Devon Energy Production Company LP v. Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director et al
Plaintiff: Devon Energy Production Company LP
Defendant: Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director
Respondent: United States Department of the Interior Secretary, Kevin Jack Haugrud, United States Department of the Interior, Gregory J Gould and Office of Natural Resources Revenue
Case Number: 2:2016cv00026
Filed: February 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Office: Cheyenne Office
County: U.S. (County Unknown)
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 104 JUDGMENT by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, sbh)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson vacating the Director's Decisions and Remanding in part for Further Fact Finding, denying as moot 86 Devon's Second Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record ( #96 in case 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ; (94) in case 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ; (73) in case 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ) Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, sbh)
July 29, 2019 Filing 102 MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Alan B Johnson: Oral Argument/In Court Hearing held on 7/29/2019. The matters are taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Monique Gentry.) Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, ssw)
June 5, 2019 Filing 101 NOTICE RESETTING Hearing: In Court Hearing reset for 7/29/2019 at 9:30 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 2116) before Honorable Alan B Johnson. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, ssw)
May 31, 2019 Filing 100 NOTICE of Hearing: In Court Hearing/Oral Argument on #77 Opening Brief set for 6/19/2019 at 1:30 PM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 2116) before Honorable Alan B Johnson. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, ssw) Modified on 5/31/2019 to correct hearing date (Court Staff, ssw).
April 25, 2019 Filing 99 REPLY to (86 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 86 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 86 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 86 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) Motion for Order, (88 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) Response to Motion, filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Leggette, Lyle) Modified on 4/25/2019 (Court Staff, ssw).
April 18, 2019 Filing 98 RESPONSE to (86 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 86 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 86 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 86 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) MOTION for Order to Supplement the Administrative Record filed by Respondents Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Vassallo, Nicholas)
April 4, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred: (86 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 86 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 86 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 86 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) MOTION for Order to Supplement the Administrative Record Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, szf)
April 4, 2019 Filing 97 REPLY to (77 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) Brief, (83 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) Brief, in Support of Opening Memorandum on the Merits filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. Oral Argument Requested. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Leggette, Lyle) Modified text on 4/5/2019 (Court Staff, sbh).
April 4, 2019 Filing 96 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Second MOTION for Order to Supplement the Administrative Record filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Court Staff, sjlg) Modified on 6/11/2019 (Court Staff, szf).
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #94 Motion for Extension of Time. Reply Brief due by 4/4/2019. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, sjgc) Modified text on 3/28/2019 (Court Staff, sbh).
March 27, 2019 Filing 94 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of time to file Reply in Response to Respondents' March 18, 2019 Corrected Answer Brief filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Leggette, Lyle)
March 18, 2019 Filing 93 Respondent's Corrected Answer BRIEF filed by Respondents Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Vassallo, Nicholas)
March 14, 2019 Filing 92 Respondents' Answer BRIEF filed by Respondents Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Vassallo, Nicholas)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting #90 Motion for Extension of Time in case 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ; granting (88) Motion for Extension of Time in case 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ; granting (80) Motion for Extension of Time in case 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ; granting (67) Motion for Extension of Time in case 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ. Respondents shall submit their responsive brief on or before March 14, 2019. The Petitioner shall submit its reply brief within 14 calendar days after Respondents' responsive brief is served. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, szf)
February 26, 2019 Filing 90 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Answer Brief Deadline filed by Respondents Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Vassallo, Nicholas)
February 21, 2019 Filing 89 STATUS REPORT by Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Vassallo, Nicholas)
January 28, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 02/09/18 before Judge Alan B. Johnson. To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Court Reporter Monique Gentry, phone (307) 274-4661 or email mkg.gentry@gmail.com. A party must file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction within 7 calendar days. If a party fails to request redaction, the unredacted transcript attached to this entry will be made available electronically without redaction. Notice of Intent to Redact due 2/4/2019. Notice of Redaction Request due 2/19/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/28/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/29/2019. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, smg)
December 6, 2018 Filing 87 Opening BRIEF filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Leggette, Lyle) Text Modified on 12/7/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting Petitioner's #75 Unopposed Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner shall file its opening brief on or before December 6, 2018. Respondents shall file their responsive brief within 45 calendar days after the date that Petitioner's opening brief is served. Petitioner shall file its reply brief within 14 calendar days after the date that Respondents' responsive brief is served. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ. (Court Staff, sjh)
