Oliver v. Octagroup Technologies LLC
Plaintiff: Anthony Oliver
Defendant: Octagroup Technologies LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00148
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Filing 11 Plaintiff's Request for Judicicial Notice in support of #10 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Anthony Oliver. (Court Staff, sal)
November 1, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Anthony Oliver. (Attachments: #1 cover letter and envelope)(Court Staff, sal) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/9/2018: #2 Proposed Order) (Court Staff, sal).
October 12, 2018 Filing 9 CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT filed against Defendant, Octogroup Technologies, LLC by the Clerk of Court, Stephan Harris. (Court Staff, sal)
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Octagroup Technologies LLC filed by Plaintiff Anthony Oliver. (Court Staff, scat)
October 5, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anthony Oliver. Octagroup Technologies LLC served on 9/20/2018, answer due on 10/11/2018 (Court Staff, sal)
September 21, 2018 Filing 6 Pro Se Electronic Notification Registration Form by Anthony Oliver (Court Staff, sal)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued. (Court Staff, sal)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff on this date via U.S. mail. (Court Staff, sal)
September 12, 2018 Filing 3 "Plaintiff's Certification of interested entities or persons" by Plaintiff Anthony Oliver (Court Staff, sal)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff Anthony Oliver. (Court Staff, sal)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for damages and injunctive relief (no summons(es) issued) with Jury Demand (Filing fee ($400) NOT paid) filed by Anthony Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 proposed Summons, #3 cover letter and envelope) (Court Staff, sal) Modified on 9/12/2018 (Court Staff, sal).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oliver v. Octagroup Technologies LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Octagroup Technologies LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?