Champa, Kenneth v. Glenn's Market and Catering, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kenneth S. Champa
Defendant: Glenn's Market and Catering, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2024cv00249
Filed: April 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Anita M Boor
Referring Judge: Stephen L Crocker
2 Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Plaintiff has filed a motion to correct the dispositive motions briefing schedule in the court's preliminary pretrial conference order. Dkt. #11 . The motion is GRANTED. Responses to dispositive motions will be due within 30 days of service of the motion and any reply will be due within 15 days of service of the response. The parties may not modify this schedule without leave of court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anita M. Boor on 6/13/2024. (lam)
June 12, 2024 Filing 11 Motion to Amend/Correct #10 Pretrial Conference Order,, by Plaintiff Kenneth S. Champa. Response due 6/20/2024. (Scarr, Amy)
June 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Pretrial Conference Order - # Preliminary Pretrial Packet in cases assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson attached. Amendments to Pleadings due 6/26/2024. Dispositive Motions due 4/1/2025. Settlement Letters due 8/1/2025. Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures and Motions in Limine due 8/8/2025. Responses due 8/22/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/3/2025 at 02:30 PM. Second Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2025 at 02:30 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 9/15/2025 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anita M. Boor on 6/12/2024. (jls)
May 29, 2024 Filing 9 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (McCann, Kayla)
May 15, 2024 Set Telephone Pretrial or Status Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 6/12/2024 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Anita M. Boor. Please call (669) 254-5252 and enter meeting ID 161 2455 6623 when prompted. Wait to be admitted into the conference. The parties are advised that a Rule 26(f) conference shall occur not less than two weeks before the preliminary pretrial conference, and that the parties' report or reports must be filed not less than one week before the preliminary pretrial conference.[#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (lam)
May 13, 2024 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Elizabeth Anne Odian for Defendant Glenn's Market and Catering, Inc.. (Odian, Elizabeth)
May 13, 2024 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Glenn's Market and Catering, Inc.. (McCann, Kayla)
May 13, 2024 Filing 6 ANSWER by Defendant Glenn's Market and Catering, Inc.. (McCann, Kayla)
May 13, 2024 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Kayla A. McCann for Defendant Glenn's Market and Catering, Inc.. (McCann, Kayla)
May 13, 2024 Judge update in case. Case randomly reassigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Anita M. Boor. (lak)
April 23, 2024 Filing 4 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Glenn's Market and Catering, Inc. served on 4/22/2024, answer due 5/13/2024. (Scarr, Amy)
April 16, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Glenn's Market and Catering, Inc. (lak)
April 16, 2024 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff Kenneth S. Champa. (Scarr, Amy)
April 16, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Glenn's Market and Catering, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AWIWDC-3410575.), filed by Kenneth S. Champa. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Scarr, Amy)
April 16, 2024 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (lak)
April 16, 2024 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Champa, Kenneth v. Glenn's Market and Catering, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth S. Champa
Represented By: Amy F. Scarr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn's Market and Catering, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Odian
Represented By: Kayla A. McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?