Madison Pizza LLC et al v. ASR Group International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Madison Pizza LLC, RRG Scottsdale Pizza LLC, Madison Pizza LLC doing business as Rosati's of Madison (East) and RRG Scottsdale Pizza LLC doing business as Rosati's of Scottsdale
Defendant: ASR Group International, Inc., American Sugar Refining, Inc., Domino Foods, Inc., United Sugar Producers & Refiners Cooperative, Michigan Sugar Company, Cargill, Inc., Commodity Information, Inc., Richard Wistisen and United Sugars Corporation
Case Number: 3:2024cv00257
Filed: April 18, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Anita M Boor
Referring Judge: James D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **The plaintiffs and those defendants who have appeared in this case jointly move to stay proceedings in this case because plaintiffs in related cases in other jurisdictions have jointly filed a motion with the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation to transfer and centralize the pending related actions. Dkt. #10 . The parties seek to postpone the deadline for defendants to file their answers in this case pending the Panel's ruling on the motion to transfer, which is set for a hearing on May 30. See MDL No. 3110, Dkt. 7. The parties' stipulated motion, Dkt. 10, is GRANTED. This case is STAYED until the Panel rules on the pending motion to transfer, and the parties are directed to promptly notify the court when the Panel issues its ruling. If any defendant answers, moves, or otherwise pleads in a related case pending in any District, that defendant must concurrently answer, move, or otherwise plead in this case. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 5/15/2024. (jls)
May 15, 2024 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Cargill, Inc.. (Famouri, Farah)
May 14, 2024 Filing 10 Joint Stipulated Motion to Postpone Defendants' Responses to Complaint Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Decision on Motion to Transfer by Defendant Cargill, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Famouri, Farah) Modified on 5/14/2024. (lak)
May 14, 2024 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Farah N Famouri for Defendant Cargill, Inc.. (Famouri, Farah)
May 13, 2024 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Michigan Sugar Company. (Jacobsen, Vanessa)
May 13, 2024 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Vanessa G. Jacobsen for Defendant Michigan Sugar Company. (Jacobsen, Vanessa)
May 13, 2024 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants ASR Group International, Inc., American Sugar Refining, Inc., Domino Foods, Inc.. (Hanson, Andre)
May 13, 2024 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Andre Hanson for Defendants ASR Group International, Inc., American Sugar Refining, Inc., Domino Foods, Inc.. (Hanson, Andre)
May 7, 2024 Judge update in case. Case now assigned to Magistrate Judge Anita M. Boor. Case no longer assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (sdl)
April 19, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (lak)
April 19, 2024 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (lak)
April 19, 2024 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (lak)
April 18, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff RRG Scottsdale Pizza LLC. (Solheim, Mark)
April 18, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Madison Pizza LLC. (Solheim, Mark)
April 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AWIWDC-3411921.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - ASR Group International, Inc., #3 Summons - American Sugar Refining, Inc., #4 Summons - Domino Foods, Inc., #5 Summons - United Sugar Producers & Refiners Cooperative, #6 Summons - Michigan Sugar Company, #7 Summons - Cargill, Inc., #8 Summons - Commodity Information, Inc., #9 Summons - Richard Wistisen) (Solheim, Mark) Modified on 4/19/2024: Correctly added alias information. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madison Pizza LLC et al v. ASR Group International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madison Pizza LLC
Represented By: Mark Solheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RRG Scottsdale Pizza LLC
Represented By: Mark Solheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madison Pizza LLC doing business as Rosati's of Madison (East)
Represented By: Mark Solheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RRG Scottsdale Pizza LLC doing business as Rosati's of Scottsdale
Represented By: Mark Solheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASR Group International, Inc.
Represented By: Andre Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Sugar Refining, Inc.
Represented By: Andre Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domino Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Andre Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Sugar Producers & Refiners Cooperative
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Sugar Company
Represented By: Vanessa G. Jacobsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill, Inc.
Represented By: Farah N Famouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commodity Information, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Wistisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Sugars Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?