Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association et al v. Woods et al

Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association and GMACM Home Equity Loan Trust 2006-HE1
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service, Edna M Woods, James O Woods, III and Edna M Woods Trust Dated May 12, 2004
Case Number: 2:2018cv00145
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Internal Revenue Service. (Martin, C)
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses filed in State Court on 8/31/18 by Edna M Woods, James O Woods, III, Edna M Woods Trust Dated May 12, 2004. (Court Staff, ssw)
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 STATE COURT DOCKET SHEET. (Court Staff, ssw)
September 17, 2018 Filing 4 TRANSMITTAL of State Court Record. (Court Staff, ssw)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON REMOVAL regarding #1 Notice of Removal filed by Internal Revenue Service by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. (Certified Copy mailed to First Judicial District Court - Laramie County) (Court Staff, ssw)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT, filed by GMACM Home Equity Loan Trust 2006-HE1, Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association in Laramie County District Court, for the First Judicial District on July 26, 2018. (Court Staff, szf)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from DC1JD - LARAMIE, 190-204., filed by Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Consent to Proceed Before USMJ) (Court Staff, szf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association et al v. Woods et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: C Levi Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edna M Woods
Represented By: Travis W Koch
Represented By: L Cooper Overstreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James O Woods, III
Represented By: Travis W Koch
Represented By: L Cooper Overstreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edna M Woods Trust Dated May 12, 2004
Represented By: Travis W Koch
Represented By: L Cooper Overstreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company National Association
Represented By: Brian J Porter
Represented By: Benjamin James Mann
Represented By: Stephen B Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GMACM Home Equity Loan Trust 2006-HE1
Represented By: Brian J Porter
Represented By: Benjamin James Mann
Represented By: Stephen B Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?