McArtor et al v. Valsoft Corporation Inc et al
Plaintiff: Weston D McArtor, BEI Services Inc doing business as Nexera and BEI Services Inc
Defendant: Valsoft Corporation Inc and Aspire USA LLC doing business as Aspire Software
Case Number: 1:2023cv00136
Filed: August 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Hambrick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2023 Filing 16 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Douglas J Feichtner on behalf of BEI Services Inc, Weston D McArtor Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-2311503. (Feichtner, Douglas)
September 6, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lucas Evan Buckley on behalf of Aspire USA LLC, Valsoft Corporation Inc (Buckley, Lucas)
September 6, 2023 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Weston D McArtor, BEI Services Inc. Valsoft Corporation Inc 9/5/2023, answer due 11/6/2023 (Shurtleff, Lance)
September 6, 2023 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Weston D McArtor, BEI Services Inc. Aspire USA LLC 9/5/2023, answer due 11/6/2023 (Shurtleff, Lance)
August 31, 2023 Filing 12 Summons Issued. (Court Staff, sjbo)
August 31, 2023 Filing 11 Summons Issued. (Court Staff, sjbo)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by the US Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Hambrick granting #4 MOTION for Douglas J. Feichtner to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Weston D McArtor, BEI Services Inc. (Court Staff, sjbo)
August 30, 2023 Filing 9 PLEADING FILED IN ERROR - Proposed MOTION for Order Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice Motion of Douglas J. Feichtner filed by Plaintiffs BEI Services Inc, Weston D McArtor. (Shurtleff, Lance) Modified on 9/7/2023 (Court Staff, sjlg).
August 30, 2023 Filing 8 Praecipe for Proposed Summons filed by Plaintiffs BEI Services Inc, Weston D McArtor (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons to be Issued Upon Valsoft Corporation, Inc.) (Shurtleff, Lance)
August 30, 2023 Filing 7 Praecipe for Proposed Summons filed by Plaintiffs BEI Services Inc, Weston D McArtor (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons to be Issued Upon Aspire USA, LLC dba Aspire) (Shurtleff, Lance)
August 25, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Weston D McArtor, BEI Services Inc as to Valsoft Corporation Inc. (Shurtleff, Lance)
August 25, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Weston D McArtor, BEI Services Inc as to Aspire USA LLC. (Shurtleff, Lance)
August 22, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Douglas J. Feichtner to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiffs BEI Services Inc, Weston D McArtor. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Shurtleff, Lance)
August 1, 2023 Filing 3 Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge. The case has been assigned to the Honorable Stephanie A. Hambrick. (Court Staff, stbd)
August 1, 2023 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by BEI Services Inc. BEI Services Inc does not have a parent corporation. (Shurtleff, Lance) Modified text and filers on 8/7/2023 (Court Staff, sjlg).
August 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number AWYDC-2291934) Attorney Lance Elton Shurtleff added to party BEI Services, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Lance Elton Shurtleff added to party Weston D McArtor(pty:pla), filed by Weston D McArtor, BEI Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D to Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E to Complaint, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F to Complaint, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G to Complaint) (Shurtleff, Lance)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McArtor et al v. Valsoft Corporation Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weston D McArtor
Represented By: Lance Elton Shurtleff
Represented By: Douglas J Feichtner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEI Services Inc doing business as Nexera
Represented By: Lance Elton Shurtleff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEI Services Inc
Represented By: Douglas J Feichtner
Represented By: Lance Elton Shurtleff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valsoft Corporation Inc
Represented By: Lucas Evan Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspire USA LLC doing business as Aspire Software
Represented By: Lucas Evan Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?