United States of America v. 17 Bank Accounts Containing Various Amounts of United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 17 Bank Accounts Containing Various Amounts of United States Currency
Claimant: Raul Rodriguez, Eleazar Najera Mata, Star 74 LLC, Almansitas Mexican Food LLC, Monica's Taco Shop LLC, Guillermina Lopez, Two Stars PLC, Alvaro Davila, Ana Cejudo, Monica Rodriguez-Lopez, Jose A Bernal, Adriana Rodriguez, Cosme D Guiterrez and Hilario Montejano-Aleman
Case Number: 1:2018cv00189
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Claimant Alvaro Davila. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Thomas)
December 28, 2018 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Jonathan S Willett. Receipt CHY030087. (Court Staff, sjk)
December 28, 2018 Filing 47 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, by Ana Cejudo. (Fleener, Thomas)
December 28, 2018 Filing 46 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, by Star 74 LLC. (Fleener, Thomas)
December 28, 2018 Filing 45 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, by Almansitas Mexican Food LLC. (Fleener, Thomas)
December 28, 2018 Filing 44 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, by Cosme D Guiterrez. (Fleener, Thomas)
December 27, 2018 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for David L Rockwell. Receipt CAS002168. (Court Staff, sjk)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #42 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting David L. Rockwell for Jose A Bernal (Court Staff, sbh)
December 27, 2018 Filing 42 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for David L. Rockwell to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Claimant Jose A Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sandefer, Ian)
December 27, 2018 Filing 41 DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for David L. Rockwell to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Claimant Jose A Bernal. (Sandefer, Ian) Modified on 12/27/2018 (Court Staff, skb).
December 27, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ian Sandefer on behalf of Jose A Bernal (Sandefer, Ian)
December 26, 2018 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Richard F Bednarski. Receipt CHY030072. (Court Staff, sjk)
December 21, 2018 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Abasi D. Major. Receipt CAS002166. (Court Staff, sjk)
December 21, 2018 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Cynthia E. Hujar Orr. Receipt CAS002165. (Court Staff, sjk)
December 21, 2018 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Gerald H Goldstein. Receipt CAS002164. (Court Staff, sjk)
December 20, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE by Claimant Guillermina Lopez Amended Verified Claim (Silva, Peter) Text Modified on 12/26/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting #35 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Cynthia E. Hujar Orr for Alvaro Davila (Court Staff, sbh)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting #34 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Gerald H. Goldstein for Alvaro Davila; granting #36 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Abasi D. Major for Alvaro Davila (Court Staff, sbh)
December 19, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Abasi D. Major to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Claimant Alvaro Davila. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Thomas)
December 19, 2018 Filing 35 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Cynthia E. Hujar Orr to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Claimant Alvaro Davila. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Thomas)
December 19, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Gerald H. Goldstein to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Claimant Alvaro Davila. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Thomas)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #32 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Jonathan S Willett for Eleazar Najera Mata and Two Stars PLC. (Court Staff, sal)Text Modified on 12/19/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
December 18, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Jonathan Willett to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Eleazar Najera Mata and Two Stars PLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Reese, Michael) TextModified on 12/19/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
December 18, 2018 Filing 31 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER Denying #28 Motion for Jonathan S. Willett to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Failure to Comply with U.S.D.C.L.R. 84.2(b) by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin.(Court Staff, szf)
December 18, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE by Eleazar Najera Mata and Two Stars PLC of Claims (Reese, Michael) Text Modified on 12/19/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
December 18, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael H Reese on behalf Eleazar Najera Mata and Two Stars PLC (Reese, Michael) Text Modified on 12/19/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
December 18, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Jonathan S. Willett to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Eleazar Najera Mata and Two Stars PLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Reese, Michael)Text Modified on 12/19/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #26 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Richard F Bednarski for Monica's Taco Shop LLC,Adriana Rodriguez, Guillermina Rodriguez, Raul Rodriguez and Monica Rodriguez-Lopez (Court Staff, sal) (Main Document 27 replaced on 12/19/2018) (Court Staff, sal).
