United States of America v. $110,147.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $110,147.00 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 3:2024cv00218
Filed: April 5, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Anita M Boor
Referring Judge: William M Conley
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 0881 Forfeiture Property - Currency
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2024 Judge update in case. Case now assigned to Magistrate Judge Anita M. Boor. Case no longer assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (sdl)
April 9, 2024 Filing 6 Warrant for Arrest issued. (rks)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/9/2024. (rks)
April 9, 2024 Filing 4 Brief in Support of #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Plaintiff United States of America (Luehring, Heidi)
April 9, 2024 Filing 3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 proposed Warrant of Arrest) (Luehring, Heidi)
April 8, 2024 Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
April 8, 2024 Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lak)
April 5, 2024 Filing 2 Declaration of Joshua Rider re #1 Complaint (Luehring, Heidi)
April 5, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $110,147.00 in U.S. Currency., filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Luehring, Heidi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $110,147.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Heidi Luehring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $110,147.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?