Wolosin et al v. Casper WY et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Wolosin and Daniel Wolosin PR
Defendant: Casper Police Department Officer Carlson, Casper Police Department Officer Garrett, Casper WY, Casper Police Department, Randi Garrett and Jacob Carlson
Case Number: 1:2019cv00242
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Mark L Carman
Referring Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Wolosin, Daniel Wolosin PR. Casper Police Department Officer Garrett served on 1/6/2020, answer due on 1/27/2020 (Court Staff, stbd)
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Wolosin, Daniel Wolosin PR. Casper Police Department Officer Carlson served on 1/9/2020, answer due on 1/30/2020 (Court Staff, stbd)
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Wolosin, Daniel Wolosin PR. Casper Police Department served on 1/6/2020, answer due on 1/27/2020 (Court Staff, stbd)
January 9, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Wolosin, Daniel Wolosin PR. Casper WY served on 1/6/2020, answer due on 1/27/2020 (Court Staff, stbd)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 Praecipe for summons filed by Plaintiffs Daniel Wolosin, Daniel Wolosin PR, 4 issued. (Court Staff, skb)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by the Honorable Scott W. Skavdahl. Case reassigned to Honorable Nancy D. Freudenthal as Presiding Judge and Honorable Mark L. Carman as Referral Judge.(Court Staff, szf) Plaintiff served via US Mail on 11/27/2019 (Court Staff, szf).
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (no summons(es) issued) ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CAS002316.)filed by Daniel Wolosin, Daniel Wolosin PR. Plaintiff provided consent to magistrate judge and application to receive NEFs. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Relief) (Court Staff, scat) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/25/2019: #2 Consent to Magistrate Judge) (Court Staff, scat). Modified text on 11/25/2019 (Court Staff, scat).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolosin et al v. Casper WY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casper Police Department Officer Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casper Police Department Officer Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casper WY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casper Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randi Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Wolosin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Wolosin PR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?