November 13, 2018 Filing 85 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct (74 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) Order on Motion for Extension of Time filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Leggette, Lyle)Text Modified on 11/14/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting (73 in case 16-cv-161-ABJ) Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner shall file its opening brief on or before November 15, 2018. Respondents shall file their responsive brief within 30 days after Petitioner's opening brief is served. Petitioner shall file its reply brief within 14 days after Respondents' responsive brief is served. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Court Staff, sjh) Text Modified on 10/17/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
October 15, 2018 Filing 83 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Joint MOTION for Extension of time re Scheduling Order filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Leggette, Lyle)Text Modified on 10/16/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting (71) Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff Brief due 10/18/2018. Respondents shall file a responsive brief within 30 days after service of Plaintiff's Brief. Petitioner shall file its reply brief within 14 days after service of Respondents' responsive brief. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ. (Court Staff, sjh) Text Modified on 10/5/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
October 3, 2018 Filing 81 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Unopposed MOTION to extend Opening Brief by 14 days and amend Scheduling Order filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Leggette, Lyle) Text Modified on 10/3/2018 (Court Staff, ssw). Text modified on 10/3/2018 (Court Staff, sal).
September 4, 2018 Filing 80 NOTICE of Filing Administrative Record by Respondents Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary (Attachments: #1 Declaration) Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Vassallo, Nicholas) Two discs containing administrative record received in Clerk's Office on 9/4/2018. One disc forwarded to chambers. (Court Staff, ssw).
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting (78) Motion for Protective Order in case 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ; granting (76) Motion for Protective Order in case 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ; granting (68) Motion for Protective Order in case 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ; granting (55) Motion for Protective Order in case 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Court Staff, sms)
August 24, 2018 Filing 78 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Leggette, Lyle)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 SCHEDULING ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. The Parties shall file a motion for protective order regarding the corrected administrative record no later than August 24, 2018. Respondents shall lodge the corrected administrative record within 7 days after the Court resolves the to-be-filed protective order. Petitioner's Opening Brief is due 30 days after the lodging of the corrected administrative record. Respondents' Response Brief is due 30 days after service of Petitioner's Opening Brief. Petitioner's Reply Brief is due 14 days after service of Respondents' Response Brief.Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Court Staff, ssw)
July 2, 2018 Filing 76 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion regarding discovery held on 6/29/18 before Judge Alan B. Johnson. To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Court Reporter Monique Gentry, phone (307) 274-4661 or email mkg.gentry@gmail.com. A party must file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction within 7 calendar days. If a party fails to request redaction, the unredacted transcript attached to this entry will be made available electronically without redaction. Notice of Intent to Redact due 7/9/2018. Notice of Redaction Request due 7/23/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/2/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/1/2018. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, smg)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson denying Motion for leave to conduct limited discovery in case 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Court Staff, ssw) Modified on 7/3/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
June 29, 2018 Filing 74 MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Alan B Johnson: Motion Hearing held on 6/29/2018 re #55 Motion to conduct limited discovery. Written Order to enter. (Court Reporter Monique Gentry.) Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, ssw)
May 18, 2018 Filing 73 NOTICE of Hearing on (55 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 65 in 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 63 in 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 42 in 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ) MOTION for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery Motion Hearing set for 6/29/2018 09:30 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 2116) before Honorable Alan B Johnson. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, ssw) Text Modified on 5/23/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson in case 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ; granting (60) Motion for Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 6/29/2018 09:30 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 2116) before Honorable Alan B Johnson in case 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Court Staff, ssw) Text Modified on 5/23/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
May 11, 2018 Filing 71 RESPONSE to (60 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) REQUEST for Hearing re (57 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) Response to Motion, (56 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) Memorandum in Support of Motion, (55 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) MOTION for Leave to, (59 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) Reply, filed by Respondents Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Vassallo, Nicholas)
May 10, 2018 Motions No Longer Referred: REQUEST for Hearing (55 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) MOTION for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Leggette, Lyle) (Court Staff, szf) Modified on 5/11/2018 (Court Staff, sjlg).
