Fisk v. Affinity Gaming LLC Chief Executive Officer et al

Plaintiff: Paula Kay Fisk
Defendant: Affinity Gaming LLC Chairman of Board of Directors, Affinity Gaming LLC Chief Marketing Officer and Senior Vice President, Affinity Gaming LLC Chief Executive Officer, Affinity Gaming LLC Chief Operating Officer, Mary Elizabeth Higgins, Vincent Lentini, Eric Fiocco and James Zenni
Case Number: 1:2019cv00090
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Paula Kay Fisk regarding deadline for payment of filing fee. (Court Staff, szf) Modified text on 7/2/2019 (Court Staff, sjlg).
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying #4 MOTION for Service of Process at Government Expense. (Copy of order mailed to Plaintiff)(Court Staff, ssw)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by the Honorable Scott W. Skavdahl. Case reassigned to Honorable Alan B. Johnson, presiding and Honorable Kelly H. Rankin referral for all further proceedings.(Court Staff, szf)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Service of Process at Government Expense filed by Plaintiff Paula Kay Fisk. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Court Staff, scat)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Paula Kay Fisk. (Court Staff, scat)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff Paula Kay Fisk. (Court Staff, scat)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (1 summons(es) issued), filed by Paula Kay Fisk. (Court Staff, scat) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/10/2019: #2 Consent to Magistrate Judge, #3 Envelope) (Court Staff, scat). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/10/2019: #4 Attachment) (Court Staff, scat).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fisk v. Affinity Gaming LLC Chief Executive Officer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affinity Gaming LLC Chairman of Board of Directors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affinity Gaming LLC Chief Marketing Officer and Senior Vice President
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affinity Gaming LLC Chief Executive Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affinity Gaming LLC Chief Operating Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Elizabeth Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Lentini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Fiocco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Zenni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Kay Fisk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?