Anderson v. Brothers Pyrotechnics Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer L Anderson
Defendant: Cody J Kromrey, Brothers Pyrotechnic Inc, Earl W Learned doing business as Atlantis Fireworks and Brothers Pyrotechnics Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv00159
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 STATE COURT DOCKET SHEET (Court Staff, sbh)
September 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Colin M Simpson on behalf of Jennifer L Anderson (Simpson, Colin)
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Larry B Jones on behalf of Jennifer L Anderson (Jones, Larry)
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, with Jury Demand by Cody J Kromrey. (Metcalfe, Christopher)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 TRANSMITTAL of State Court Record by Defendant Earl W Learned (Sears, Andrew) Modified event on 9/9/2020 (Court Staff, sbh).
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury filed by Defendant Earl W Learned. (Sears, Andrew)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Earl W Learned. (Sears, Andrew)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON REMOVAL re #1 Notice of Removal by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson (Court Staff, sbh) Certified copy of order mailed to State Court on 8/31/2020 (Court Staff, sbh).
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT docketed in the Fifth Judicial District on July 1, 2020 filed by Jennifer L Anderson (Court Staff, stbd) Modified text on 8/27/2020 (Court Staff, sbh).
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fifth Judicial District - Park County, 29841 filed by Earl W Learned (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CAS002467) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent) (Court Staff, stbd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Brothers Pyrotechnics Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody J Kromrey
Represented By: Christopher Metcalfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brothers Pyrotechnic Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl W Learned doing business as Atlantis Fireworks
Represented By: Andrew F Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brothers Pyrotechnics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer L Anderson
Represented By: Larry B Jones
Represented By: Colin M Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?