Moon v. Zimmer Biomet Holdings Inc et al

Plaintiff: Wanda Moon
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet US Inc, Zimmer Biomet Holdings Inc and Zimmer Biomet Inc
Case Number: 1:2018cv00200
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 E-mail from the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York directing the transfer of USDC - WY case number 1:18-CV-00200-ABJ to USDC - NY (Southern) for MDL 2859 CTO-7. Case transferred via CM/ECF Case Extract on January 4, 2019. (Court Staff, szf)
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 Transfering Case to MDL Panel. CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-7) - 1 action(s) re: pldg. ( 82 in MDL No. 2859, 1 in WY/1:18-cv-00200) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 12/27/2018.Associated Cases: MDL No. 2859, WY/1:18-cv-00200 (LAH) (Court Staff, ssw)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-7) Finalized on 12/27/18. Please see pleading ( 87 in MDL No. 2859, 3 in WY/1:18-cv-00200). As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer.The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the S.D. New York for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred.Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 12/27/2018. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2859, WY/1:18-cv-00200 (LAH) (Court Staff, ssw)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson granting #2 Motion to Stay Proceedings and Answer Deadline. The December 26, 2018, deadline to file an Answer to the Complaint is hereby STRICKEN and that all proceedings are hereby STAYED pending transfer of this action to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York for resolution of pretrial proceedings. (Court Staff, ssw) Text Modified on 12/26/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher C Voigt on behalf of Zimmer Biomet Holdings Inc, Zimmer Biomet Inc, Zimmer Biomet US Inc (Voigt, Christopher)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 NON-PUBLIC DOCUMENT pursuant to the Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy and Public Access - Joint MOTION to Stay case filed by Defendants Zimmer Biomet Holdings Inc, Zimmer Biomet Inc, Zimmer Biomet US Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pending Transfer to Multi-district Litigation, #2 Exhibit B - Conditional Transfer Order, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Voigt, Christopher) Modified document security per Christopher Voigt's office on 12/21/2018 (Court Staff, szf).
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (3 summons(es) issued) with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CAS002154.), filed by Wanda Moon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent to Magistrate Judge) (Court Staff, scat)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moon v. Zimmer Biomet Holdings Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet US Inc
Represented By: Christopher C Voigt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings Inc
Represented By: Christopher C Voigt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Inc
Represented By: Christopher C Voigt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Moon
Represented By: Brian B Winegar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?