Northern Arapaho Tribe v. United States Department of Health and Human Services Acting Secretary et al
Plaintiff: Northern Arapaho Tribe
Defendant: US Department of Health and Human Services Acting Secretary, Indian Health Service Acting Director, Elizabeth Fowler, United States of America, Norris Cochran and United States Department of Health and Human Services Acting Secretary
Case Number: 0:2021cv00037
Filed: February 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Northern Arapaho Tribe. United States Department of Health and Human Services Acting Secretary served on 3/12/2021, answer due on 5/11/2021. Served through the Norris Cochran, Acting Secretary, U.S. DHHS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Strommer, Geoffrey)
April 8, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Northern Arapaho Tribe. United States of America served on 3/8/2021, answer due on 5/10/2021. Served through the L. Robert Murray, Acting U.S. Attorney, US Attorney's Office. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Strommer, Geoffrey)
April 8, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Northern Arapaho Tribe. United States of America served on 3/11/2021, answer due on 5/10/2021. Served through the Robert 'Monty' Wilkinson, Acting Attorney General, US DOJ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Strommer, Geoffrey)
April 8, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Northern Arapaho Tribe. Indian Health Service Acting Director served on 4/7/2021, answer due on 6/7/2021. Served through the ELIZABETH FOWLER, ACTING DIRECTOR, INDIAN HEALTH SERVICE. (Strommer, Geoffrey)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Requiring Status Report by the Honorable Nancy D. Freudenthal. Plaintiff shall file a return or waiver of service, or a Status Report, by 4/30/2021. (Court Staff, sbh)
March 3, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Stephen Osborne on behalf of Northern Arapaho Tribe Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-1902335. (Osborne, Stephen)
March 3, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Geoffrey D. Strommer on behalf of Northern Arapaho Tribe Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-1902324. (Strommer, Geoffrey)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #5 Motion to appear pro hac vice ; granting #6 Motion to appear pro hac vice (Court Staff, stmo) Copy of Order emailed to Geoffrey Strommer and Stephen Osborne on this date. Modified on 2/22/2021 (Court Staff, stmo).
February 22, 2021 Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment. Filing Fee $402 was paid with Receipt Number: CHY034342. (Court Staff, stmo)
February 19, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Stephen D Osborne to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Northern Arapaho Tribe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Court Staff, stmo)
February 19, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Geoffrey D Strommer to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Northern Arapaho Tribe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Court Staff, stmo)
February 19, 2021 Filing 4 Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiff Northern Arapaho Tribe, 3 issued. (Court Staff, stmo)
February 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of complexity by Plaintiff Northern Arapaho Tribe ; this case is non-complex. (Court Staff, stmo)
February 19, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Northern Arapaho Tribe (Court Staff, stmo)
February 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (3 summons(es) issued) Counsel - payment is due within three calendar days. To pay the filing fee with a credit card, please use the event Notice of Civil Filing Fee in CM/ECF or send a check to the Clerk of US District Court, 2120 Capitol Avenue Room 2131, Cheyenne, WY 82001, filed by Northern Arapaho Tribe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, stmo) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/23/2021: #2 MJ Consent) (Court Staff, stmo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northern Arapaho Tribe v. United States Department of Health and Human Services Acting Secretary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Health and Human Services Acting Secretary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian Health Service Acting Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norris Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services Acting Secretary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern Arapaho Tribe
Represented By: Lucas Evan Buckley
Represented By: Geoffrey D. Strommer
Represented By: Stephen Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?