Polk v. Swift et al
Plaintiff: April Polk
Defendant: Campbell County Memorial Hospital, Campbell County Health, Wyo ENT PC and Dr Ian Swift
Case Number: 1:2019cv00148
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lena Kathleen Moeller on behalf of Campbell County Health, Campbell County Memorial Hospital (Moeller, Lena)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Ian Swift, Wyo ENT PC,. (Collier, Mark) Modified to remove non-public restriction on 8/6/2019 (Court Staff, scat).
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ian Swift, Wyo ENT PC. Ian Swift 7/16/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Wyo ENT PC 7/16/2019, answer due 9/16/2019 (Collier, Mark)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark B Collier on behalf of Ian Swift, Wyo ENT PC (Collier, Mark)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Campbell County Health, Campbell County Memorial Hospital,. (Iberlin, Amy)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Campbell County Health, Campbell County Memorial Hospital. Campbell County Health 7/16/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Campbell County Memorial Hospital 7/16/2019, answer due 9/16/2019 (Iberlin, Amy)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amy M Iberlin on behalf of Campbell County Health, Campbell County Memorial Hospital (Iberlin, Amy)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (4 summons(es) issued) ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CAS002265.), filed by April Polk. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, scat) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2019: #2 Consent to Magistrate Judge) (Court Staff, scat). (Main Document 1 replaced after correcting page 57 orientation on 7/19/2019) (Court Staff, scat). Modified on 7/19/2019 (Court Staff, scat).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polk v. Swift et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campbell County Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Lena Kathleen Moeller
Represented By: Amy M Iberlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campbell County Health
Represented By: Lena Kathleen Moeller
Represented By: Amy M Iberlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyo ENT PC
Represented By: Mark B Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Ian Swift
Represented By: Mark B Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Polk
Represented By: Michael John Lansing
Represented By: Thomas A Valdez
Represented By: Patrick Lewallen
Represented By: Frank R Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?