Blazek v. Maul
Plaintiff: Kalee Ann Blazek
Defendant: Jaret Maul
Case Number: 1:2019cv00098
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 First ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by Jaret Maul. (Connolly, Terry)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT by Kalee Ann Blazek. (Sandefer, Ian)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR STATUS REPORT by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Status Report due by 6/26/2019.(Court Staff, sal)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGMENT and ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE filed by Kalee Ann Blazek. Jaret Maul served on 5/18/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Court Staff, scat)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of complexity by Plaintiff Kalee Ann Blazek; this case is non-complex. (Court Staff, skb)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (1 summons issued) with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, Receipt #CAS002238), filed by Kalee Ann Blazek. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge) (Court Staff, skb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blazek v. Maul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalee Ann Blazek
Represented By: Jamie M Woolsey
Represented By: Ian Sandefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaret Maul
Represented By: Terry Wynn Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?