Craig Cunningham v. Technologic USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Craig Cunningham
Defendant: Technologic USA, Inc. and John/Jane Does
Case Number: 1:2019cv00231
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant filed by Plaintiff Craig Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit G-1, #4 Exhibit H, #5 envelope) (Court Staff, skb)
November 6, 2019 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-05597.
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin transferring case to District of Wyoming. IT IS ORDERED THAT the Clerk shall transfer this case forthwith to the United States District Court for the District of Wyoming. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.]
September 27, 2019 Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment by the Court #11 , currently set for hearing on October 3, 2019, is taken off calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on that date. The court may order further briefing or other proceedings, at any time, as appropriate. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 15 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE REGARDING PERSONAL JURISDICTION filed by Plaintiff Craig Cunningham. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 14 PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Technologic USA, Inc. amending Complaint - (Discovery), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Craig Cunningham. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.]
September 16, 2019 Filing 13 PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE REGARDING SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Craig Cunningham. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: TRANSFER TO PROPER VENUE OR DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS ORDERED that, no later than September 24, 2019, plaintiff shall file a First Amended Complaint addressing the deficiencies noted above. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of a First Amended Complaint that addresses the issues raised in this Order on or before the date indicated above. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court filed by Plaintiff Craig Cunningham. Hearing set 10/3/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin.(yl) Modified on 9/13/2019 (cw). [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Plaintiff shall file and serve a motion for default judgment no later than 8/29/2019, and notice it for hearing pursuant to the Local Rules. (vdr) [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Technologic USA, Inc. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against Defendant Technologic USA, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Craig Cunningham. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED filed by Plaintiff Craig Cunningham. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Craig Cunningham, upon Defendant Technologic USA, Inc. served on 7/20/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Julie K. Bridge in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.]
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.]
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant Technologic USA, Inc. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendants John/Jane Does, Technologic USA, Inc. Case assigned to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner, (Filing fee $ 400 paid), Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Craig Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 11/6/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craig Cunningham v. Technologic USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Technologic USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?