Villecco v. Klein et al

Plaintiff: Michael Villecco
Defendant: Ryan A Bock, Zachary W Meyers, Anna M Dominy, Daniel W Stark, Jonathan R Moul and Alexander J Klein
Case Number: 1:2018cv00100
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Office: Casper Office
County: Teton
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2018 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Leisel B Stevens. Receipt CHY029303. (Court Staff, sjk)
August 3, 2018 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support of #14 Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Anna M Dominy, Alexander J Klein, Zachary W Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Anna Rozier, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Zachary Meyers, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Alexander Klein, #4 Exhibit Filing Information, #5 Exhibit Concession Contracts) (Stevens, Liesel) Modified text on 8/14/2018 (Court Staff, sjlg).
August 3, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Anna M Dominy, Alexander J Klein, Zachary W Meyers. (Stevens, Liesel). Added motion relief and changed docket text on 8/14/2018 (Court Staff, sjlg).
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin Granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice admitting Liesel B. Stevens for Alexander J. Klein, Zachary W. Meyers, and Anna M. Dominy.(Court Staff, szf)
July 31, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Liesel B Stevens to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendants Anna M Dominy, Alexander J Klein, Zachary W Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Court Staff, stbd)
July 23, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Villecco. Jonathan R Moul served on 7/16/2018, answer due on 8/6/2018. Copy of executed return sent to plaintiff via U.S. mail on this date. (Court Staff, skb)
July 23, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Villecco. Ryan A Bock served on 7/16/2018, answer due on 8/6/2018. Copy of executed return sent to plaintiff via U.S. mail on this date. (Court Staff, skb)
July 23, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Villecco. Anna M Dominy served on 7/16/2018, answer due on 8/6/2018. Copy of executed return sent to plaintiff via U.S. mail on this date. (Court Staff, skb)
July 23, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Villecco. Alexander J Klein served on 7/16/2018, answer due on 8/6/2018. Copy of executed return sent to plaintiff via U.S. mail on this date. (Court Staff, skb)
July 20, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Zachary W Meyers served on 7/16/2018, answer due on 9/14/2018. Served through the United States Marshal. (Court Staff, scat)
July 13, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Villecco. Daniel W Stark served on 7/9/2018, answer due on 7/30/2018. Copy of executed return mailed to plaintiff via U.S. mail on this date. (Court Staff, skb) Modified on 7/13/2018 (Court Staff, skb).
July 5, 2018 Filing 5 6 Summons Issued (Court Staff, scat)
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #3 MOTION for Service of Process at Government Expense filed by Plaintiff Michael Villecco. Copy of order mailed to Plaintiff on this date. Copies of complaint and order provided to the United States Marshal for service. (Court Staff, scat) (Court Staff, scat) Modified text on 7/5/2018 (Court Staff, scat).
June 26, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Service of Process at Government Expense filed by Plaintiff Michael Villecco. (Court Staff, scat)
June 26, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff Michael Villecco. (Court Staff, scat)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand ( Filing fee not collected. Motion to Proceed Informa Pauperis filed.), filed by Michael Villecco. (Court Staff, scat) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/27/2018: #1 consent to magistrate judge, #2 Envelope) (Court Staff, scat). Modified text on 6/27/2018 (Court Staff, sjlg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villecco v. Klein et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan A Bock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary W Meyers
Represented By: Liesel B Stevens
Represented By: Charles H Livsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna M Dominy
Represented By: Liesel B Stevens
Represented By: Charles H Livsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel W Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan R Moul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander J Klein
Represented By: Liesel B Stevens
Represented By: Charles H Livsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Villecco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?