Cash v. United States of America
Petitioner: Nathan K Cash
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2024cv00085
Filed: April 22, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Hambrick
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by the US Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Hambrick granting #11 Motion for Order SETTING DEADLINE FOR REPLY TO GOVERNMENT'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO VACATE UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2255. Petitioner's Reply due 6/28/2024.(Court Staff, sjbo)
May 28, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE by Respondent United States of America regarding 12 Order - No Objection to Motion to File a Reply (Calmes, Ariel) Modified text and added link on 5/29/2024 (Court Staff, sjlg).
May 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by the US Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Hambrick. Government is to state if they intend to file an objection to the Motion #11 by Tuesday May 28, 2024 at 5:00 pm.(Court Staff, sjlw)
May 23, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Order ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR REPLY TO GOVERNMENTS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO VACATE UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2255 filed by Petitioner Nathan K Cash. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Francisco, Andrew)
May 23, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Francisco on behalf of Nathan K Cash (Francisco, Andrew)
May 23, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Francisco on behalf of Nathan K Cash (Francisco, Andrew) Stricken on 5/23/2024 per request of the Public Defender's office, incorrect format on doc filed. (Court Staff, sjlw).
May 20, 2024 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Nathan K Cash - #6 Order Requiring Service (Court Staff, semt)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by the US Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Hambrick granting #1 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Appointed Andrew Francisco for Nathan K Cash. Defendant served via USPS. (Court Staff, sjlw) Modified on 5/16/2024 to include service info (Court Staff, sjlw).
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Requiring Service by Clerk of Court and Requiring Response re #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) by the US Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Hambrick. The Clerk of Court shall serve a copy of Petitioner's motion on the Government. The Government shall file a response within 21 days after being served with Petitioner's motion. Petitioner may file a reply to Government's response within 14 days after being served with the response. Government served via CM/ECF, Petitioner served via US Mail. (Court Staff, scat)
May 8, 2024 Filing 5 Notice Vacating Motion Hearing and Initial Appearance on Revocation as to Nathan K Cash pending the outcome of the 2255 motion. (Court Staff, sjj)
May 8, 2024 Filing 4 RESPONSE to #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Respondent United States of America. (Kubichek, David)
May 8, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David A Kubichek on behalf of United States of America (Kubichek, David)
May 7, 2024 Filing 2 (TEXT-ONLY) NOTICE of Hearing on #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) VIA ZOOM - NOTE:1. This proceeding will be held via Zoom Video/Web Conferencing with all participants appearing remotely; the Zoom ID and Passcode will be provided separately to the participants email address of record.2. Participants should connect to the proceeding 15 minutes prior to its scheduled start time to allow for troubleshooting of any connectivity issues.3. To ensure the record is of the best quality, participants are encouraged to utilize a headset to reduce static and background noise. If not using a headset, participants must ensure the audio feed at their location is muted when not speaking.***REMINDER: Recording or broadcasting of this hearing is prohibited. *** Motion Hearing set for 5/8/2024 02:00 PM in Yellowstone Justice Center before US Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Hambrick. To be held in conjunction with L:23-po-00307. The Court will address Plaintiff's 2255 habeas petition #1 first and then will proceed to the Initial Appearance on Revocation in L:23-po-00307. (Court Staff, sjbo)
April 22, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) and MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Nathan K Cash (Court Staff, sbh). Added event and text on 4/23/2024 (Court Staff, sjlg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cash v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nathan K Cash
Represented By: Andrew Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Ariel Christine Calmes
Represented By: Timothy J Forwood
Represented By: David A Kubichek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?