T. et al v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Wyoming
Plaintiff: Robert T. and Maia T.
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Wyoming
Case Number: 1:2019cv00247
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jessica Rutzick on behalf of Robert T. and Maia T. (Rutzick, Jessica) Modified filer and text on 1/29/2020 (Court Staff, sjlg).
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DISCHARGING #24 Order to Show Cause by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Accordingly, the deadline to show cause is discharged. (Court Staff, sjlg)
January 21, 2020 Filing 27 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Brian King (Court Staff, sjlg)
January 10, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/26/2020 09:00 AM in Judge Freudenthal Chambers (Room No. 2242) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. (Please see notice for instructions.) (Court Staff, sjlg)
January 9, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shelly K Flot on behalf of Maia T., Robert T. (Flot, Shelly)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Plaintiffs shall show cause within ten (10) calendar days of this Order (01/18/2020) why the Complaint should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 84.2. Because plaintiffs' lawyers are not registered for ECF in this case, the Clerk of Court's Office shall mail a copy of this order to them, and Plaintiffs' counsel shall promptly provide a copy to Plaintiffs. In addition, in the interest of expediency, the Clerk of Court shall also email a copy of this order to the address Plaintiffs' counsel provided in the Complaint, brian@briansking.com. Show Cause Response due by 1/18/2020. (Copy of this Order mailed via US Mail and emailed to plaintiffs' counsel on this date.) (Court Staff, sjlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2020: #1 Email to Counsel) (Court Staff, sjlg).
December 20, 2019 Filing 22 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFFS TO RETAIN LOCAL COUNSEL. This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. On December 5, 2019, the Court entered a text-only order for the parties to comply with USDCWY Local Rule 84.2 regarding local counsel within 14 days. Plaintiffs have not yet done so. However, the Court does not have a record of mailing the December 5 order to counsel. The Court permits Plaintiffs 14 days from this order to comply with Local Rule 84.2. The Clerk of Courts office shall mail a copy of the docket containing this order to counsel of record not yet registered in ECF. By the Honorable Nancy D. Freudenthal.(Court Staff, ssp)
December 18, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lucas Evan Buckley on behalf of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Wyoming (Buckley, Lucas)
December 5, 2019 Filing 20 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR ALL PARTIES TO RETAIN LOCAL COUNSEL. This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. On December 4, 2019, this Court received this case on transfer from the District of Utah. Each party is represented by counsel who is not a member of the Courts bar. The parties shall respectively comply with USDCWY Local Rule 84.2 within 14 days. by the Honorable Nancy D. Freudenthal.(Court Staff, ssp)
December 4, 2019 Filing 19 Case transferred in from District of Utah; Case Number 2:19-cv-00269.
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TRANSFERRING VENUE - granting #17 Motion to Change Venue. Based on the parties' stipulation and with good cause appearing, the above captionedmatter is transferred to the United States District Court, District of Wyoming in Cheyenne. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 12/4/19. (jmr) [Transferred from Utah on 12/4/2019.]
December 3, 2019 Filing 17 Stipulated MOTION to Change Venue filed by Plaintiffs Maia T., Robert T.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(King, Brian) [Transferred from Utah on 12/4/2019.]
November 18, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Wyoming.(English, Maralyn) [Transferred from Utah on 12/4/2019.]
November 18, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Change Venue and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Wyoming. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Renee Dilly)(English, Maralyn) [Transferred from Utah on 12/4/2019.]
November 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address by Brian S. King (King, Brian) [Transferred from Utah on 12/4/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer deadline updated for Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Wyoming answer due 11/19/2019. Signed by Judge Bruce S. Jenkins on 9/20/19. (jmr) [Transferred from Utah on 12/4/2019.]
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Plaintiffs Maia T., Robert T.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(King, Brian) [Transferred from Utah on 12/4/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge Bruce S. Jenkins. Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero no longer assigned to the case. (nl) [Transferred from Utah on 12/4/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiffs Maia T. and Robert T. (nl) [Transferred from Utah on 12/4/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Wyoming. (nl) [Transferred from Utah on 12/4/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Wyoming, Plaintiffs Maia T., Robert T.. Form due by 8/2/2019. (las) [Transferred from Utah on 12/4/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Wyoming, Plaintiffs Maia T., Robert T.. (las) [Transferred from Utah on 12/4/2019.]
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint,. Answer deadline updated for Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Wyoming answer due 9/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 7/17/2019. (las) [Transferred from Utah on 12/4/2019.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Wyoming. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint) Attorney Maralyn M. English added to party Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Wyoming(pty:dft)(English, Maralyn) Modified on 7/17/2019 by correcting motion type(las). [Transferred from Utah on 12/4/2019.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 REASSIGNMENT to Newly Appointed Magistrate Judge. Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells no longer assigned to the case. Case number will now read 2:19-cv-00269-CMR. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (jwt) [Transferred from Utah on 12/4/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Robert T., Maia T. as to Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Wyoming Waiver sent on 5/23/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (King, Brian) [Transferred from Utah on 12/4/2019.]
April 19, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Wyoming (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3255723) filed by Robert T., Maia T.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells (King, Brian) [Transferred from Utah on 12/4/2019.]
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells. Plaintiffs Maia T., Robert T. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl) [Transferred from Utah on 12/4/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T. et al v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Wyoming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Wyoming
Represented By: Maralyn M. English
Represented By: Lucas Evan Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert T.
Represented By: Brent J. Newton
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Nediha Hadzikadunic
Represented By: Brian S King
Represented By: Shelly K Flot
Represented By: Jessica Rutzick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maia T.
Represented By: Brent J. Newton
Represented By: Brian S. King
Represented By: Nediha Hadzikadunic
Represented By: Brian S King
Represented By: Shelly K Flot
Represented By: Jessica Rutzick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?