BCB Cheyenne LLC v. MineOne Wyoming Data Center LLC et al
Plaintiff: BCB Cheyenne LLC a Wyoming limited liability company doing business as Bison Blockchain
Defendant: MineOne Wyoming Data Center LLC, MineOne Partners LLC, Terra Crypto Inc, Bit Origin Ltd and SonicHash LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv00079
Filed: May 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
2 Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2023 Filing 22 MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Kelly H Rankin: Upon consideration of the arguments made, Court determined that given Defendants timely request for an extension and due to the procedural posturing of this case, Defendants MineOne Wyoming Data Center LLC, MineOne Partners LLC, Terra Crypto Inc., and Sonic Hash LLCs answers are due on or before July 3, 2023. Plaintiffs request for default against Defendant Bit Origin Ltd #19 shall be addressed by the trial Court. Plaintiffs right to seek default or other recourse against any Defendant is preserved. Motion Hearing held on 6/26/2023. (Court Staff, smxb)
June 26, 2023 Filing 21 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin. Defendant Bit Origin Ltd. shall respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Default #19 on or before July 7, 2023. (Court Staff, sjgc)
June 26, 2023 Filing 20 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting in part and denying in part #17 Motion for Extension of Time. On June 26, 2023, the Court held an informal telephonic hearing on Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #17 and Plaintiff's Response in Opposition and Request for Default #19 . Upon consideration of the arguments made in the briefing and at the hearing the Court orders as follows: Given Defendants timely request for an extension and due to the procedural posturing of this case, Defendants MineOne Wyoming Data Center LLC, MineOne Partners LLC, Terra Crypto Inc., and Sonic Hash LLCs answers are due on or before July 3, 2023. Next, Plaintiff's request for default against Defendant Bit Origin Ltd #19 shall be addressed by the trial Court. Plaintiff's right to seek default or other recourse against any Defendant is preserved. (Court Staff, sjgc)
June 23, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Entry of Default and RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Time to Respond filed by Plaintiff BCB Cheyenne LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit II, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Proposed Order) (Murphy, Patrick) Modified to correct event and docket text on 6/26/2023 (Court Staff, smxb).
June 23, 2023 Filing 18 (TEXT-ONLY) NOTICE of Hearing on #17 MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Time to Respond BY TELEPHONE. All parties may appear by telephone through the Courts conference call system. Guests call: 307-735-3644, Access code 275440149#. Motion Hearing set for 6/26/2023 11:00 AM before Honorable Kelly H Rankin. (Court Staff, sjdl)
June 22, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Time to Respond filed by Defendants Bit Origin Ltd, MineOne Partners LLC, MineOne Wyoming Data Center LLC, SonicHash LLC, Terra Crypto Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Larson, Sean)
June 22, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sean M Larson on behalf of Bit Origin Ltd, MineOne Partners LLC, MineOne Wyoming Data Center LLC, SonicHash LLC, Terra Crypto Inc (Larson, Sean)
June 13, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BCB Cheyenne LLC. Bit Origin Ltd served on 5/23/2023, answer due on 6/13/2023 (Murphy, Patrick)
June 13, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BCB Cheyenne LLC. Terra Crypto Inc served on 6/7/2023, answer due on 6/28/2023 (Murphy, Patrick)
June 13, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BCB Cheyenne LLC. SonicHash LLC served on 6/1/2023 6/7/2023 answer due on 6/22/2023 6/28/2023 (Murphy, Patrick) Modified date served and answer deadline date on 6/14/2023 (Court Staff, stmo).
June 13, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BCB Cheyenne LLC. MineOne Wyoming Data Center LLC served on 6/1/2023 6/7/2023 answer due on 6/22/2023 6/28/2023 (Murphy, Patrick) Modified date served and answer deadline date on 6/14/2023 (Court Staff, stmo).
June 13, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BCB Cheyenne LLC. MineOne Partners LLC served on 6/1/2023 6/7/2023 answer due on 6/22/2023 6/28/2023 (Murphy, Patrick) Modified date served and answer deadline date on 6/14/2023 (Court Staff, stmo).
May 18, 2023 Filing 10 Summonses Issued (Court Staff, sbh)
May 17, 2023 Filing 9 Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiff BCB Cheyenne LLC (Attachments: #1 Terra Crypto Summons) (Murphy, Patrick) (Attachment 1 flattened and replaced on 5/18/2023) (Court Staff, sbh).
May 17, 2023 Filing 8 Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiff BCB Cheyenne LLC (Attachments: #1 SonicHash Summons) (Murphy, Patrick) (Attachment 1 flattened and replaced on 5/18/2023) (Court Staff, sbh).
May 17, 2023 Filing 7 Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiff BCB Cheyenne LLC (Attachments: #1 MineOne Wyoming Data Center Summons) (Murphy, Patrick) (Attachment 1 flattened and replaced on 5/18/2023) (Court Staff, sbh).
May 17, 2023 Filing 6 Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiff BCB Cheyenne LLC (Attachments: #1 MineOne Partners Summons) (Murphy, Patrick) (Attachment 1 flattened and replaced on 5/18/2023) (Court Staff, sbh).
May 17, 2023 Filing 5 Praecipe for Bit Origin Summons filed by Plaintiff BCB Cheyenne LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Murphy, Patrick) (Attachment 1 flattened and replaced on 5/18/2023) (Court Staff, sbh).
May 17, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Defendant Terra Crypto Inc (Court Staff, sbh)
May 16, 2023 Filing 3 Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiff BCB Cheyenne LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Murphy, Patrick)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. Case reassigned to Honorable Alan B Johnson for all further proceedings. Honorable Scott W Skavdahl no longer assigned to case. (Court Staff, skb)
May 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract, Anticipatory Repudiation of Contract, International Interference with Contractual Relations, Alter Ego Liability, Enterprise Liability, and Lost Profits and Money Damages filed by BCB Cheyenne LLC (Filing fee $402, receipt #1-179) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Consent to Proceed before Magistrate) (Court Staff, skb) Modified text on 5/9/2023 (Court Staff, sjlg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BCB Cheyenne LLC v. MineOne Wyoming Data Center LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BCB Cheyenne LLC a Wyoming limited liability company doing business as Bison Blockchain
Represented By: Patrick J Murphy
Represented By: Scott C Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MineOne Wyoming Data Center LLC
Represented By: Sean M Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MineOne Partners LLC
Represented By: Sean M Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terra Crypto Inc
Represented By: Sean M Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bit Origin Ltd
Represented By: Sean M Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SonicHash LLC
Represented By: Sean M Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?