Devon Energy Production Company LP v. Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director et al
Petitioner: Devon Energy Production Company LP
Respondent: Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director and Office of Natural Resources Revenue
Case Number: 2:2016cv00274
Filed: November 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Office: Cheyenne Office
County: U.S. (County Unknown)
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Presiding Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 81 JUDGMENT by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, sbh)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson vacating the Director's Decisions and Remanding in part for Further Fact Finding, denying as moot 86 Devon's Second Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record ((96) in case 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ; (94) in case 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ; #73 in case 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ) Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, sbh)
July 29, 2019 Filing 79 MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Alan B Johnson: Oral Argument/In Court Hearing held on 7/29/2019. The matters are taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Monique Gentry.) Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, ssw)
June 5, 2019 Filing 78 NOTICE RESETTING Hearing: In Court Hearing reset for 7/29/2019 at 9:30 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 2116) before Honorable Alan B Johnson. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, ssw)
May 31, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE of Hearing: In Court Hearing/Oral Argument on #77 Opening Brief set for 6/19/2019 at 1:30 PM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 2116) before Honorable Alan B Johnson. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, ssw) Modified on 5/31/2019 to correct hearing date (Court Staff, ssw).
April 25, 2019 Filing 76 REPLY to (86 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 86 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 86 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 86 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) Motion for Order, (88 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) Response to Motion, filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Leggette, Lyle) Modified on 4/25/2019 (Court Staff, ssw).
April 18, 2019 Filing 75 RESPONSE to (86 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 86 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 86 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 86 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) MOTION for Order to Supplement the Administrative Record filed by Respondents Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Vassallo, Nicholas)
April 4, 2019 Motions No Longer Referred: (86 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 86 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 86 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 86 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) MOTION for Order to Supplement the Administrative Record Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, szf)
April 4, 2019 Filing 74 REPLY to (77 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) Brief, (83 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) Brief, in Support of Opening Memorandum on the Merits filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. Oral Argument Requested. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Leggette, Lyle) Modified text on 4/5/2019 (Court Staff, sbh).
April 4, 2019 Filing 73 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Second MOTION for Order to Supplement the Administrative Record filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Court Staff, sjlg) Modified on 6/11/2019 (Court Staff, szf).
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #71 Motion for Extension of Time. Reply Brief due by 4/4/2019. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, sjgc) Modified text on 3/28/2019 (Court Staff, sbh).
March 27, 2019 Filing 71 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of time to file Reply in Response to Respondents' March 18, 2019 Corrected Answer Brief filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Leggette, Lyle)
March 18, 2019 Filing 70 Respondent's Corrected Answer BRIEF filed by Respondents Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Vassallo, Nicholas)
March 14, 2019 Filing 69 Respondents' Answer BRIEF filed by Respondents Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Vassallo, Nicholas)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin granting (90) Motion for Extension of Time in case 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ; granting (88) Motion for Extension of Time in case 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ; granting (80) Motion for Extension of Time in case 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ; granting #67 Motion for Extension of Time in case 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ. Respondents shall submit their responsive brief on or before March 14, 2019. The Petitioner shall submit its reply brief within 14 calendar days after Respondents' responsive brief is served. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, szf)
February 26, 2019 Filing 67 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive) requesting extension of Answer Brief Deadline filed by Respondents Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Vassallo, Nicholas)
February 21, 2019 Filing 66 STATUS REPORT by Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Vassallo, Nicholas)
January 28, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 02/09/18 before Judge Alan B. Johnson. To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Court Reporter Monique Gentry, phone (307) 274-4661 or email mkg.gentry@gmail.com. A party must file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction within 7 calendar days. If a party fails to request redaction, the unredacted transcript attached to this entry will be made available electronically without redaction. Notice of Intent to Redact due 2/4/2019. Notice of Redaction Request due 2/19/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/28/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/29/2019. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, smg)
December 6, 2018 Filing 64 Opening BRIEF filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Leggette, Lyle) Text Modified on 12/7/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting Petitioner's #75 Unopposed Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner shall file its opening brief on or before December 6, 2018. Respondents shall file their responsive brief within 45 calendar days after the date that Petitioner's opening brief is served. Petitioner shall file its reply brief within 14 calendar days after the date that Respondents' responsive brief is served. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ. (Court Staff, sjh)
November 13, 2018 Filing 62 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct (74 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) Order on Motion for Extension of Time filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Leggette, Lyle)Text Modified on 11/14/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting (73 in case 16-cv-161-ABJ) Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner shall file its opening brief on or before November 15, 2018. Respondents shall file their responsive brief within 30 days after Petitioner's opening brief is served. Petitioner shall file its reply brief within 14 days after Respondents' responsive brief is served. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Court Staff, sjh) Text Modified on 10/17/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
October 15, 2018 Filing 60 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Joint MOTION for Extension of time re Scheduling Order filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Leggette, Lyle)Text Modified on 10/16/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting (71) Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff Brief due 10/18/2018. Respondents shall file a responsive brief within 30 days after service of Plaintiff's Brief. Petitioner shall file its reply brief within 14 days after service of Respondents' responsive brief. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ. (Court Staff, sjh) Text Modified on 10/5/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
October 3, 2018 Filing 58 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Unopposed MOTION to extend Opening Brief by 14 days and amend Scheduling Order filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Leggette, Lyle) Text Modified on 10/3/2018 (Court Staff, ssw). Text modified on 10/3/2018 (Court Staff, sal).
