Cleanview Distribution Group LLC et al v. LGI Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cleanview Distribution Group LLC, Smash Hit Trading LLC and Green Gold Ice LLC
Defendant: LGI Holdings, LLC a Wyoming limited liability company doing business as Alphabet Wholesale, Alphabet Wholesale, Alphabet Wholesale, Inc., Alphabet Wholesale, LLC, Peyton Palaio, Ted Palaio, Lawrence Larsen, Mark Jennings, Mark Jennings individually and doing business as Alphabet Wholesale, Jason Foster and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 0:2021cv00208
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Filing 87 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #70 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Cleanview Distribution Group LLC, Green Gold Ice LLC, Smash Hit Trading LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Legal Authorities per Hon Johnson 7H) (Ram, Stephen)
December 23, 2021 Filing 86 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Gregory Bruno on behalf of LGI Holdings, LLC (Bruno, Gregory)
December 23, 2021 Filing 85 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Paul Mueller on behalf of LGI Holdings, LLC (Mueller, Jeffrey)
December 21, 2021 PAYMENT ENTRY: Pro Hac Vice fee paid on behalf of Gregory Bruno, $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-2042188 re #79 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Shanor, Marianne)
December 21, 2021 PAYMENT ENTRY: Pro Hac Vice fee paid on behalf of Adam K. Grant, $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-2042197 re #80 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Shanor, Marianne)
December 21, 2021 PAYMENT ENTRY: Pro Hac Vice fee paid on behalf of Jeffrey P. Mueller, $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-2042201 re #82 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Shanor, Marianne)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #79 , #80 , #82 MOTIONS for Gregory Bruno, Adam K. Grant, and Jeffrey P. Mueller to appear pro hac vice on behalf of LGI Holdings, LLC. (cc: Order was e-mailed to PHV counsel on this date). (Court Staff, stmo)
December 20, 2021 Filing 83 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Nicole Carbonel on behalf of Cleanview Distribution Group LLC, Green Gold Ice LLC, Smash Hit Trading LLC (Carbonel, Nicole)
December 20, 2021 Filing 82 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Jeffrey P. Mueller to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendant LGI Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Shanor, Marianne)
December 20, 2021 Filing 81 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Lisa Marie Damm Northrup on behalf of Cleanview Distribution Group LLC, Green Gold Ice LLC, Smash Hit Trading LLC (Northrup, Lisa)
December 20, 2021 Filing 80 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Adam K. Grant to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendant LGI Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Shanor, Marianne)
December 20, 2021 Filing 79 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Gregory Bruno to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendant LGI Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Shanor, Marianne)
December 17, 2021 Filing 78 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Stephen Leonard Ram on behalf of Cleanview Distribution Group LLC, Green Gold Ice LLC, Smash Hit Trading LLC (Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-2041234) (Ram, Stephen) Modified on 12/17/2021 to strike filing fee info. Receipt AWYDC-2041234 voided via Pay.gov on 12/17/21 as fee was already paid on 12/14/21 with receipt CHY035688. (Court Staff, sjk).
