Young v. Wyoming Attorney General
Plaintiff: Huguette Nicole Young
Defendant: Wyoming Attorney General and Bridget Hill
Case Number: 0:2020cv00203
Filed: November 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal dismissing #1 Complaint without prejudice. Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff on this date via U.S. mail.(Court Staff, sal)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Denying as Moot #3 Motion for Email Filing and Notification by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. Copy of order along with Pro Se Electronic Notification Registration Form sent to Plaintiff via US Mail on November 5, 2020.(Court Staff, szf)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal denying #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #2 Motion for Hearing - Dispositive. Plaintiff shall have until 11/25/2020 to file a completed application to proceed in forma pauperis. If Plaintiff does not file such an application by the deadline, this case will be subject to dismissal without prejudice without further notice. Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff on this date via U.S. mail.(Court Staff, sal)
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff Huguette Nicole Young. (Court Staff, sal)
November 3, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. "MOTION for Email Filing and Notification" filed by Plaintiff Huguette Nicole Young. (Court Staff, sal)
November 3, 2020 Filing 2 "Motion for a Speedy Hearing under Rule 57 of Fed.R.Civ.P." re: #1 MOTION for Order filed by Plaintiff Huguette Nicole Young. (Court Staff, sal)
November 3, 2020 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND EMERGENCY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF (no summons issued)(Filing fee ($400) NOT paid) filed by Huguette Nicole Young. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 envelope) (Court Staff, sal) Modified on 11/3/2020 (Court Staff, sal).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Wyoming Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyoming Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridget Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huguette Nicole Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?