Depina v. Casper Police Department

Plaintiff: Harshima Lamonte Depina
Defendant: Casper Police Chief, McPheeters, Casper Police Department Chief of Police, Casper Police Department and Keith McPheeters
Case Number: 1:2018cv00201
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: Wyoming District Court
0 Judge: Kelly H Rankin
1 Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 ORDER dismissing case without prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. Copy of Order provided to Plaintiff via US Mail.(Court Staff, scat) Modified text on 12/12/2018 (Court Staff, scat).
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by the Honorable Scott W. Skavdahl. Case reassigned to Honorable Scott W. Skavdahl and for all further proceedings; Honorable Kelly H. Rankin no longer assigned to case as Presiding Judge.(Court Staff, szf) Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail on 12/5/2018 (Court Staff, szf).
December 3, 2018 3 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Defendant Harshima Lamonte Depina. (Court Staff, stbd)
December 3, 2018 2 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint filed by Defendant Harshima Lamonte Depina. (Court Staff, stbd)
December 3, 2018 1 COMPLAINT (No summons(es) issued), filed by Harshima Lamonte Depina. (Court Staff, stbd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Depina v. Casper Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casper Police Chief, McPheeters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casper Police Department Chief of Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casper Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith McPheeters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harshima Lamonte Depina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?