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #76 Motion for Extension of Time. Briefing deadlines are extended for the parties on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss with Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition due January 7, 2022, and Defendant's Reply due January 21, 2022. (Court Staff, sag)
December 16, 2021 Filing 76 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Response and Replies re LGI's Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant LGI Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Larson, Sean)
December 14, 2021 FINANCIAL ENTRY: PAYMENT OF $300 RECEIVED FOR PRO HAC VICE FEES FOR NICOLE CARBONEL, LISA M NORTHRUP, & STEPHEN L RAM. RECEIPT CHY035688. (Court Staff, sjk)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting #72 , #73 , #74 MOTIONS to appear pro hac vice admitting Nicole Carbonel, Lisa M Northrup and Stephen L Ram for Plaintiffs Smash Hit Trading LLC, Green Gold Ice LLC, Cleanview Distribution Group LLC (Order mailed to phv counsel on this date) (Court Staff, sbh)
December 13, 2021 Filing 74 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Stephen L. Ram to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiffs Cleanview Distribution Group LLC, Green Gold Ice LLC, Smash Hit Trading LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit to Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order)(Hendrickson, James)
December 13, 2021 Filing 73 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Lisa M. Northrup to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiffs Cleanview Distribution Group LLC, Green Gold Ice LLC, Smash Hit Trading LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit to Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order)(Hendrickson, James)
December 13, 2021 Filing 72 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Nicole Lynn Carbonel to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiffs Cleanview Distribution Group LLC, Green Gold Ice LLC, Smash Hit Trading LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit to Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order)(Hendrickson, James)
December 9, 2021 Filing 71 BRIEF re #70 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant LGI Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Caselaw) (Shanor, Marianne)
December 9, 2021 Filing 70 MOTION to Dismiss #50 First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant LGI Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shanor, Marianne) Modified text and added link on 12/13/2021 (Court Staff, sjlg).
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #68 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant is allowed 30 additional days to respond to Plaintiffs' Interrogatories, First Set and Requests for Production of Documents, First Set, making the responses due January 4, 2022. (Court Staff, sag)
December 6, 2021 Filing 68 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of LGI's Response to Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Requests for Production - Set 1 filed by Defendant LGI Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shanor, Marianne)
December 6, 2021 Filing 67 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. Out of state counsel is directed to file a motion for admission pro hac vice within 14 days. Failure to do so will result in withdrawal from the case. (Mailed to counsel) (Court Staff, ssw)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #63 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file its answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint on or before December 9, 2021. (Court Staff, sag)
November 19, 2021 Filing 65 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Kay Roberts on behalf of Cleanview Distribution Group LLC, Green Gold Ice LLC, Smash Hit Trading LLC (Roberts, Amanda)
November 18, 2021 Filing 64 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sean M Larson on behalf of LGI Holdings, LLC (Larson, Sean)
November 18, 2021 Filing 63 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Defendant LGI Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Shanor, Marianne) Modified text on 11/19/2021 (Court Staff, sbh).
November 18, 2021 Filing 62 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marianne Kunz Shanor on behalf of LGI Holdings, LLC (Shanor, Marianne)
November 17, 2021 Filing 61 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Kyle Hendrickson on behalf of Cleanview Distribution Group LLC, Green Gold Ice LLC, Smash Hit Trading LLC (Hendrickson, James)
November 12, 2021 Filing 60 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:21-cv-07178.
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr: granting #37 MOTION to Dismiss, or in the alternative, To Tranfser. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS Defendant LGI Holdings LLC's (d/b/a Alphabet Wholesale) motion to transfer, SEVERS Plaintiffs' claims against LGI, and TRANSFERS them to the United States District Court for the District of Wyoming. The Court retains jurisdiction over Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants Peyton Palaio, Ted Palaio, Lawrence Larsen, Mark Jennings, and Jason Foster. Plaintiffs' claims against any remaining Defendant who is not served within 30 days after the date of this Order will be dismissed without prejudice for want of prosecution. (See minute order for further details) (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