May 10, 2018 Filing 70 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. REQUEST for Hearing (55 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) MOTION for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Leggette, Lyle) Modified on 5/11/2018 (Court Staff, szf). Modified links and texts on 5/11/2018 (Court Staff, sjlg).
May 8, 2018 Filing 69 REPLY to (57 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) Response to Motion, filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Leggette, Lyle) Modified on 5/8/2018 (Court Staff, sth).
May 4, 2018 Filing 68 NOTICE of Filing Corrected Administrative Record by Respondents Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary (Attachments: #1 Declaration) Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Vassallo, Nicholas) Text Modified on 5/4/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
May 1, 2018 Filing 67 RESPONSE to (55 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) MOTION for Leave to filed by Respondents Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Vassallo, Nicholas)
April 17, 2018 Motions No Longer Referred: (55 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) MOTION for Leave to Conduct Discovery Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, sjlg)
April 17, 2018 Filing 66 MEMORANDUM in Support of (55 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) Motion for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery, filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petitoner's Requests for Admission) Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Leggette, Lyle) Text Modified on 4/18/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
April 17, 2018 Filing 65 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Leggette, Lyle) Text Modified on 4/18/2018 (Court Staff, ssw). Modified on 5/9/2018 (Court Staff, szf).
March 30, 2018 Filing 64 NOTICE of Filing Administrative Record by Respondents Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary (Attachments: #1 Declaration) Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Vassallo, Nicholas) 2 Discs received in Clerk's Office. One disc forwarded to Chambers on 3/30/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
March 23, 2018 Filing 63 CORRECTED NOTICE re #62 Notice of Background Materials by Respondents Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5) Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Vassallo, Nicholas)Text Modified on 3/26/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
March 2, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE by Respondents Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary of Background Materials (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5) Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Vassallo, Nicholas)
February 22, 2018 Filing 61 SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. Administrative Record due by 3/30/18; Discovery Motions due by 4/17/18; Opening Brief due by 6/11/2018 (see exception in order).Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Court Staff, ssw)
February 16, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP of Background Materials Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Leggette, Lyle)
February 16, 2018 Filing 59 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Entering Joint Proposed Schedule) Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Leggette, Lyle)
February 9, 2018 Filing 58 MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Alan B Johnson: Status Conference held on 2/9/2018. (Court Reporter Monique Gentry.) Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, ssw)
February 8, 2018 Filing 57 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 2/9/2018 at 3:30 PM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 2116) before Honorable Alan B Johnson. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, ssw)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Re: #45 Joint Status Report and Request for Status Conference by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. Litigation proceedings in these consolidated cases are stayed until 2/2/18, so the parties may continue to discuss settlement. Status Conference set for 2/9/2018 at 2:30 PM in Judge Johnson Chambers (Room No. 2018) before Honorable Alan B Johnson.Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Court Staff, ssw)
December 4, 2017 Filing 55 Joint STATUS REPORT re (43 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive,, by Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Joint Status Report and Request for Status Conference) Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Leggette, Lyle)
December 4, 2017 Filing 54 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas Vassallo on behalf of Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary, United States Department of the Interior Secretary, United States Department of the Interior Secretary Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Vassallo, Nicholas)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson in case 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ; granting (42) Motion for Extension of Time in case 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ. Litigation proceedings in these consolidated cases are stayed until 12/4/17 so the parties may continue to discuss settlement. The parties shall file a joint status report and, if unsuccessful at settling the dispute, a proposed scheduling order no later than 12/4/17. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Court Staff, ssw)
November 20, 2017 Filing 52 Joint STATUS REPORT and MOTION for 14 day Extension of Stay by Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for 14-Day Extension of Stay) Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Leggette, Lyle) Modified on 11/21/2017 (Court Staff, sal). Text Modified on 11/21/2017 (Court Staff, ssw).
