Redfield v. Campbell County Health et al
Plaintiff: Maria Redfield
Defendant: Powder River Surgical Center, Campbell County Health, Dr Ian Swift and Wyo ENT PC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00189
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT REPORT OF MEETING AND PROPOSED JOINT DISCOVERY AND CASE MANAGMENT PLAN AND SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/9/2020 at 9:30 AM in Judge Johnson Chambers (Room No. 2018) before Honorable Alan B Johnson.(Court Staff, ssw) Modified on 10/24/2019 (Court Staff, ssw). (Main Document 13 replaced on 10/29/2019) (Court Staff, sbh).
October 24, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY MOTIONS AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS, INCLUDING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ANALOGOUS MOTIONS TO DISMISS IN CIVIL CASES by the Honorable Alan B Johnson.(Court Staff, ssw)
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, with Jury Demand by Ian Swift, Wyo ENT PC. (Collier, Mark)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Wyo ENT PC: No parent corporation (Collier, Mark) Modified text on 10/18/2019 (Court Staff, sbh). Modified filers on 10/18/2019 (Court Staff, sbh).
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark B Collier on behalf of Ian Swift, Wyo ENT PC (Collier, Mark)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amy M Iberlin on behalf of Campbell County Health, Powder River Surgical Center (Iberlin, Amy)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, with Jury Demand by Campbell County Health, Powder River Surgical Center. (Moeller, Lena)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lena Kathleen Moeller on behalf of Campbell County Health, Powder River Surgical Center (Moeller, Lena)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Redfield. Wyo ENT PC served on 9/26/2019, answer due on 10/17/2019 (Chapman, Frank)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Redfield. Ian Swift served on 9/26/2019, answer due on 10/17/2019 (Chapman, Frank)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Redfield. Powder River Surgical Center served on 9/16/2019, answer due on 10/7/2019 (Chapman, Frank)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Redfield. Campbell County Health served on 9/16/2019, answer due on 10/7/2019 (Chapman, Frank)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (4 summons(es) issued) ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CAS002293.), filed by Maria Redfield. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent to Magistrate Judge) (Court Staff, scat)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redfield v. Campbell County Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Powder River Surgical Center
Represented By: Lena Kathleen Moeller
Represented By: Amy M Iberlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campbell County Health
Represented By: Lena Kathleen Moeller
Represented By: Amy M Iberlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Ian Swift
Represented By: Mark B Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyo ENT PC
Represented By: Mark B Collier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Redfield
Represented By: Michael John Lansing
Represented By: Thomas A Valdez
Represented By: Patrick Lewallen
Represented By: Frank R Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?