November 12, 2021 Filing 58 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Complaint from November 19, 2021 to such time as it may be heard concurrently with Defendant's forthcoming Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant LGI Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Storm Byrd in Support of Ex Parte Application, #2 Proposed Order) (Byrd, Mason) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
November 5, 2021 Filing 57 REPLY In Further Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, or Alternatively to Transfer Venue ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof #37 filed by Defendant LGI Holdings, LLC. (Byrd, Mason) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
November 4, 2021 Filing 56 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #50 filed by Plaintiffs Cleanview Distribution Group LLC, Green Gold Ice LLC, Smash Hit Trading LLC. (Ram, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
November 4, 2021 Filing 55 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #50 filed by Plaintiffs Cleanview Distribution Group LLC, Green Gold Ice LLC, Smash Hit Trading LLC. (Ram, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
November 4, 2021 Filing 54 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #50 filed by Plaintiffs Cleanview Distribution Group LLC, Green Gold Ice LLC, Smash Hit Trading LLC. (Ram, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
November 4, 2021 Filing 53 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #50 filed by Plaintiffs Cleanview Distribution Group LLC, Green Gold Ice LLC, Smash Hit Trading LLC. (Ram, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
November 4, 2021 Filing 52 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #50 filed by Plaintiffs Cleanview Distribution Group LLC, Green Gold Ice LLC, Smash Hit Trading LLC. (Ram, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
November 4, 2021 Filing 51 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #50 filed by Plaintiffs Cleanview Distribution Group LLC, Green Gold Ice LLC, Smash Hit Trading LLC. (Ram, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
November 4, 2021 Filing 50 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Jason Foster, Mark Jennings(individually and), LGI Holdings, LLC, Lawrence Larsen, Peyton Palaio, Ted Palaio amending Complaint - (Discovery),,, filed by Plaintiffs Green Gold Ice LLC, Smash Hit Trading LLC, Cleanview Distribution Group LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Ram, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
October 29, 2021 Filing 49 DECLARATION of John Thomas Bryant in support of opposition NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, or Alternatively to Transfer Venue ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof #37 filed by Plaintiffs Cleanview Distribution Group LLC, Green Gold Ice LLC, Smash Hit Trading LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 of Bryant, #2 Exhibit 2 of Bryant, #3 Exhibit 2 of Bryant, #4 Exhibit 4 of Bryant, #5 Exhibit 5 of Bryant, #6 Exhibit 6 of Bryant, #7 Exhibit 7 of Bryant, #8 Exhibit 8 of Bryant, #9 Exhibit 9 of Bryant, #10 Exhibit 10 of Bryant, #11 Exhibit 11 of Bryant, #12 Exhibit 12 of Bryant, #13 Exhibit 13 of Bryant, #14 Exhibit 14 of Bryant, #15 Exhibit 15 of Bryant, #16 Exhibit 16 of Bryant, #17 Exhibit 17 of Bryant, #18 Exhibit 18 of Bryant, #19 Exhibit 19 of Bryant, #20 Exhibit 20 of Bryant, #21 Exhibit 21 of Bryant, #22 Exhibit 22 of Bryant, #23 Exhibit 23 of Bryant, #24 Exhibit 24 of Bryant, #25 Exhibit 25 of Bryant, #26 Exhibit 26 of Bryant, #27 Exhibit 27 of Bryant, #28 Exhibit 28 of Bryant, #29 Exhibit 29 of Bryant, #30 Exhibit 30 of Bryant, #31 Exhibit 31 of Bryant, #32 Exhibit 32 of Bryant, #33 Exhibit 33 of Bryant, #34 Exhibit 34 of Bryant, #35 Exhibit 35 of Bryant, #36 Exhibit 36 of Bryant, #37 Exhibit 37 of Bryant, #38 Exhibit 38 of Bryant, #39 Exhibit 39 of Bryant, #40 Exhibit 40 of Bryant, #41 Exhibit 41 of Bryant, #42 Exhibit 42 of Bryant, #43 Exhibit 43 of Bryant, #44 Exhibit 44 of Bryant, #45 Exhibit 45 of Bryant, #46 Exhibit 46 of Bryant, #47 Exhibit 47 of Bryant, #48 Exhibit 48 of Bryant, #49 Exhibit 49 of Bryant, #50 Exhibit 50 of Bryant, #51 Exhibit 51 of Bryant, #52 Exhibit 52 of Bryant, #53 Exhibit 53 of Bryant, #54 Exhibit 54 of Bryant, #55 Exhibit 55 of Bryant, #56 Exhibit 56 of Bryant, #57 Exhibit 57 of Bryant, #58 Exhibit 58 of Bryant)(Ram, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
October 29, 2021 Filing 48 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, or Alternatively to Transfer Venue ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof #37 filed by Plaintiffs Cleanview Distribution Group LLC, Green Gold Ice LLC, Smash Hit Trading LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ram, #2 Exhibit 1 Dec of Ram, #3 Exhibit 2 Dec of Ram, #4 Exhibit 3 Dec of Ram, #5 Exhibit 4 Dec of Ram, #6 Exhibit 5 Dec of Ram, #7 Exhibit 6 Dec of Ram, #8 Declaration of Lisa Wong, #9 Exhibit 1 of Wong)(Ram, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
