff: City of Wausau
Defendant: Executive Risk Indemnity Inc., Goodrich & Watson Insurers, Inc., Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company, AGC Chemicals Americas Inc., Amerex Corporation, Arkema Inc., Archroma U.S., Inc., BASF Corporation, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, ChemDesign Products Inc., ChemGuard Inc., Clariant Corporation, Deepwater Chemicals, Inc., Dynax Corporation, Nation Ford Chemical Company, Tyco Fire Products LP, ACE American Insurance Company, Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Aetna Casualty and Surety Company, Affiliated FM Insurance Company, Agricultural Ins. Co. doing business as American Agricultural Insurance Company, AIG Specialty Insurance Company doing business as Chartis Specialty Insurance Company, AIG Specialty Insurance Group, Allianz Global Risk US Insurance Company, Allied World National Assurance Company, Alterra America Insurance Company, American Centennial Insurance Company, American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company, American Home Assurance Company, American Reinsurance Company, American Zurich Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Aspen American Insurance Company, Berkley National Insurance Company, City Insurance Company, Colony Insurance Company, Columbia Casualty Company, Continental Casualty Company, Continental Insurance Company, Employers Mutual Casualty Company, Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company, Endurance Risk Solutions Assurance Co., American Excess Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, First State Insurance Company, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Gibraltar Insurance Company, Insco Insurance Group, Granite State Insurance Company, Great American E&S Insurance Company, Great American Spirit Insurance Company, Harbor Insurance Company, Illinois Union Insurance Company, Insurance Company of North America, Interstate Fire & Casualty Company, TIG Specialty Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Underwriters, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation, Lumbermens Mutual Casualty Company, National Fire & Marine Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA, New England Insurance Company, New Hampshire Insurance Company, North American Capacity Insurance Company, Oakwood Insurance Company, Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, Old Republic Risk Management, Inc., RSUI Indemnity Company, Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, The Home Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company, Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc., John Doe 1-20 and Agricultural Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2024cv00170
Filed: March 19, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Anita M Boor
Referring Judge: William M Conley
2 Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2024 Filing 44 Motion to Withdraw Oliver M. Sherman's Appearance as Counsel of Record by Defendants AIG Specialty Insurance Company, AIG Specialty Insurance Group, American Home Assurance Company, Granite State Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA, New Hampshire Insurance Company. Response due 5/24/2024. (Sherman, Oliver)
May 7, 2024 Judge update in case. Case now assigned to Magistrate Judge Anita M. Boor. Case no longer assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (sdl)
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Joint Motion to Stay #42 is granted. Proceedings in this court are STAYED pending a transfer decision by the JPMDL. The parties must promptly apprise this court of any action relevant to the stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/18/24. (jat)
April 17, 2024 Filing 42 Joint Motion to Stay Pending Transfer Decision by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Defendants ChemGuard Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Hawley, Timothy)
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #40 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/15/24. (jat)
April 15, 2024 Filing 40 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead by Defendant Arch Insurance Company. (Gramke, Megan)
April 15, 2024 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Arch Insurance Company. (Gramke, Megan)
April 15, 2024 Filing 38 Notice of Appearance filed by Megan Gramke for Defendant Arch Insurance Company. (Gramke, Megan)
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** #36 Stipulation accepted. The Clerk of Court is directed to amend the caption as requested. The law firm of Bell, Moore & Richter, S.C. is withdrawn from this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/12/2024. (voc)
April 12, 2024 Filing 36 Stipulation to Amend Caption and Complaint to Name Correct Entity by Defendant Agricultural Ins. Co.. (Mullen, Melita)
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #33 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Insurers answer due 5/15/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/5/24. (jat)
April 5, 2024 Filing 34 Notice of Appearance filed by Charles James Louis Jaskolski, II for Defendant Colony Insurance Company. (Jaskolski, Charles)
April 4, 2024 Filing 33 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Leavell, Jeffrey)
April 4, 2024 Filing 32 Notice of Appearance filed by Stacy Ann Broman for Defendant Colony Insurance Company. (Broman, Stacy)
April 3, 2024 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance filed by Sheila M. Sullivan for Defendant Agricultural Ins. Co.. (Sullivan, Sheila)
April 3, 2024 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant North American Capacity Insurance Company. (Blume, Benjamin)
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Agricultural Ins. Co. answer due 4/19/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/2/24. (jat)
April 2, 2024 Filing 28 Affidavit of Melita M. Mullen filed by Defendant Agricultural Ins. Co. re: #27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (Mullen, Melita)
April 2, 2024 Filing 27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Agricultural Ins. Co.. Response due 4/9/2024. (Mullen, Melita)
April 2, 2024 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance filed by Melita M. Mullen for Defendant Agricultural Ins. Co.. (Mullen, Melita)
April 1, 2024 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance filed by Elizabeth Ellison Fisher for Defendant Allied World National Assurance Company. (Fisher, Elizabeth)
April 1, 2024 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance filed by Brian C. Coffey for Defendants ACE American Insurance Company, Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, Illinois Union Insurance Company, Insurance Company of North America, Oakwood Insurance Company, Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Coffey, Brian)
April 1, 2024 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance filed by Jan Michael Michaels for Defendants Columbia Casualty Company, Continental Casualty Company, Continental Insurance Company. (Michaels, Jan)
March 29, 2024 Filing 22 Disregard; to be refiled. (jef).
