Drifter Entertainment Inc v. Blockchain Game Partners Inc
Plaintiff: Drifter Entertainment Inc
Defendant: Blockchain Game Partners Inc a Wyoming corporation doing business as Gala Games
Case Number: 1:2023cv00187
Filed: October 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Hambrick
Referring Judge: Scott W Skavdahl
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2023 Filing 27 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by Blockchain Game Partners Inc. (Graham, John)
December 4, 2023 Filing 26 ANSWER to #17 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Drifter Entertainment Inc. (Cannon, Kim)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. Case reassigned to the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl for all further proceedings; Honorable Alan B Johnson no longer assigned to case due to a judicial conflict. (Court Staff, sjl)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. Case reassigned to the Honorable Alan B Johnson for all further proceedings; Honorable Stephanie A Hambrick no longer assigned to case as the presiding judge. (Court Staff, sjl)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #22 JOINT MOTION TO PROVISIONALLY SEAL EXHIBITS TO COMPLAINT by the US Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Hambrick (Court Staff, sjlw) Modified text on 11/28/2023 (Court Staff, sbh).
November 16, 2023 Filing 22 Joint MOTION for Order to Provisionally Seal Exhibits to Complaint filed by Plaintiff Drifter Entertainment Inc, Counter Defendant Drifter Entertainment Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cannon, Kim)
November 16, 2023 Filing 21 DEMAND for Trial by Jury filed by Plaintiff Drifter Entertainment Inc, Counter Defendant Drifter Entertainment Inc. (Cannon, Kim)
November 15, 2023 Filing 20 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Raphael Holoszyc-Pimentel on behalf of Blockchain Game Partners Inc Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-2342787. (Holoszyc-Pimentel, Raphael)
November 15, 2023 Filing 19 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Yonaton M Rosenzweig on behalf of Blockchain Game Partners Inc Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AWYDC-2342751. (Rosenzweig, Yonaton)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by the US Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Hambrick granting #15 , #16 MOTION for Yonaton and Raphael Holoszyc-Pimentel to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant Blockchain Game Partners Inc. (order emailed to PHV counsel). (Court Staff, stmo)
November 13, 2023 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Counter-Defendant Drifter Entertainment Inc by Blockchain Game Partners Inc. (Graham, John)
November 13, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Raphael Holoszyc-Pimentel to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendant Blockchain Game Partners Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Admission, #2 Proposed Order for Admission)(Graham, John)
November 13, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Yonaton Rosenzweig to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendant Blockchain Game Partners Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Admission, #2 Proposed Order for Admission)(Graham, John)
October 31, 2023 Filing 14 (TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the Honorable Stephanie A Hambrick. Defendant's unopposed request for an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is GRANTED. Defendant Blockchain Game Partners Inc's responsive pleading or answer due on or before 11/13/2023. (Court Staff, sjbo)
October 31, 2023 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Blockchain Game Partners Inc. (Graham, John)
October 31, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Walsh Graham on behalf of Blockchain Game Partners Inc (Graham, John)
October 16, 2023 Filing 11 Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Michael P. Hatley on behalf of Drifter Entertainment Inc (Hatley, Michael)
October 16, 2023 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Drifter Entertainment Inc. Blockchain Game Partners Inc served on 10/12/2023, answer due on 11/2/2023 (Cannon, Kim)
October 16, 2023 FINANCIAL ENTRY: PAYMENT OF $100 RECEIVED FOR PRO HAC VICE FEE FOR MICHAEL P HATLEY. RECEIPT 2-2188. (Court Staff, sjk)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by the US Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Hambrick granting #4 MOTION for Michael P. Hatley to appear pro hac vice; filed by Drifter Entertainment Inc. E-mail sent to pro hac vice attorney. (Court Staff, scat)
October 11, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Issued. (Court Staff, stbd)
October 11, 2023 Filing 7 Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge. The case has been assigned to the Honorable Stephanie A. Hambrick (Presiding Judge). (Court Staff, stbd)
October 10, 2023 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against Blockchain Game Partners, Inc. d/b/a Gala Games (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number BWYDC-2326632), filed by Drifter Entertainment, Inc.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Praecipe, #5 Summons) (Gustafson, Cole) (Attachment 3, 4 & 5; replaced with flattened PDF on 10/11/2023) (Court Staff, stbd). Modified on 10/11/2023 to edit Pay.gov receipt info (Court Staff, sjk).
October 10, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kim D Cannon on behalf of Drifter Entertainment, Inc. (Cannon, Kim)
October 10, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Michael P. Hatley to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Drifter Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Gustafson, Cole)
October 10, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cole L. Gustafson on behalf of Drifter Entertainment, Inc. (Gustafson, Cole)
October 10, 2023 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Drifter Entertainment, Inc.,. (Gustafson, Cole)
October 10, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE of complexity by Plaintiff Drifter Entertainment, Inc.; this case is non-complex. (Gustafson, Cole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drifter Entertainment Inc v. Blockchain Game Partners Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drifter Entertainment Inc
Represented By: Kim D Cannon
Represented By: Cole L. Gustafson
Represented By: Michael P. Hatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blockchain Game Partners Inc a Wyoming corporation doing business as Gala Games
Represented By: John Walsh Graham
Represented By: Raphael Holoszyc-Pimentel
Represented By: Yonaton M Rosenzweig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?