October 27, 2021 Filing 47 21 DAY Summons Issued re Notice of Removal #1 as to Defendant Ted Palaio, an individual. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
October 27, 2021 Filing 46 21 DAY Summons Issued re Notice of Removal #1 as to Defendant Peyton Palaio, an individual. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
October 27, 2021 Filing 45 21 DAY Summons Issued re Notice of Removal #1 as to Defendant Mark Jennings(an individual). (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
October 27, 2021 Filing 44 21 DAY Summons Issued re Notice of Removal #1 as to Defendant Lawrence Larsen, an individual. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
October 27, 2021 Filing 43 21 DAY Summons Issued re Notice of Removal #1 as to Jason Foster Jason Foster. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
October 26, 2021 Filing 42 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by plaintiffs Cleanview Distribution Group LLC, Green Gold Ice LLC, Smash Hit Trading LLC. (Northrup, Lisa) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
October 26, 2021 Filing 41 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by plaintiffs Cleanview Distribution Group LLC, Green Gold Ice LLC, Smash Hit Trading LLC. (Northrup, Lisa) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
October 26, 2021 Filing 40 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by plaintiffs Cleanview Distribution Group LLC, Green Gold Ice LLC, Smash Hit Trading LLC. (Northrup, Lisa) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
October 26, 2021 Filing 39 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by plaintiffs Cleanview Distribution Group LLC, Green Gold Ice LLC, Smash Hit Trading LLC. (Northrup, Lisa) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
October 26, 2021 Filing 38 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by plaintiffs Cleanview Distribution Group LLC, Green Gold Ice LLC, Smash Hit Trading LLC. (Northrup, Lisa) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
October 14, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, or Alternatively to Transfer Venue ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by defendant LGI Holdings, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 11/19/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Palaio Declaration, #2 Declaration Mueller Declaration, #3 Exhibit Ex. A to Mueller Declaration - June 29, 2021 letter, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Byrd, Mason) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
October 13, 2021 Filing 36 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth Susan Lachman counsel for Defendant LGI Holdings, LLC. Elizabeth S. Lachman is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant LGI Holdings, LLC. (Lachman, Elizabeth) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr, (vcr) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PRETRIAL AND TRIAL ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (vcr) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
October 5, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #31 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
October 4, 2021 Filing 32 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The DOE defendants remaining after 12/17/2021 are dismissed by operation of this Order and without further notice. The Court vacates the mandatory scheduling conference set for 10/8/2021 and issues this case management order. The Court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) report #28 and sets the pretrial and trial dates noted in this order based on an evaluation of the complexity of the case. Jury Trial set for 11/7/2022 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 10/21/2022 10:00 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. Motion to Amend Pleadings/Add Parties (Hearing Deadline) 12/17/2021. Non-Expert Discovery cut-off 6/17/2022. Discovery Motion Hearing Deadline 7/15/2022. Non-Discovery Motion Hearing Deadline 7/29/2022. Settlement Conference Deadline 8/12/2022. Post-Settlement Status Conference set for 8/26/2022 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. Status Report due by 8/19/2022. Trial Filings (First Set) Deadline 9/23/2022. Trial Filings (Second Set) Deadline 10/7/2022. See document for further details. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
October 4, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Mason Storm Byrd on behalf of Defendant LGI Holdings, LLC (Attorney Mason Storm Byrd added to party LGI Holdings, LLC(pty:dft))(Byrd, Mason) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey Paul Mueller to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant LGI Holdings, LLC, designating Elizabeth S. Lachman as local counsel #24 . (gk) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Gregory R. Bruno to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant LGI Holdings, LLC, designating Elizabeth S. Lachman as local counsel #23 . (gk) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
October 1, 2021 Filing 28 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-10 days, filed by Plaintiffs Cleanview Distribution Group LLC, Green Gold Ice LLC, Smash Hit Trading LLC.. (Ram, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
