Rajab v. National Oilwell Varco LP

Plaintiff: Japher Y Rajab
Defendant: National Oilwell Varco LP
Case Number: 2:2018cv00130
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Office: Cheyenne Office
County: U.S. (County Unknown)
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference RESET for 10/22/2018 03:00 PM in Judge Freudenthal Chambers (Room No. 2242) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. (Court Staff, sal) (Main Document 7 replaced on 10/4/2018) (Court Staff, sal).
September 26, 2018 Filing 6 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by National Oilwell Varco LP. (Reid, Steven)
September 25, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference RESET for 10/4/2018 10:30 AM in Judge Freudenthal Chambers (Room No. 2242) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. (Court Staff, sal) (Main Document 5 replaced on 9/25/2018) (Court Staff, sal).
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 10/3/2018 09:00 AM in Judge Freudenthal Chambers (Room No. 2242) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. (Court Staff, sal)
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by National Oilwell Varco LP,. (Reid, Steven)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, by National Oilwell Varco LP. (Reid, Steven)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ("Defendant National Oilwell Varco L.P.'s Notice of Removal to U.S. District Court") (no summons issued) (Filing fee ($400) paid - receipt #CHY029311) filed by National Oilwell Varco LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Magistrate Consent) (Court Staff, sal) Modified on 8/10/2018 (Court Staff, sal).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rajab v. National Oilwell Varco LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Japher Y Rajab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Oilwell Varco LP
Represented By: Steven Richard Reid
Represented By: David L Zwisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?