Bastrom v. Paxiao

Plaintiff: Stephanie Bastrom
Defendant: Greg Paxiao
Counter Claimant: Wade Bastrom
Case Number: 1:2019cv00028
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Mark L Carman
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 11 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE filed by Greg Paxiao. Wade Bastrom served on 3/14/2019, answer due 4/4/2019. (Akin, Jena)
March 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Defendant Greg Paxiao, Third-Party Plaintiff Greg Paxiao, Counter Claimant Greg Paxiao of Withdrawal of J. Mark Stewart (Stewart, Jon)
March 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jena R Akin on behalf of Greg Paxiao (Akin, Jena)
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #3 Third-Party Complaint and Counterclaim against Counter Defendant Greg Paxiao by Third-Party Defendant and Counter Claimant Wade Bastrom. (Shumaker, Seth) Modified text on 3/26/2019 (Court Staff, sjlg).
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 First ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by Stephanie Bastrom. (Shumaker, Seth)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 Praecipe for Summons filed by Defendant Greg Paxiao, Counter Claimant Greg Paxiao, Third-Party Plaintiff Greg Paxiao, one issued. (Court Staff, szf)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clint Andrew Langer on behalf of Greg Paxiao (Court Staff, szf)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jon Mark Stewart on behalf of Greg Paxiao (Court Staff, szf)
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses,, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Third-Party Defendant Wade Bastrom, COUNTERCLAIM against Counter-Defendant Stephanie Bastrom by Greg Paxiao. (Court Staff, szf) Modified text on 3/7/2019 (Court Staff, szf).
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephanie Bastrom. Greg Paxiao served on 2/15/2019, answer due on 3/8/2019. (Court Staff, skb)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (1 summons(es) issued) with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CAS002194.), filed by Stephanie Bastrom. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Consent to Magistrate Judge) (Court Staff, scat)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bastrom v. Paxiao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Bastrom
Represented By: Seth Shumaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Paxiao
Represented By: Jon Mark Stewart
Represented By: Clint Andrew Langer
Represented By: Jena R Akin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Wade Bastrom
Represented By: Seth Shumaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?