Collection Professionals Inc v. Gartner
Plaintiff: Collection Professionals Inc
Defendant: Lisa Gartner
Case Number: 0:2021cv00126
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Remanding Case to State Court by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson. The Court has determined subject matter jurisdiction is not present in this case. Case closed. (Order mailed to state court on this date) (Court Staff, sbh)
August 17, 2021 Filing 24 MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Alan B. Johnson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/17/2021 (Court Reporter: Melanie Sonntag) (Court Staff, sbh)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson granting #22 Motion to Continue. Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 8/17/2021 at 9:30 AM BY TELEPHONE from Cheyenne Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 2116) before Honorable Alan B. Johnson. Guests call: Toll Free 866-434-5269 | Access code 1316504# | Join as guest Press # | Security code 1001#. (Court Staff, sbh)
August 12, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin MOTION to Continue (Non-Dispositive) requesting continuance of Case Management Conference filed by Defendant and Counter Claimant Lisa Gartner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Shumaker, Seth) Modified text on 8/12/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
August 12, 2021 Motions No Longer Referred: #22 MOTION to Continue (Non-Dispositive) Case Management Conference (Court Staff, sbh)
August 11, 2021 Filing 21 Amended ANSWER to #9 Amended Counterclaim by Collection Professionals Inc. (Wendtland, Anthony) Modified link and text on 8/11/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
July 22, 2021 Filing 20 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN re #11 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT REPORT by Lisa Gartner. (Shumaker, Seth)
July 22, 2021 Filing 19 Amended CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Collection Professionals Inc. (Wendtland, Anthony)
July 15, 2021 Filing 18 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson. Plaintiff filed its corporate disclosure statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Court hereby orders Plaintiff to clarify whether there is any parent corporation or publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock. (Court Staff, sbh)
July 15, 2021 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Collection Professionals Inc. (Wendtland, Anthony)
July 12, 2021 Filing 16 STATE COURT DOCKET SHEET (Court Staff, sbh)
July 12, 2021 Filing 15 TRANSMITTAL of State Court Record. (Shumaker, Seth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/12/2021: #1 State Docket Sheet) (Court Staff, sbh).
July 12, 2021 Filing 14 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson. Chief Magistrate Judge Rankin previously entered an order giving the removing party ten days from the date of the order to file the state court record. Ten days from the date of that order was July 5, 2021. The removing party has yet to file the state court record. It is hereby ordered the removing party shall file the state court record in accordance with Chief Magistrate Judge Rankin's previous order by July 14, 2021, or provide a status report as to why the deadline cannot be met. (Court Staff, sbh)
July 7, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #9 Amended Counterclaim by Collection Professionals Inc. (Wendtland, Anthony) Modified text on 7/7/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
July 6, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony T Wendtland on behalf of Collection Professionals Inc (Wendtland, Anthony)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT REPORT OF MEETING AND PROPOSED JOINT DISCOVERY AND CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/16/2021 at 1:30 PM BY TELEPHONE from Cheyenne Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 2116) before Honorable Alan B. Johnson. Guests call: Toll Free 866-434-5269 | Access code 1316504# | Join as guest Press # | Security code 1001#. (Court Staff, sbh)
July 1, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY MOTIONS AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS INCLUDING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ANALOGOUS MOTIONS TO DISMISS IN CIVIL CASES by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson (Court Staff, sbh)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. Case reassigned to the Honorable Alan B Johnson as Presiding Judge and the Honorable Kelly H Rankin as Referral Judge for all further proceedings. (Court Staff, sjlg)
June 29, 2021 Filing 9 Amended ANSWER to #2 Complaint, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Counter-Defendant Collection Professionals Inc filed by Lisa Gartner (Court Staff, sbh)
June 29, 2021 Filing 7 DISREGARD. Filing error - incorrect event. Refiled by Clerk. See ECF #9 . AMENDED COMPLAINT Amended Answer and Amended Counterclaim against Defendant Collection Professionals Inc, filed by Lisa Gartner. (Shumaker, Seth) Modified on 6/30/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ON REMOVAL by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. Certified copy sent via US Mail to Clerk of Sheridan County Circuit Court on June 25, 2021. (Court Staff, szf)
June 23, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #4 Counterclaim filed in the Fourth Judicial District on 6/16/2021 by Collection Professionals Inc (Court Staff, stbd) Modified to add link and update text on 6/28/2021 (Court Staff, sjlg).
June 23, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Counter-Defendant Collection Professionals Inc by Lisa Gartner filed in the Fourth Judicial District on 6/4/2021. (Court Staff, stbd)
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed in the Fourth Judicial District on 6/11/2021 by Collection Professionals Inc. Lisa Gartner served on 6/2/2021, answer due on 6/23/2021. (Court Staff, stbd)
June 23, 2021 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed in the Fourth Judicial District on June 11, 2021 by Collection Professionals Inc. (Court Staff, stbd) Modified text on 7/1/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
June 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial District Circuit Court, Sheridan County, CV2021-416 filed by Lisa Gartner (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number CAS002586) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent) (Court Staff, stbd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/23/2021: #3 Proposed Order) (Court Staff, stbd). Modified text on 7/1/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collection Professionals Inc v. Gartner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Gartner
Represented By: Seth Shumaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Collection Professionals Inc
Represented By: Weston Timothy Graham
Represented By: Anthony T Wendtland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?