December 18, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Richard F. Bednarski to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Claimants Monica's Taco Shop LLC, Adriana Rodriguez, Guillermina Rodriguez, Raul Rodriguez, Monica Rodriguez-Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Richard F. Bednarski, #2 Proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Richard F. Bednarski)(Silva, Peter)
December 18, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE by Claimant Adriana Rodriguez Verified Claim (Silva, Peter)
December 18, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE by Claimant Monica Rodriguez-Lopez Verified Claim (Silva, Peter)
December 18, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE by Claimant Guillermina Rodriguez Verified Claim (Silva, Peter)
December 18, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE by Claimants Monica's Taco Shop LLC, Raul Rodriguez Verified Claim (Silva, Peter)
December 18, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Craig Silva on behalf of Monica's Taco Shop LLC, Adriana Rodriguez, Guillermina Rodriguez, Raul Rodriguez, Monica Rodriguez-Lopez (Silva, Peter)
December 17, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE by Claimant Alvaro Davila Verified Claim (Smith, Thomas)
December 17, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas R Smith on behalf of Alvaro Davila (Smith, Thomas)
December 14, 2018 Filing 18 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER re #17 Notice of Claim filed by Jose A Bernal by the Honorable Alan B Johnson.For the Court to accept this Notice of Claim, pursuant to USDCWY Local Rule 84.2(b), counsel David Rockwell shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of this order to associate with local counsel and be admitted pro hac vice. (Court Staff, scg)
December 14, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Claim by Claimant Jose A Bernal (Court Staff, ssw)
December 14, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE by Claimant Hilario Montejano-Aleman of Verified Claim. (Custis, Dion) Text Modified on 12/17/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
December 12, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE by Claimant Cosme D Guiterrez Verified Claim (Fleener, Thomas)
December 12, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas A Fleener on behalf of Cosme D Guiterrez (Fleener, Thomas)
December 12, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE by Claimant Anna Cejudo Verified Claim (Fleener, Thomas)
December 12, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas A Fleener on behalf of Anna Cejudo (Fleener, Thomas)
December 12, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE by Claimant Almansitas Mexican Food LLC Verified Claim (Fleener, Thomas) (Main Document 11 replaced on 12/18/2018) (Court Staff, ssw).
December 12, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas A Fleener on behalf of Almansitas Mexican Food LLC (Fleener, Thomas)
December 12, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE by Claimant Star 74 LLC Verified Claim (Fleener, Thomas) (Main Document 9 replaced on 12/18/2018) (Court Staff, ssw).
December 12, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas A Fleener on behalf of Star 74 LLC (Fleener, Thomas)
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 First ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses by Claimant Hilario Montejano-Aleman. (Custis, Dion) Text Modified on 12/7/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dion J Custis on behalf Claimant Hilario Montejano-Aleman. (Custis, Dion) Text Modified on 12/7/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #4 Motion for Order Requesting Documents Remain Non-Public. (Court Staff, sjh)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Order Requesting Documents Remain Non-Public filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sprecher, Stephanie)
November 16, 2018 Motions No Longer Referred: #3 MOTION for Order Warrants of Arrest in Rem (Court Staff, szf)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. NON-PUBLIC DOCUMENT pursuant to the Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy and Public Access - MOTION for Warrants of Arrest in Rem filed by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Court Staff, sbh) Modified on 11/16/2018 (Court Staff, szf).
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 NON-PUBLIC DOCUMENT pursuant to the Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy and Public Access NOTICE Of Forfeiture Action by Plaintiff United States of America (Court Staff, scat)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 17 Bank Accounts Containing Various Amounts of United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 17 Bank Accounts Containing Various Amounts of United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Stephanie Hambrick
Represented By: Stephanie Sprecher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Raul Rodriguez
Represented By: Richard F Bednarski
Represented By: Peter Craig Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Eleazar Najera Mata
Represented By: Michael H Reese
Represented By: Jonathan S Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Star 74 LLC
Represented By: Thomas A Fleener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Almansitas Mexican Food LLC
Represented By: Thomas A Fleener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Monica's Taco Shop LLC
Represented By: Richard F Bednarski
Represented By: Peter Craig Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Guillermina Lopez
Represented By: Richard F Bednarski
Represented By: Peter Craig Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Two Stars PLC
Represented By: Michael H Reese
Represented By: Jonathan S Willett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Alvaro Davila
Represented By: Gerald H Goldstein
Represented By: Cynthia E Hujar Orr
Represented By: Thomas R Smith
Represented By: Abasi D Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ana Cejudo
Represented By: Thomas A Fleener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Monica Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Richard F Bednarski
Represented By: Peter Craig Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jose A Bernal
Represented By: David L Rockwell
Represented By: Ian Sandefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Adriana Rodriguez
Represented By: Richard F Bednarski
Represented By: Peter Craig Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Cosme D Guiterrez
Represented By: Thomas A Fleener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Hilario Montejano-Aleman
Represented By: Dion J Custis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?