Cable v. QBE Insurance Corporation

Plaintiff: Judith Cable
Defendant: QBE Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00101
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 VERBAL NOTICE of Settlement per Andrew Sears and Terry Connolly;Dismissal pleading due by 8/7/2019. All deadlines and hearings have been vacated. (Court Staff, skb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE Resetting Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference reset from 7/08/2019 09:30 AM to 7/11/2019 09:00 AM in Judge Rankin Chambers (Room No. 2204) before Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. All parties should appear by telephone, with Plaintiff's counsel initiating the call, through a conference call operator, and connecting to the Court at 307/433-2180. Parties are advised to have their calendars on hand to assist with scheduling. (Court Staff, szf)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE QBE Insurance Corporation served on 5/9/2019, answer due 5/30/2019. Filed in State Court on 5/15/2019. (Court Staff, scat)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 STATE COURT DOCKET SHEET. (Court Staff, scat)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 TRANSMITTAL OF STATE COURT RECORD by Defendant QBE Insurance Corporation of Filing State Court Proceedings (Sears, Andrew) Modified text on 6/6/2019 (Court Staff, scat).
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/8/2019 09:30 AM in Judge Rankin Chambers (Room No. 2204) before Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. All parties should appear by telephone, with Plaintiff's counsel initiating the call, through a conference call operator, and connecting to the Court at 307/433-2180. Parties are advised to have their calendars on hand to assist with scheduling. (Court Staff, szf)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury filed by Defendant QBE Insurance Corporation. (Sears, Andrew)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by QBE Insurance Corporation. QBE Holding Inc and QBE Insurance Group, Limited added as corporate parents. (Sears, Andrew) Modified text on 5/22/2019 (Court Staff, scat).
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to #2 State Court Complaint by QBE Insurance Corporation. (Sears, Andrew) Modified text on 5/28/2019 (Court Staff, scat).
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF REMOVAL by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. The removing party shall notify the State court of the removal by filing a copy of the notice of removal with the clerk of the state court. The removing party shall file a copy of the entire state court record and proceedings, including the docket sheet, within 14 days of the entry of this Order of Removal. Copy of Order provided to State Court via US Mail.(Court Staff, scat) Modified text on 5/22/2019 (Court Staff, scat).
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed 03/07/2019 by Judith Cable. (Court Staff, stbd)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Seventh Judicial District, 106073. (Filing fee $ 400), filed by QBE Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent) #3 Proposed Order) (Court Staff, stbd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cable v. QBE Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Andrew F Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Cable
Represented By: Caleb C Wilkins
Represented By: Terry Wynn Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?