Knight v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: James Knight
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2019cv00222
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Mark L Carman
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin admitting Jeff Seldomridge as counsel for Plaintiff.(Court Staff, szf)
December 17, 2019 Filing 23 (TEXT-ONLY) Order Vacating Hearing by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. The Court hereby VACATES the Initial Pretrial Conference previously set for January 8, 2020 at 3:00 pm. The Court ORDERS that on or before January 10, 2020, following a conferral, the parties file a Joint Case Management Plan (form attached here). The Plan shall also address any other relevant topics to include whether consolidation of the two related cases (19-CV-221-KHR and 19-CV-222-KHR) is appropriate for discovery, pretrial matters, and trial. After the Plan is filed in both cases, the Court will schedule either a separate or combined Initial Pretrial Conference. (Court Staff, szf)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to the Honorable Kelly H Rankin for all further proceedings; the Honorable Mark L Carman no longer assigned to case by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl.(Court Staff, sjlg)
December 16, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Jeff T. Seldomridge to appear pro hac vice; Check tendered; filed by Plaintiff James Knight. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Seldomridge, J.)(Bosch, Gerard)
December 13, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION of Consent to Trial Before U.S. Magistrate Judge by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Murphy, Patrick)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by the Honorable Mark L. Carman granting #18 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel. Attorney Richard B. North, Jr. terminated. (Court Staff, skw)
November 21, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitution of Counsel filed by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Murphy, Patrick) Text modified on 11/23/2019 (Court Staff, skw).
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Setting Deadline for Consent to Trial by Magistrate Judge by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. If a party consents to a U.S. Magistrate Judge conducting all proceedings, that party shall provide a consent form to the Clerk of Court's Office on or before December 13, 2019. (Court Staff, scat) Text modified on 11/18/2019 (Court Staff, skw).
November 15, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference RESET for 1/8/2020 03:00 PM in Yellowstone Justice Center (by phone) before Honorable Mark L. Carman. (Court Staff, skw) Text modified on 11/15/2019 (Court Staff, skw).
November 14, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2020 03:00 PM in Yellowstone Justice Center before Honorable Mark L. Carman. (Court Staff, skw)
November 14, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Mark L. Carman: Status Conference held on 11/14/2019. (Court Staff, skw)
November 13, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated, identifying Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Murphy, Patrick) Punctuation modified on 11/14/2019 (Court Staff, skw).
November 13, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED NOTICE of Status Conference: Status Conference set for 11/14/2019 11:15 AM in Yellowstone Justice Center (by telephone) before Honorable Mark L. Carman. Parties to connect to the Court using the phone number 1-888-557-8511 and access code 4753232#. (Court Staff, skw)
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gerard R Bosch on behalf of James Knight (Bosch, Gerard)
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Status Conference: Status Conference set for 11/14/2019 11:15 AM in Yellowstone Justice Center (by phone) before Honorable Mark L. Carman. (Court Staff, skw)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick J Murphy on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Murphy, Patrick)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 Notice Vacating Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/11/2019 at 3:00 PM VACATED. (Court Staff, skw)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/11/2019 03:00 PM in Yellowstone Justice Center (by telephone) before Honorable Mark L. Carman. (Court Staff, skw)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-04396.
October 25, 2019 Remark: Transferring Case to the District of Wyoming via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (SECOND). (See document for details). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-4396-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(LSP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by James Knight. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]
December 15, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13718320 filed by James Knight. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 10/25/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knight v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Patrick J Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Patrick J Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Knight
Represented By: Jeff Seldomridge
Represented By: Gerard R Bosch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?