March 29, 2024 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance filed by Richard A. Simpson for Defendant Allied World National Assurance Company. (Simpson, Richard)
March 29, 2024 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance filed by Jeff J Bowen for Defendant Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. (Bowen, Jeff)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #18 Motion to Admit Andrew W. Croner Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/29/2024. (lak)
March 28, 2024 Filing 18 Motion to Admit Andrew W. Croner Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3399949.) by Plaintiff City of Wausau. (Croner, Andrew)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #16 Motion to Admit Stephen P. Brown Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/28/2024. (lak)
March 27, 2024 Filing 16 Motion to Admit Stephen P. Brown Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3399056.) by Defendants Aetna Casualty and Surety Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company. (Brown, Stephen)
March 26, 2024 Filing 15 Affidavit of Devon Neely filed by Defendant Gibraltar Insurance Company re: #13 Motion to Dismiss (Goodman, Christopher)
March 26, 2024 Filing 14 Brief in Support of #13 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Gibraltar Insurance Company (Goodman, Christopher)
March 26, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendant Gibraltar Insurance Company. Brief in Opposition due 4/16/2024. Brief in Reply due 4/26/2024. (Goodman, Christopher)
March 26, 2024 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Karen Andersen for Defendant North American Capacity Insurance Company. (Andersen, Karen)
March 26, 2024 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Benjamin A. Blume for Defendant North American Capacity Insurance Company. (Blume, Benjamin)
March 25, 2024 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Jeffrey L. Leavell for Defendants Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company, Endurance Risk Solutions Assurance Co. (Leavell, Jeffrey)
March 25, 2024 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Bradford S. Moyer for Defendant Interstate Fire & Casualty Company. (Moyer, Bradford)
March 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #7 Motion to Admit Oliver M. Sherman Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 3/21/2024. (lak)
March 21, 2024 Filing 7 Motion to Admit Oliver Sherman Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number AWIWDC-3395915.) by Defendants AIG Specialty Insurance Company, AIG Specialty Insurance Group, American Home Assurance Company, Granite State Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA, New Hampshire Insurance Company. (Sherman, Oliver)
March 21, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Jordan Lowe for Defendant American Reinsurance Company. (Lowe, Jordan)
March 21, 2024 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew Bing for Defendant North American Capacity Insurance Company. (Bing, Matthew)
March 20, 2024 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Kevin Michael St. John for Defendants AIG Specialty Insurance Company, AIG Specialty Insurance Group, American Home Assurance Company, Granite State Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA, New Hampshire Insurance Company. (St. John, Kevin)
March 20, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant National Fire & Marine Insurance Company. (Margulis, Andrew)
March 20, 2024 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Andrew Margulis for Defendant National Fire & Marine Insurance Company. (Margulis, Andrew)
March 19, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marathon County Circuit Court, case number 23 CV 707. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AWIWDC-3394481), filed by ChemGuard Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Circuit Court Case Docket, #3 Exhibit Circuit Court Summons and Complaint) (Hawley, Timothy)
March 19, 2024 Case directly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Multiple related cases currently at MDL. (lak)
March 19, 2024 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Wausau v. AGC Chemicals Americas Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Risk Indemnity Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodrich & Watson Insurers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGC Chemicals Americas Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerex Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkema Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archroma U.S., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ChemDesign Products Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ChemGuard Inc.
Represented By: Timothy A. Hawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clariant Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deepwater Chemicals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynax Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nation Ford Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Represented By: Timothy A. Hawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE American Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian C. Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian C. Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Casualty and Surety Company
Represented By: Stephen P. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affiliated FM Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agricultural Ins. Co. doing business as American Agricultural Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Specialty Insurance Company doing business as Chartis Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Oliver Sherman
Represented By: Kevin Michael St. John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Specialty Insurance Group
Represented By: Oliver Sherman
Represented By: Kevin Michael St. John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz Global Risk US Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied World National Assurance Company
Represented By: Elizabeth Ellison Fisher
Represented By: Richard A. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alterra America Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Centennial Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Assurance Company
Represented By: Oliver Sherman
Represented By: Kevin Michael St. John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Reinsurance Company
Represented By: Jordan Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Zurich Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company
Represented By: Megan Gramke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkley National Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colony Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles James Louis Jaskolski, II
Represented By: Stacy Ann Broman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Casualty Company
Represented By: Jan Michael Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: Jan Michael Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Insurance Company
Represented By: Jan Michael Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employers Mutual Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Leavell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endurance Risk Solutions Assurance Co.
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Leavell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Excess Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian C. Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First State Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gibraltar Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher Lawrence Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insco Insurance Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite State Insurance Company
Represented By: Oliver Sherman
Represented By: Kevin Michael St. John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American E&S Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Spirit Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Union Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian C. Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Brian C. Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Bradford S. Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIG Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Oliver Sherman
Represented By: Kevin Michael St. John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Insurance Underwriters, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lumbermens Mutual Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew Margulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA
Represented By: Oliver Sherman
Represented By: Kevin Michael St. John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New England Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Hampshire Insurance Company
Represented By: Oliver Sherman
Represented By: Kevin Michael St. John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Capacity Insurance Company
Represented By: Benjamin A. Blume
Represented By: Karen Andersen
Represented By: Matthew Bing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakwood Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian C. Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Risk Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSUI Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
Represented By: Jeff J Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Home Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Stephen P. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian C. Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XL Insurance America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agricultural Insurance Company
Represented By: Annette Rolain
Represented By: James Pio Ruggeri
Represented By: Melita M. Mullen
Represented By: Sheila M. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Wausau
Represented By: Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By: Andrew W. Croner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?