Willey et al v. Sweetwater County School District No 1 Board of Trustees et al
Plaintiff: Ashley Willey and Sean Willey
Defendant: Kelly McGovern, Nicole Bolton, Kayci Arnoldi, Bryant Blake, Sweetwater County School District No 1 Board of Trustees, Sweetwater County School District No and Black Butte High School Principal
Case Number: 1:2023cv00069
Filed: April 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2023 Filing 21 REPLY to #16 Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiffs Ashley Willey, Sean Willey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Court Staff, skb)
May 17, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Hevenor on behalf of Kayci Arnoldi, Bryant Blake, Nicole Bolton, Kelly McGovern, Sweetwater County School District No 1 Board of Trustees (Hevenor, Eric)
May 17, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by L Kathleen Chaney on behalf of Kayci Arnoldi, Bryant Blake, Nicole Bolton, Kelly McGovern, Sweetwater County School District No 1 Board of Trustees (Chaney, L)
May 17, 2023 Filing 18 NON-PUBLIC DOCUMENT pursuant to the Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy and Public Access - EXHIBIT in reference to #16 Response to Motion, Appendix 1, Exhibit C, and Exhibit H filed by Defendants Kayci Arnoldi, Bryant Blake, Nicole Bolton, Kelly McGovern, Sweetwater County School District No 1 Board of Trustees. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit H) (Chaney, L)
May 16, 2023 Filing 17 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #15 Motion for Order. Defendants may file the requested exhibits under seal. (Court Staff, sjdl)
May 15, 2023 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Kayci Arnoldi, Bryant Blake, Nicole Bolton, Kelly McGovern, Sweetwater County School District No 1 Board of Trustees. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1-Cover Page, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C-Cover Page, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H-Cover Page) (Chaney, L)
May 15, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Order to File Exhibits Under Seal filed by Defendants Kayci Arnoldi, Bryant Blake, Nicole Bolton, Kelly McGovern, Sweetwater County School District No 1 Board of Trustees. (Chaney, L)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sean Willey, Ashley Willey by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. Defendants shall file a responsive brief and any supporting materials no later than close of business (5:00 P.M. MST) on Monday, May 15, 2023. Plaintiffs shall file any reply no later than close of business (5:00 P.M. MST) on Monday, May 22, 2023. Given the nature of the issues presented, the Court will not order oral argument at this time and will decide the Motion on the submissions. See D. Wyo. Civ. R. 7.1(a). (Copy of Order sent to Defendants' counsel via email) (Court Staff, skb)
May 2, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Ashley Willey, Sean Willey (McAlister, Mary) Modified text on 5/3/2023 (Court Staff, skb).
May 1, 2023 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ashley Willey, Sean Willey. Kayci Arnoldi 4/24/2023, answer due 6/23/2023; Bryant Blake 4/24/2023, answer due 6/23/2023; Nicole Bolton 4/24/2023, answer due 6/23/2023; Kelly McGovern 4/24/2023, answer due 6/23/2023; Sweetwater County School District No 1 Board of Trustees 4/24/2023, answer due 6/23/2023 (McAlister, Mary)
April 25, 2023 Filing 11 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Ernest Trakas on behalf of Ashley Willey, Sean Willey Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-2250371. (Trakas, Ernest) Modified on 4/25/2023 to strike filing fee, as fee was already paid on 4/21/23 with receipt 2-1418. Fee voided via Pay.gov on 4/25/23 (Court Staff, sjk).
April 25, 2023 Filing 10 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Vernadette Ramirez Broyles on behalf of Ashley Willey, Sean Willey Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-2250368 . (Broyles, Vernadette) Modified on 4/25/2023 to strike filing fee, as fee was already paid on 4/21/23 with receipt 2-1418. Fee voided via Pay.gov on 4/25/23 (Court Staff, sjk).
April 25, 2023 Filing 9 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Mary Elizabeth McAlister on behalf of Ashley Willey, Sean Willey Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-2250365. (McAlister, Mary) Modified on 4/25/2023 to strike filing fee, as fee was already paid on 4/21/23 with receipt 2-1418. Fee voided via Pay.gov on 4/25/23(Court Staff, sjk).
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #3 MOTION for Mary E. McAlister to appear pro hac vice; granting #4 MOTION for Vernadette R. Broyles to appear pro hac vice; granting #5 MOTION for Ernest G. Trakas to appear pro hac vice. (cc: Counsel via email) (Court Staff, skb) Modified text on 4/25/2023 (Court Staff, skb).
April 21, 2023 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Ashley Willey, Sean Willey. (Bailey, Henry)
April 21, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Ashley Willey, Sean Willey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Bailey, Henry)
April 21, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Ernest G. Trakas to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiffs Ashley Willey, Sean Willey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Bailey, Henry)
April 21, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Vernadette R. Broyles to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiffs Ashley Willey, Sean Willey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Bailey, Henry)
April 21, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Mary E. McAlister to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiffs Ashley Willey, Sean Willey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Bailey, Henry)
April 21, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Henry F Bailey, Jr on behalf of Ashley Willey, Sean Willey (Bailey, Henry)
April 21, 2023 FINANCIAL ENTRY: PAYMENT OF $300 RECEIVED FOR PRO HAC VICE FEES FOR MARY E McALISTER, ERNEST G TRAKAS, & VERNADETTE R BROYLES. RECEIPT 2-1418. (Court Staff, sjk)
April 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $402 receipt #CHY 2-1408), filed by Ashley Willey, Sean Willey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent to Proceed Before USMJ) (Court Staff, szf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willey et al v. Sweetwater County School District No 1 Board of Trustees et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly McGovern
Represented By: L Kathleen Chaney
Represented By: Eric Hevenor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Bolton
Represented By: L Kathleen Chaney
Represented By: Eric Hevenor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kayci Arnoldi
Represented By: L Kathleen Chaney
Represented By: Eric Hevenor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryant Blake
Represented By: L Kathleen Chaney
Represented By: Eric Hevenor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sweetwater County School District No 1 Board of Trustees
Represented By: L Kathleen Chaney
Represented By: Eric Hevenor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sweetwater County School District No
Represented By: L Kathleen Chaney
Represented By: Eric Hevenor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black Butte High School Principal
Represented By: L Kathleen Chaney
Represented By: Eric Hevenor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Willey
Represented By: Henry F Bailey, Jr
Represented By: Ernest Trakas
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McAlister
Represented By: Vernadette Ramirez Broyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Willey
Represented By: Henry F Bailey, Jr
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McAlister
Represented By: Vernadette Ramirez Broyles
Represented By: Ernest Trakas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?