Casper WY v. Purdue Pharma LP et al

Plaintiff: Casper WY
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, McKesson Corporation, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, Mallinckrodt PLC, Cardinal Health Inc, Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Johnson & Johnson, Walmart Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Purdue Frederick Company, Walgreen Company, Mallinckrodt LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Insys Therapeutics Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc and Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv00024
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
0 Judge: Alan B Johnson
1 Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 Transfering Case to MDL Panel. CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-80) - 18 action(s) re: pldg. (1 in ALM/2:19-cv-00100, 1 in FLS/0:19-cv-60305, 2 in FLS/0:19-cv-60313, 1 in FLS/0:19-cv-60364, 1 in KYE/0:19-cv-00014, 1 in KYE/2:19-cv-00007, 1 in KYE/6:19-cv-00038, 1 in LAE/2:19-cv-01048, 1 in LAE/2:19-cv-01174, 1 in LAW/5:19-cv-00153, 1 in MD/8:19-cv-00336, 3751 in MDL No. 2804, 1 in MIW/1:19-cv-00094, 1 in MT/4:19-cv-00008, 1 in OHS/2:19-cv-00448, 1 in OKW/5:19-cv-00096, 1 in PAM/3:19-cv-00190, 2 in WVS/5:19-cv-00084, 1 in WY/1:19-cv-00024) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 2/21/2019.Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, ALM/2:19-cv-00100, FLS/0:19-cv-60305, FLS/0:19-cv-60313, FLS/0:19-cv-60364, KYE/0:19-cv-00014, KYE/2:19-cv-00007, KYE/6:19-cv-00038, LAE/2:19-cv-01048, LAE/2:19-cv-01174, LAW/5:19-cv-00153, MD/8:19-cv-00336, MIW/1:19-cv-00094, MT/4:19-cv-00008, OHS/2:19-cv-00448, OKW/5:19-cv-00096, PAM/3:19-cv-00190, WVS/5:19-cv-00084, WY/1:19-cv-00024 (Court Staff, stbd)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 (TEXT-ONLY) MINUTE ORDER TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-80) Finalized on 2/21/19. Please see pleading (3 in ALM/2:19-cv-00100, 3 in FLS/0:19-cv-60305, 4 in FLS/0:19-cv-60313, 3 in FLS/0:19-cv-60364, 3 in KYE/0:19-cv-00014, 3 in KYE/2:19-cv-00007, 3 in KYE/6:19-cv-00038, 3 in LAE/2:19-cv-01048, 3 in LAE/2:19-cv-01174, 3 in LAW/5:19-cv-00153, 3 in MD/8:19-cv-00336, 3794 in MDL No. 2804, 3 in MIW/1:19-cv-00094, 3 in MT/4:19-cv-00008, 3 in OHS/2:19-cv-00448, 3 in OKW/5:19-cv-00096, 3 in PAM/3:19-cv-00190, 4 in WVS/5:19-cv-00084, 3 in WY/1:19-cv-00024). As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer. The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the N.D. Ohio for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 2/21/2019. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, ALM/2:19-cv-00100, FLS/0:19-cv-60305, FLS/0:19-cv-60313, FLS/0:19-cv-60364, KYE/0:19-cv-00014, KYE/2:19-cv-00007, KYE/6:19-cv-00038, LAE/2:19-cv-01048, LAE/2:19-cv-01174, LAW/5:19-cv-00153, MD/8:19-cv-00336, MIW/1:19-cv-00094, MT/4:19-cv-00008, OHS/2:19-cv-00448, OKW/5:19-cv-00096, PAM/3:19-cv-00190, WVS/5:19-cv-00084, WY/1:19-cv-00024.(Court Staff, stbd)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Defendant Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Insys Therapeutics Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc, Walmart Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc filed by Casper WY. (Attachments: #1 Consent) (Court Staff, stbd)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400 receipt #CAS002190), filed by Casper WY (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, stbd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2019: #2 Consent) (Court Staff, stbd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casper WY v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casper WY
Represented By: Jason Edward Ochs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?