White, Nathan v. Moran, Michael et al
Plaintiff: Nathan Alexander White
Defendant: Michael K. Moran and Amanda J. Ley
Case Number: 3:2024cv00262
Filed: April 22, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin
Office: Madison Office
Presiding Judge: Anita M Boor
Referring Judge: William M Conley
2 Judge: Stephen L Crocker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The court is currently reviewing this case for potential jurisdictional issues. The clerk of court is directed not to issue summons until this court enters an order confirming that subject matter jurisdiction exists. If summonses are issued, plaintiff's deadline for service will be extended accordingly. See #Administrative Order 421. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 5/9/2024. (rks),(ps)
May 9, 2024 Filing fee received : $405.00, receipt number 2771. (rks),(ps)
May 7, 2024 Judge update in case. Case now assigned to Magistrate Judge Anita M. Boor. Case no longer assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (sdl),(ps)
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 ifp request: Full $405 filing fee due 5/13/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew R. Wiseman on 4/22/2024. (jef),(ps)
April 22, 2024 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Nathan Alexander White. (jef),(ps)
April 22, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Nathan Alexander White. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White, Nathan v. Moran, Michael et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Alexander White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael K. Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda J. Ley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?