September 4, 2018 Filing 57 NOTICE of Filing Administrative Record by Respondents Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary (Attachments: #1 Declaration) Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Vassallo, Nicholas) Two discs containing administrative record received in Clerk's Office on 9/4/2018. One disc forwarded to chambers. (Court Staff, ssw).
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting (78) Motion for Protective Order in case 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ; granting (76) Motion for Protective Order in case 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ; granting (68) Motion for Protective Order in case 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ; granting (55) Motion for Protective Order in case 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Court Staff, sms)
August 24, 2018 Filing 55 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Leggette, Lyle)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 SCHEDULING ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. The Parties shall file a motion for protective order regarding the corrected administrative record no later than August 24, 2018. Respondents shall lodge the corrected administrative record within 7 days after the Court resolves the to-be-filed protective order. Petitioner's Opening Brief is due 30 days after the lodging of the corrected administrative record. Respondents' Response Brief is due 30 days after service of Petitioner's Opening Brief. Petitioner's Reply Brief is due 14 days after service of Respondents' Response Brief.Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Court Staff, ssw)
July 2, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion regarding discovery held on 6/29/18 before Judge Alan B. Johnson. To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Court Reporter Monique Gentry, phone (307) 274-4661 or email mkg.gentry@gmail.com. A party must file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction within 7 calendar days. If a party fails to request redaction, the unredacted transcript attached to this entry will be made available electronically without redaction. Notice of Intent to Redact due 7/9/2018. Notice of Redaction Request due 7/23/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/2/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/1/2018. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, smg)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson denying Motion for leave to conduct limited discovery in case 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Court Staff, ssw) Modified on 7/3/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
June 29, 2018 Filing 51 MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Alan B Johnson: Motion Hearing held on 6/29/2018 re #55 Motion to conduct limited discovery. Written Order to enter. (Court Reporter Monique Gentry.) Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, ssw)
May 18, 2018 Filing 50 NOTICE of Hearing on (55 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 65 in 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 63 in 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 42 in 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ) MOTION for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery Motion Hearing set for 6/29/2018 09:30 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 2116) before Honorable Alan B Johnson. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, ssw) Text Modified on 5/23/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson in case 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ; granting (60) Motion for Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 6/29/2018 09:30 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 2116) before Honorable Alan B Johnson in case 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Court Staff, ssw) Text Modified on 5/23/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
May 11, 2018 Filing 48 RESPONSE to (60 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) REQUEST for Hearing re (57 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) Response to Motion, (56 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) Memorandum in Support of Motion, (55 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) MOTION for Leave to, (59 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) Reply, filed by Respondents Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Vassallo, Nicholas)
May 10, 2018 Motions No Longer Referred: REQUEST for Hearing (55 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) MOTION for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Leggette, Lyle) (Court Staff, szf) Modified on 5/11/2018 (Court Staff, sjlg).
May 10, 2018 Filing 47 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. REQUEST for Hearing (55 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) MOTION for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Leggette, Lyle) Modified on 5/11/2018 (Court Staff, szf). Modified links and texts on 5/11/2018 (Court Staff, sjlg).
May 8, 2018 Filing 46 REPLY to (57 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) Response to Motion, filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Leggette, Lyle) Modified on 5/8/2018 (Court Staff, sth).
May 4, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE of Filing Corrected Administrative Record by Respondents Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary (Attachments: #1 Declaration) Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Vassallo, Nicholas) Text Modified on 5/4/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
May 1, 2018 Filing 44 RESPONSE to (55 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) MOTION for Leave to filed by Respondents Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Vassallo, Nicholas)
April 17, 2018 Motions No Longer Referred: (55 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) MOTION for Leave to Conduct Discovery Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, sjlg)
April 17, 2018 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM in Support of (55 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) Motion for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery, filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petitoner's Requests for Admission) Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Leggette, Lyle) Text Modified on 4/18/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
April 17, 2018 Filing 42 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Leggette, Lyle) Text Modified on 4/18/2018 (Court Staff, ssw). Modified on 5/9/2018 (Court Staff, szf).
