Tewary v. Sinclair Oil Corporation
Plaintiff: Rajiv Tewary
Defendant: Sinclair Oil Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv00152
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, by Sinclair Oil Corporation. (Ensign, C)
November 9, 2018 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $200 received for pro hac vice fees for C. Seth Ensign and David C Castleberry. Receipt CHY029823. (Court Staff, sjk)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting C. Seth Ensign for Sinclair Oil Corporation by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin (Copy of order mailed to pro se plaintiff on this date) (Court Staff, sbh)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to appear pro hac vice admitting David C. Castleberry for Sinclair Oil Corporation by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin (Copy of order mailed to pro se plaintiff on this date) (Court Staff, sbh) Modified text on 11/7/2018 (Court Staff, sbh).
November 7, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for C. Seth Ensign to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendant Sinclair Oil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Esch, Amanda)
November 7, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for David C. Castleberry to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendant Sinclair Oil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Esch, Amanda)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Honorable Alan B Johnson recused. Case reassigned to Honorable Kelly H Rankin for all further proceedings by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. (Copy of order and consent form mailed to plaintiff) (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Court Staff, ssw)
November 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda F Esch on behalf of Sinclair Oil Corporation (Esch, Amanda)
October 30, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rajiv Tewary. Sinclair Oil Corporation served on 10/25/2018, answer due on 11/15/2018 (Court Staff, ssw)
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiff Rajiv Tewary, 1 issued. (Court Staff, ssw)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (1 summons issued) with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY029531.), filed by Rajiv Tewary. (Issued Summons and Consent form mailed to Plaintiff) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent) (Court Staff, ssw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2018: #3 Envelope) (Court Staff, ssw). (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/20/2018) (Court Staff, ssw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tewary v. Sinclair Oil Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sinclair Oil Corporation
Represented By: C Seth Ensign
Represented By: David C Castleberry
Represented By: Amanda F Esch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rajiv Tewary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?