October 1, 2021 Filing 27 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant LGI Holdings, LLC. Amended Exhibit A to Notice of Removal [Dkt.1-1] as to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal)(Lachman, Elizabeth) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
September 28, 2021 Filing 26 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Before the Court is the parties' Stipulation to increase the page limit on Defendant LGI's motion to dismiss and Plaintiff's subsequent opposition thereto #25 . Defendant LGI shall file a single motion and comply within the page limit and all motion requirements set forth in this Court's Standing Order, including those governing format, footnotes, and citations. The parties' request is DENIED. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
September 28, 2021 Filing 25 Joint STIPULATION to Exceed Page Limitation as to LGI's Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiffs' Opposition Thereto filed by Defendant LGI Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lachman, Elizabeth) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
September 23, 2021 Filing 24 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey Paul Mueller to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant LGI Holdings, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32039893) filed by Defendant LGI Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lachman, Elizabeth) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
September 23, 2021 Filing 23 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gregory R. Bruno to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant LGI Holdings, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 9/9/2021, Receipt No. ACACDC-31954881) filed by Defendant LGI Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lachman, Elizabeth) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
September 17, 2021 Filing 22 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiffs Cleanview Distribution Group LLC, Green Gold Ice LLC, Smash Hit Trading LLC.. (Ram, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
September 16, 2021 Filing 21 MINUTES - IN CHAMBERS by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court strikes the APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gregory R. Bruno to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant LGI Holdings, LLC #15 , without prejudice to refiling in accordance with the Court's standing order (provided that the refiling is otherwise timely), see Notice of Deficiency #16 . Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court DENIES without prejudice Defendant's application to file under seal Exhibit 2 attached to Plaintiffs' Complaint #4 . The parties are ordered to meet and confer about the propriety of filing a confidential Memorandum of Understanding (MOU) under seal and carefully review the MOU to determine if narrowly tailored redactions would suffice. If Defendant renews its application, it must explain in detail: (1) the results of the meet and confer; (2) the compelling reasons to file the MOU under seal and the specific prejudice that otherwise will result; and (3) the reason why narrowly tailored redactions are insufficient. If, upon further reflection, Defendant seeks only partial sealing, this too must be supported by compelling reasons that are set forth in sufficient detail for the Court to make an independent determination. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Upon Stipulation #17 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant LGI Holdings, LLC to file a responsive pleading is extended to 10/14/2021. (gk) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
September 15, 2021 Filing 18 Notice and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Cleanview Distribution Group LLC, Green Gold Ice LLC, Smash Hit Trading LLC, identifying Lisa Wong. (Ram, Stephen) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
September 13, 2021 Filing 17 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to LGI Holdings, LLC answer now due 10/14/2021, filed by Defendant LGI Holdings, LLC.(Lachman, Elizabeth) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
September 10, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gregory R. Bruno to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant LGI Holdings, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31954881) #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): The attorney seeking to appear pro hac vice must complete Section 1 of this Application, personally sign, in ink, the certification in Section II, and have the designated Local Counsel sign in Section III. ELECTRONIC SIGNATURES ARE NOT ACCEPTED. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). (lt) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