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson in case 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ; granting (40) Motion to Stay Case in case 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Court Staff, ssw)
August 22, 2017 Filing 50 Joint MOTION to stay case and Joint Status Report filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Leggette, Lyle)
June 20, 2017 Filing 49 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Devon Energy Production Company LP. United States Department of Interior served on 2/16/2017, answer due on 4/17/2017; United States Department of Interior Secretary served on 2/17/2017, answer due on 4/18/2017. Served through the Kevin "Jack" Haugrud AND U. S. Department of the Interior. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Leggette, Lyle)
June 15, 2017 Filing 48 DISREGARD as filed in Error ALIAS SUMMONS Returned Executed by Devon Energy Production Company LP re Petition for Review (29 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ), (28 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ), (30 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ), (27 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ). Office of Natural Resources Revenue served on 2/13/2017, answer due on 3/6/2017; Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director served on 2/13/2017, answer due on 3/6/2017; United States Department of Interior Secretary served on 2/13/2017, answer due on 3/6/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Leggette, Lyle) Modified on 6/19/2017 (Court Staff, ssw).
June 9, 2017 Filing 47 SECOND AMENDED PETITION FOR REVIEW OF FINAL AGENCY ACTION filed by Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Court Staff, sal) Text Modified on 6/12/2017 (Court Staff, ssw).
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson in case 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ; granting (36) Motion to Stay Case in case 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ. Parties to file a joint status report no later than 8/22/17. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Court Staff, ssw) Text Modified on 5/23/2017 (Court Staff, ssw).
May 22, 2017 Filing 45 Joint MOTION to stay case filed by Respondents Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director, United States Department of Interior Secretary, United States Department of Interior. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Klaassen, Mark) Modified text on 6/20/2017 (Court Staff, sjlg).
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #34 MOTION to Amend/Correct Petition for Review. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, sjg)
May 18, 2017 Filing 43 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Amend/Correct (28 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) Petition for Review, filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2015-04-20 - Appeal Dismissed, #2 Exhibit Second Amended Petition for Review, #3 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Amend Petition for Review)Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Leggette, Lyle) Text Modified on 5/19/2017 (Court Staff, ssw).
April 13, 2017 Filing 42 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark A Klaassen on behalf of United States Department of Interior Secretary, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary, United States Department of the Interior Secretary, United States Department of the Interior Secretary Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Klaassen, Mark)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson in case 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ; granting (31) Motion for Scheduling Order in case 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Court Staff, ssw)
April 6, 2017 Motions No Longer Referred: (31 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) Joint MOTION for Order Entry of Scheduling Order Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, ssw)
April 6, 2017 Filing 40 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Joint MOTION for Order Entry of Scheduling Order filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Leggette, Lyle) Modified on 4/7/2017 (Court Staff, ssw).
