Haye v. Collection Professionals Inc
Plaintiff: Douglas Haye and Douglas I Haye
Defendant: Collection Professionals Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv00153
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/12/2020 09:00 AM in Judge Freudenthal Chambers (Room No. 2242) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. (Court Staff, sal)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Collection Professionals Inc,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Wendtland, Anthony)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of complexity by Defendant Collection Professionals Inc ; this case is non-complex. (Wendtland, Anthony)
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by Collection Professionals Inc. (Wendtland, Anthony)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Douglas I Haye. Collection Professionals Inc served on 8/22/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Shumaker, Seth) Modified on 8/25/2020 (Court Staff, sal).
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (1 summons(es) issued) ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CAS002462.), filed by Douglas Haye. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, stbd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haye v. Collection Professionals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collection Professionals Inc
Represented By: Anthony T Wendtland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Haye
Represented By: Seth Shumaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas I Haye
Represented By: Seth Shumaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?