Harvey et al v. Halliburton Energy Services Inc

Plaintiff: Elaine Harvey and Robert Allen Harvey
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv00027
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Mark L Carman
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl granting #7 Motion to Compel; granting #7 Motion to Stay Case. It is ordered that the Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Stay the Proceedings is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that this matter is STAYED pending arbitration proceedings in accordance with the Halliburton DRP.(Court Staff, stbd) Modified text on 4/5/2019 (Court Staff, sjlg).
March 18, 2019 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Rachel E Linzy. Receipt CHY030571. (Court Staff, sjk)
March 12, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY BRIEF re #13 Brief, in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services Inc. (Nachbar, Keith)
March 11, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #16 Order on Removal filed by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services Inc. (Nachbar, Keith)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by the Honorable Mark L. Carman granting #19 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Rachel E. Linzy for Halliburton Energy Services Inc. (Court Staff, sea)
March 7, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Mark L Carman. MOTION for Rachel E. Linzy to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Nachbar, Keith)
March 4, 2019 Filing 18 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply.Defendant shall file their reply on or before 3/12/2019.(Court Staff, scat)
March 1, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time (Dispositive) requesting extension of Time to File Reply to Motion to Compel #7 filed by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nachbar, Keith) Modified text on 3/4/2019 (Court Staff, scat).
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ON REMOVAL regarding #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Halliburton Energy Services Inc by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. (Court Staff, scat)
February 27, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas E Lubnau, II on behalf of Robert Allen Harvey, Elaine Harvey (Lubnau, Thomas)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl as Presiding Judge and the Honorable Mark L Carman as Referral Judge for all further proceedings by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl.(Court Staff, sjlg)
February 26, 2019 Filing 13 Response BRIEF in Opposition to #7 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion to Stay Proceedings filed by Plaintiffs Robert Allen Harvey, Elaine Harvey. (Nicholas, Philip) Modified text and security per counsel on 2/27/2019 (Court Staff, sjlg).
February 26, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Robert Allen Harvey re #11 Opposition, filed by Plaintiffs Robert Allen Harvey, Elaine Harvey. (Nicholas, Philip)
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 OPPOSITION to #7 Motion to Compel,,, Motion to Stay Case,, filed by Plaintiffs Robert Allen Harvey, Elaine Harvey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (Nicholas, Philip)
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Meggan Jo Nicholas on behalf of Robert Allen Harvey, Elaine Harvey (Nicholas, Meggan) (Main Document 10 replaced on 2/19/2019) (Court Staff, sjlg).
February 18, 2019 Filing 9 PLEADING FILED IN ERROR. COUNSEL TO REFILE - NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Philip A Nicholas on behalf of Robert Allen Harvey, Elaine Harvey (Nicholas, Philip) Modified on 2/19/2019 (Court Staff, sjlg).
February 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Philip A Nicholas on behalf of Robert Allen Harvey, Elaine Harvey (Nicholas, Philip) (Main Document 8 replaced on 2/19/2019) (Court Staff, sjlg).
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or in the Alternative MOTION to stay case filed by Defendant Halliburton Energy Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A-1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A-2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A-3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A-4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit A-5, #8 Exhibit Exhibit A-6, #9 Exhibit Exhibit A-7, #10 Exhibit Exhibit A-8)(Nachbar, Keith). Added Motion Relief and changed text on 2/19/2019 (Court Staff, sjlg).
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed in State Court 1/11/2019 by Elaine Harvey, Robert Allen Harvey. (Court Staff, scat)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury filed in State Court on 12/26/2018 by Plaintiffs Robert Allen Harvey, Elaine Harvey. (Court Staff, scat)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT DOCKET SHEET. (Court Staff, scat) Modified to correct filed date on 2/6/2019 (Court Staff, scat).
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 TRANSMITTAL of State Court Record. (Court Staff, scat)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT, FILED 12/26/2018, filed by Elaine Harvey, Robert Allen Harvey. (Court Staff, scat)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fifth Judicial District, Big Horn County, Wyoming, Civil Action 2018-000105. (Filing fee $ 400), filed by Halliburton Energy Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Consent to Magistrate Judge) (Court Staff, scat) Modified to correct date filed on 2/6/2019 (Court Staff, scat).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harvey et al v. Halliburton Energy Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halliburton Energy Services Inc
Represented By: Keith R Nachbar
Represented By: Rachel E Linzy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Harvey
Represented By: Philip A Nicholas
Represented By: Thomas E Lubnau
Represented By: Thomas E Lubnau, II
Represented By: Meggan Jo Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Allen Harvey
Represented By: Philip A Nicholas
Represented By: Thomas E Lubnau
Represented By: Thomas E Lubnau, II
Represented By: Meggan Jo Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?