Horizontal Technology Inc v. Prosurv LLC et al
Plaintiff: Horizontal Technology Inc
Defendant: Prosurv LLC and Dominic Whitham
Case Number: 0:2021cv00083
Filed: April 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2021 Filing 19 (TEXT-ONLY) NOTICE of Hearing: BY TELEPHONE - All parties may appear by telephone through the Courts conference call system. Guests call:Toll Free 1-888-398-2342| Access code 3107456. | Join as guest Press # |Security code 1001#. Parties should have their calendars on hand for scheduling. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2021 09:00 AM before Honorable Kelly H Rankin. (Court Staff, szf)
June 14, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO #13 Defendants' Counterclaim by Horizontal Technology Inc. (Griffin, Robert) Modified text on 6/15/2021 (Court Staff, skb).
June 4, 2021 Filing 17 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin. Upon oral motion under Local Rule 6.1, Horizontal Technology Inc answer deadline is extended to 6/14/2021. (Court Staff, smh)
May 19, 2021 Filing 16 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Thomas Pasternak on behalf of Prosurv LLC, Dominic Whitham (Pasternak, Thomas)
May 18, 2021 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Thomas G Pasternak. Receipt CHY034752. (Court Staff, sjk)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas G. Pasternak as Counsel for the Defendants Prosurv, LLC and Dominic Whitham by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin Re: #14 Motion to appear pro hac vice (Court Staff, scat)
May 18, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Thomas G. Pasternak to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendants Prosurv LLC, Dominic Whitham, Counter Claimants Prosurv LLC, Dominic Whitham. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Dyekman, Gregory)
May 17, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Counter-Defendant Horizontal Technology, Inc. by Dominic Whitham, Prosurv LLC. (Dyekman, Gregory) Modified text on 5/19/2021 (Court Staff, skb).
May 11, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory C Dyekman on behalf of Prosurv LLC, Dominic Whitham (Dyekman, Gregory)
May 11, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron John Lyttle on behalf of Prosurv LLC, Dominic Whitham (Lyttle, Aaron)
May 11, 2021 Filing 10 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin. The Court grants Defendants' stipulated request to extend the answer date to June 1, 2021. (Court Staff, sjgc)
May 11, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Horizontal Technology Inc. Prosurv LLC served on 5/1/2021, answer due on 5/24/2021 (Lain, Dallas)
May 11, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Horizontal Technology Inc. Dominic Whitham served on 5/1/2021, answer due on 5/24/2021 (Lain, Dallas)
April 30, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Robert C Griffin on behalf of Horizontal Technology Inc (Griffin, Robert)
April 29, 2021 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Robert C Griffin. Receipt CHY034653. (Court Staff, sjk)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF ROBERT C. GRIFFIN AS COUNSEL FOR THE PLAINTIFF, HORIZONTAL TECHNOLOGY INC. by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin re #5 Motion to appear pro hac vice. (cc: Email to Counsel)(Court Staff, stbd) Modified text on 5/5/2021 (Court Staff, stbd).
April 29, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Robert C. Griffin to appear pro hac vice; Check tendered; filed by Plaintiff Horizontal Technology Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Court Staff, stmo)
April 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of complexity by Plaintiff Horizontal Technology Inc ; this case is non-complex. (Court Staff, stmo)
April 29, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Horizontal Technology Inc. (Court Staff, stmo)
April 29, 2021 Filing 2 Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiff Horizontal Technology Inc, 2 issued. (Court Staff, stmo)
April 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (2 summons(es) issued) with Jury Demand. (Filing fee $402 receipt #CHY034653), filed by Horizontal Technology Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 MJ Consent) (Court Staff, stmo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horizontal Technology Inc v. Prosurv LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horizontal Technology Inc
Represented By: Dallas Lain
Represented By: Robert C Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prosurv LLC
Represented By: Aaron John Lyttle
Represented By: Gregory C Dyekman
Represented By: Thomas Pasternak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominic Whitham
Represented By: Aaron John Lyttle
Represented By: Gregory C Dyekman
Represented By: Thomas Pasternak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?