February 10, 2017 Filing 39 AMENDED PETITION FOR REVIEW of Final Agency Action for 2:16-CV-00274-ABJ, filed by Devon Energy Production Company LP. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, ssw)
February 10, 2017 Filing 38 AMENDED PETITION FOR REVIEW of Final Agency Action for 2:16-CV-00027-ABJ filed by Devon Energy Production Company LP. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, ssw)
February 10, 2017 Filing 37 AMENDED PETITION FOR REVIEW of Final Agency Action for 2:16-CV-00026-ABJ filed by Devon Energy Production Company LP. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, ssw)
February 10, 2017 Filing 36 AMENDED PETITION FOR REVIEW for 2:16-CV-00161-ABJ filed by Devon Energy Production Company LP. Two summonses issued. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, sjlg)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #32 MOTION to Amend/Correct Petition for Review. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ. (Court Staff, sjg)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson in case 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ; granting (24) Motion to Stay Case in case 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ. Parties to submit proposed scheduling order on or before 4/6/17.Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Court Staff, ssw)
February 2, 2017 Filing 33 Joint MOTION to stay case filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings)Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Leggette, Lyle)
February 2, 2017 Filing 32 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Amend/Correct (1 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) Petition for Review filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 16cv00274 Amended Petition for Review, #2 Exhibit B - 16cv00161 Amended Petition for Review, #3 Exhibit C - 16cv00027 Amended Petition for Review, #4 Exhibit D - 16cv00026 Amended Petition for Review, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Leggette, Lyle)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson granting (30) Motion to Consolidate Cases for Trial in case 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ; granting (29) Motion to Consolidate Cases for Trial in case 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ; granting (21) Motion to Consolidate Cases for Trial in case 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ. The Court designates 2:16-CV-00161-ABJ, as the lead case in the consolidation of these, to which all future filings shall be made. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-CV-00274-ABJ. (Court Staff, sjlg)
January 25, 2017 Filing 30 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Trial filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Director Decision 11-0007, #2 Exhibit B - Director Decision 12-0083, #3 Exhibit C - IBLA Order 8-17-16, #4 Exhibit D - IBLA Order 8-6-15, #5 Proposed Order Granting Motion)Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ(Leggette, Lyle)
December 23, 2016 Filing 29 NOTICE of Filing Administrative Record by Respondents Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director. 2 Discs received in Clerk's Office - One forwarded to Chambers. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ (Court Staff, ssw)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin GRANTING Petitioners Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record (16). Respondents shall complete the Administrative Record with all docket entries submitted to and issued during the administrative appeals process on or before December 30, 2016. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ(Court Staff, sjgc)
November 22, 2016 Filing 27 REPLY to (17 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) Response to Motion, (16 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) Motion for Leave to File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive),, the Administrative Record filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ (Leggette, Lyle)
November 15, 2016 Filing 26 RESPONSE to (16 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) #25 MOTION for Leave to File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive) filed by Respondents Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ (Klaassen, Mark) Modified on 11/17/2016 (Court Staff, ssw).
November 2, 2016 Filing 25 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Leave to File Reply/Brief/Supplement (Non-Dispositive) filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Extra-Record Evidence, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record)Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ(Leggette, Lyle) Modified on 11/3/2016 (Court Staff, sth). Received 1 cd at this time which will be placed in physical file in clerk's office.
October 19, 2016 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Matthew J Wheeler filed by Respondents Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ (Court Staff, ssw)
October 19, 2016 Filing 23 NOTICE of Filing Administrative Record by Respondents Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ (Court Staff, ssw) 2 discs received. 1 disc forwarded to chambers. Modified on 10/19/2016 (Court Staff, ssw).
July 29, 2016 Filing 22 Amended SCHEDULING ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson.Administrative record due on or before 10/19/16. Opening Brief due by 12/5/2016. Response Brief due by 1/6/2017. Reply Brief due by 1/20/2017.Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ(Court Staff, sth)
July 28, 2016 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Devon Energy Production Company LP. Office of Natural Resources Revenue served on 6/24/2016, answer due on 7/15/2016; Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director served on 6/24/2016, answer due on 7/15/2016 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ (Leggette, Lyle)
July 28, 2016 Motions No Longer Referred: (11 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) ( #20 in 16-CV-26-ABJ)( #19 in 16-CV-ABJ) extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Opening Brief Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ (Court Staff, sth) Modified on 7/28/2016 (Court Staff, sth). Modified on 7/28/2016 (Court Staff, sth). Modified on 7/28/2016 (Court Staff, sth).