March 30, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE of Filing Administrative Record by Respondents Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary (Attachments: #1 Declaration) Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Vassallo, Nicholas) 2 Discs received in Clerk's Office. One disc forwarded to Chambers on 3/30/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
March 23, 2018 Filing 40 CORRECTED NOTICE re #39 Notice of Background Materials by Respondents Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5) Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Vassallo, Nicholas) Text Modified on 3/26/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
March 2, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE by Respondents Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary of Background Materials (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5) Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Vassallo, Nicholas)
February 22, 2018 Filing 38 SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. Administrative Record due by 3/30/18; Discovery Motions due by 4/17/18; Opening Brief due by 6/11/2018 (see exception in order).Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Court Staff, ssw)
February 16, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP of Background Materials Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Leggette, Lyle)
February 16, 2018 Filing 36 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Entering Joint Proposed Schedule) Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Leggette, Lyle)
February 9, 2018 Filing 35 MINUTES for proceedings held before Honorable Alan B Johnson: Status Conference held on 2/9/2018. (Court Reporter Monique Gentry.) Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, ssw)
February 8, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 2/9/2018 at 3:30 PM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 2 (Room No. 2116) before Honorable Alan B Johnson. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, ssw)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Re: #45 Joint Status Report and Request for Status Conference by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. Litigation proceedings in these consolidated cases are stayed until 2/2/18, so the parties may continue to discuss settlement. Status Conference set for 2/9/2018 at 2:30 PM in Judge Johnson Chambers (Room No. 2018) before Honorable Alan B Johnson.Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Court Staff, ssw)
December 4, 2017 Filing 32 Joint STATUS REPORT re (43 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive,, by Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Joint Status Report and Request for Status Conference) Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Leggette, Lyle)
December 4, 2017 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas Vassallo on behalf of Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director, United States Department of Interior, United States Department of Interior Secretary, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary, United States Department of the Interior Secretary, United States Department of the Interior Secretary Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Vassallo, Nicholas)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson in case 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ; granting (42) Motion for Extension of Time in case 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ. Litigation proceedings in these consolidated cases are stayed until 12/4/17 so the parties may continue to discuss settlement. The parties shall file a joint status report and, if unsuccessful at settling the dispute, a proposed scheduling order no later than 12/4/17. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Court Staff, ssw)
November 20, 2017 Filing 29 Joint STATUS REPORT and MOTION for 14 day Extension of Stay by Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for 14-Day Extension of Stay) Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Leggette, Lyle) Modified on 11/21/2017 (Court Staff, sal). Text Modified on 11/21/2017 (Court Staff, ssw).
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson in case 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ; granting (40) Motion to Stay Case in case 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Court Staff, ssw)
August 22, 2017 Filing 27 Joint MOTION to stay case and Joint Status Report filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Leggette, Lyle)
June 20, 2017 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Devon Energy Production Company LP. United States Department of Interior served on 2/16/2017, answer due on 4/17/2017; United States Department of Interior Secretary served on 2/17/2017, answer due on 4/18/2017. Served through the Kevin "Jack" Haugrud AND U. S. Department of the Interior. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Leggette, Lyle)
June 15, 2017 Filing 25 DISREGARD as filed in Error ALIAS SUMMONS Returned Executed by Devon Energy Production Company LP re Petition for Review (29 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ), (28 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ), (30 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ), (27 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ). Office of Natural Resources Revenue served on 2/13/2017, answer due on 3/6/2017; Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director served on 2/13/2017, answer due on 3/6/2017; United States Department of Interior Secretary served on 2/13/2017, answer due on 3/6/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Leggette, Lyle) Modified on 6/19/2017 (Court Staff, ssw).
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson in case 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ; granting (36) Motion to Stay Case in case 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ. Parties to file a joint status report no later than 8/22/17. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Court Staff, ssw) Text Modified on 5/23/2017 (Court Staff, ssw).
May 22, 2017 Filing 23 Joint MOTION to stay case filed by Respondents Office of Natural Resources Revenue, Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director, United States Department of Interior Secretary, United States Department of Interior. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Klaassen, Mark) Modified text on 6/20/2017 (Court Staff, sjlg).
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #34 MOTION to Amend/Correct Petition for Review. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, sjg)
May 18, 2017 Filing 21 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Amend/Correct (28 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) Petition for Review, filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2015-04-20 - Appeal Dismissed, #2 Exhibit Second Amended Petition for Review, #3 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Amend Petition for Review)Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Leggette, Lyle) Text Modified on 5/19/2017 (Court Staff, ssw).