September 9, 2021 Filing 15 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER CIVIL MINUTES OF 9/16/2021, SEE DOCKET NO. 21] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gregory R. Bruno to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant LGI Holdings, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31954881) filed by Defendant LGI Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lachman, Elizabeth) Modified on 9/17/2021 (gk). [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for 10/8/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. The parties shall file a joint Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/1/2021. (vcr) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (vcr) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
September 8, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Adam K. Grant. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
September 8, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Gregory R. Bruno. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
September 8, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jeff Mueller. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
September 8, 2021 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
September 8, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
September 8, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
September 7, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Alphabet Wholesale, Alphabet Wholesale, Inc., Alphabet Wholesale, LLC, Does, Jason Foster, Mark Jennings(an individual), Mark Jennings(individually and as a director of Alphabet Wholesale, Inc.), Mark Jennings(individually and as a director of Alphabet Wholesale, business form unknown), Mark Jennings(individually and), LGI Holdings, LLC, Lawrence Larsen, Peyton Palaio, Ted Palaio, Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs Green Gold Ice LLC, Smash Hit Trading LLC, Cleanview Distribution Group LLC. (filed in state court 7/16/2021, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant LGI Holdings, LLC, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 served on September 7, 2021. (Lachman, Elizabeth) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
September 7, 2021 Filing 5 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibit 2 to Plaintiffs' Complaint under seal #4 filed by Defendant LGI Holdings, LLC.(Lachman, Elizabeth) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
September 7, 2021 Filing 4 APPLICATION to file document Exhibit 2 to Plaintiffs' Complaint under seal filed by Defendant LGI Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lachman, Elizabeth) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
September 7, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant LGI Holdings, LLC, identifying Peyton Palaio. (Lachman, Elizabeth) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
September 7, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant LGI Holdings, LLC. (Lachman, Elizabeth) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21STCV26352 Receipt No: ACACDC-31941064 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant LGI Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons and Other Case Initiating Documents, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal Ex. 2 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Plaintiffs' Notice of Lodging Under Seal) (Attorney Elizabeth Susan Lachman added to party LGI Holdings, LLC(pty:dft))(Lachman, Elizabeth) [Transferred from California Central on 11/12/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cleanview Distribution Group LLC et al v. LGI Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleanview Distribution Group LLC
Represented By: Lisa M Northrup
Represented By: Nicole Lynn Carbonel
Represented By: Stephen L Ram
Represented By: Amanda Kay Roberts
Represented By: James Kyle Hendrickson
Represented By: Lisa Marie Damm Northrup
Represented By: Stephen Leonard Ram
Represented By: Nicole Carbonel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smash Hit Trading LLC
Represented By: Lisa M Northrup
Represented By: Nicole Lynn Carbonel
Represented By: Stephen L Ram
Represented By: Amanda Kay Roberts
Represented By: James Kyle Hendrickson
Represented By: Lisa Marie Damm Northrup
Represented By: Stephen Leonard Ram
Represented By: Nicole Carbonel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Gold Ice LLC
Represented By: Lisa M Northrup
Represented By: Nicole Lynn Carbonel
Represented By: Stephen L Ram
Represented By: Stephen Leonard Ram
Represented By: Amanda Kay Roberts
Represented By: James Kyle Hendrickson
Represented By: Lisa Marie Damm Northrup
Represented By: Nicole Carbonel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LGI Holdings, LLC a Wyoming limited liability company doing business as Alphabet Wholesale
Represented By: Gregory R. Bruno
Represented By: Jeffrey Paul Mueller
Represented By: Kirk D. Dillman
Represented By: Mason Storm Byrd
Represented By: Elizabeth Susan Lachman
Represented By: Gregory Bruno
Represented By: Marianne Kunz Shanor
Represented By: Sean M Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphabet Wholesale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphabet Wholesale, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphabet Wholesale, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peyton Palaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Palaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Jennings individually and doing business as Alphabet Wholesale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?