July 27, 2016 Filing 20 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Opening Brief filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ(Leggette, Lyle)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. Opening Brief due by 8/2/2016. Response Brief due by 9/1/2016. Reply Brief due by 9/15/2016.Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ(Court Staff, sth)
July 25, 2016 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark A Klaassen on behalf of Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ (Klaassen, Mark)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson granting #16 Joint Motion to Consolidate Cases for Trial. It is ordered that Case Numbers 16-CV-26-ABJ, 16-CV-27-ABJ and 16-CV-161-ABJ are consolidated for trial. The Court designates 16-CV-161-ABJ as the lead case in the consolidation of these matters, to which all briefing deadlines shall be adhered to and to which all future filings shall be made. (Court Staff, sjlg)
July 19, 2016 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Trial filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ONRR Decision (2002-2004), #2 Exhibit B - ONRR Decision (2005-2007), #3 Exhibit C - Order Consolidating IBLA Cases, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Leggette, Lyle)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner's Brief is now due on or before 8/2/2016. (Court Staff, smp)
June 30, 2016 Filing 14 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Deadline to File Opening Brief filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order )(Leggette, Lyle) Modified on 7/1/2016 (Court Staff, sth).
May 19, 2016 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Administrative Record by Respondents Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director. One cd to physical file in Clerks Office and copy to chambers. (Attachments: #1 declaration) (Court Staff, sth)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin GRANTING #10 Motion for Protective Order. (Court Staff, smp)
May 19, 2016 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark A Klaassen on behalf of Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director (Klaassen, Mark)
May 18, 2016 Filing 10 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order filed by Respondents Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Klaassen, Mark)
May 4, 2016 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Devon Energy Production Company LP. Office of Natural Resources Revenue served on 2/23/2016, answer due on 3/15/2016; Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director served on 2/23/2016, answer due on 3/15/2016 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit A - Summons - Gould, #3 Exhibit B - Summons - Office of Natural Resources Revenue , #4 Exhibit C - Return Receipts, #5 Exhibit D - USPS Info) (Leggette, Lyle) Modified on 5/10/2016 (Court Staff, sth).
April 22, 2016 Filing 8 DISREGARD REFILED AS DOCUMENT 9 ---- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice, #2 Notice of Attorney Appearance, #7 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice, #1 Petition for Review, by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit A - Gould Summons, #3 Exhibit B - Office of Natural Resources Revenue Summon, #4 Exhibit C - Return Receipts, #5 Exhibit D - USPS Tracking) (Leggette, Lyle) Modified on 5/10/2016 (Court Staff, sth). Modified on 5/13/2016 (Court Staff, sth).
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting #4 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Alexander Karl Obrecht for Devon Energy Production Company LP (Court Staff, szf)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting #3 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Rosario C Doriott Dominguez for Devon Energy Production Company LP (Court Staff, szf) Text Modified on 2/12/2016 (Court Staff, sjlg).
February 10, 2016 Filing 5 PLEADING FILED IN WRONG CASE. ENTRY OF APPEARANCE TO BE FILED IN 16-CV-27.) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lyle Poe Leggette on behalf of Devon Energy Production Company LP (Court Staff, sjlg) Modified on 2/10/2016 (Court Staff, sjlg).
February 10, 2016 Filing 4 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Alexander K. Obrecht to appear pro hac vice; Check tendered; filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Court Staff, sjlg)
February 10, 2016 Filing 3 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Rosario C. Doriott Dominguez to appear pro hac vice; Check tendered; filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Court Staff, sjlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/10/2016: #1 Proposed Order) (Court Staff, sjlg).
February 10, 2016 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lyle Poe Leggette on behalf of Devon Energy Production Company LP (Court Staff, sjlg)
February 10, 2016 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW OF FINAL AGENCY ACTION ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY0023744.), filed by Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Two Summonses issued.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, sjlg) Text Modified on 2/10/2016 (Court Staff, sjlg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Devon Energy Production Company LP v. Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devon Energy Production Company LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Department of the Interior Secretary
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Represented By: Mark A Klaassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin Jack Haugrud
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Represented By: Mark A Klaassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Department of the Interior
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Represented By: Mark A Klaassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gregory J Gould
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Represented By: Mark A Klaassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Office of Natural Resources Revenue
Represented By: Nicholas Vassallo
Represented By: Mark A Klaassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?