April 13, 2017 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark A Klaassen on behalf of United States Department of Interior Secretary, United States Department of the Interior, United States Department of the Interior Secretary, United States Department of the Interior Secretary, United States Department of the Interior Secretary Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Klaassen, Mark)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson in case 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ; granting (31) Motion for Scheduling Order in case 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Court Staff, ssw)
April 6, 2017 Motions No Longer Referred: (31 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) Joint MOTION for Order Entry of Scheduling Order Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, ssw)
April 6, 2017 Filing 18 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Joint MOTION for Order Entry of Scheduling Order filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Leggette, Lyle) Modified on 4/7/2017 (Court Staff, ssw).
February 13, 2017 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Alexander K Obrecht pro hac vice fee paid. $100. Receipt CHY026085. (Court Staff, sjk)
February 10, 2017 Filing 17 AMENDED PETITION FOR REVIEW of Final Agency Action for 2:16-CV-00274-ABJ, filed by Devon Energy Production Company LP. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, ssw)
February 10, 2017 Filing 16 AMENDED PETITION FOR REVIEW of Final Agency Action for 2:16-CV-00027-ABJ filed by Devon Energy Production Company LP. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, ssw)
February 10, 2017 Filing 15 AMENDED PETITION FOR REVIEW of Final Agency Action for 2:16-CV-00026-ABJ filed by Devon Energy Production Company LP. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, ssw)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #12 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting Alexander Karl Obrecht for Devon Energy Production Company LP (Court Staff, ssw)
February 10, 2017 Filing 13 AMENDED PETITION FOR REVIEW for 2:16-CV-00161-ABJ filed by Devon Energy Production Company LP. Two summonses issued. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ (Court Staff, sjlg)
February 9, 2017 Filing 12 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Alexander K. Obrecht to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Alexander K. Obrecht, #2 Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Leggette, Lyle)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #32 MOTION to Amend/Correct Petition for Review. Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ. (Court Staff, sjg)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson in case 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ; granting (24) Motion to Stay Case in case 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ. Parties to submit proposed scheduling order on or before 4/6/17.Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Court Staff, ssw)
February 2, 2017 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to stay case filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings)Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Leggette, Lyle)
February 2, 2017 Filing 8 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Amend/Correct (1 in 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ) Petition for Review filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 16cv00274 Amended Petition for Review, #2 Exhibit B - 16cv00161 Amended Petition for Review, #3 Exhibit C - 16cv00027 Amended Petition for Review, #4 Exhibit D - 16cv00026 Amended Petition for Review, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:16-cv-00161-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00026-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00027-ABJ, 2:16-cv-00274-ABJ(Leggette, Lyle)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson granting #6 Joint Motion to Consolidate Cases for Trial. The Court designates Case Number 2:16-CV-161-ABJ as the lead case in the consolidation of these matters, to which all future filings shall be made. (Court Staff, sjlg)
January 25, 2017 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Trial filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Director Decision 11-0007, #2 Exhibit B - Director Decision 12-0083, #3 Exhibit C - IBLA Order 8-17-16, #4 Exhibit D - IBLA Order 8-6-15, #5 Proposed Order Granting Motion)(Leggette, Lyle) Modified on 1/25/2017 (Court Staff, sth).
December 9, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Office of Natural Resources Revenue answer due 1/20/2017; Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director answerdue 1/20/2017 (Court Staff, ssw)
December 5, 2016 Reset Deadlines: Answer due 12/12/16 (Court Staff, ssw)
November 22, 2016 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Devon Energy Production Company LP. Office of Natural Resources Revenue and Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director served on 11/21/2016, answer due on 1/20/2016 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A - Summons, #3 Exhibit B - Summons, #4 Exhibit C - Certified Receipts, #5 Exhibit D - USPS Tracking) (Leggette, Lyle) Text Modified on 12/5/2016 (Court Staff, ssw). Modified on 12/9/2016 (Court Staff, ssw).
November 3, 2016 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Rosario C Doriott Dominquez pro hac vice fee paid. $100. Receipt Number CHY025446. (Court Staff, sjk)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice admitting Rosario C. Doriott Dominguez for Devon Energy Production Company LP by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin(Court Staff, szf)
November 3, 2016 Filing 3 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Rosario C. Doriott Dominguez to appear pro hac vice; Check tendered (receipt CHY25446) filed by Petitioner Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Court Staff, sjc)
November 3, 2016 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lyle Poe Leggette on behalf of Devon Energy Production Company LP. (Court Staff, sjc)
November 3, 2016 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REVIEW ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY25446.) filed by Devon Energy Production Company LP. Two summonses issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, sjc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Devon Energy Production Company LP v. Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Devon Energy Production Company LP
Represented By: Rosario C Doriott Dominguez
Represented By: Lyle Poe Leggette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Office of Natural Resources Revenue Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Office of Natural Resources Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?