Noggle et al v. Basin Electric Power Cooperative

Plaintiff: John Shields, Tim L Walker, Gordon Noggle and Anthony Curtis Montoya
Defendant: Basin Electric Power Cooperative
Case Number: 2:2018cv00169
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Anthony Curtis Montoya, Gordon Noggle, John Shields, Tim L Walker (Sixth) of Filing Fair Labor Standards Act Consent to Sue Form (Attachments: #1 Fair Labor Standards Act Consent Form- Brad Teter) (Turner, Andrew) Text Modified on 12/6/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
December 6, 2018 Filing 16 Fifth NOTICE by Plaintiffs Anthony Curtis Montoya, Gordon Noggle, John Shields, Tim L Walker of Filing Fair Labor Standards Act Consent to Sue Form (Attachments: #1 Fair Labor Standards Act Consent Form-Henry Martin Kennedy) (Turner, Andrew) Text Modified on 12/6/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
November 30, 2018 Filing 15 Third NOTICE by Plaintiffs Anthony Curtis Montoya, Gordon Noggle, John Shields, Tim L Walker of Filing FLSA Consent to Sue Form (Attachments: #1 Fair Labor Standards Act Consent Form- Candy Steinhausen) (Turner, Andrew) Text Modified on 12/3/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
November 30, 2018 Filing 14 Second NOTICE by Plaintiffs Anthony Curtis Montoya, Gordon Noggle, John Shields, Tim L Walker of Filing Fair Labor Standards Act Consent to Sue Form (Attachments: #1 FLSA Consent Form) (Turner, Andrew) Text Modified on 11/30/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
November 30, 2018 Filing 13 Notice of Withdrawal of Fair Labor Standards Act Consent to Sue Form filed by Anthony Curtis Montoya, Gordon Noggle, John Shields, Tim L Walker. (Turner, Andrew) Text Modified on 11/30/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
October 31, 2018 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Basin Electric Power Cooperative,. (Gilmer, Zane)
October 31, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by Basin Electric Power Cooperative. (Gilmer, Zane)
October 19, 2018 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $200 received for pro hac vice fees for Amy B Conway and Matthew C Tews. Receipt CHY029724. (Court Staff, sjk)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #8 & #9 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice admitting Amy B. Conway and Matthew C. Tews for Basin Electric Power Cooperative by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin(Court Staff, szf)
October 17, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Matthew C. Tews to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendant Basin Electric Power Cooperative. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gilmer, Zane)
October 17, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Amy B. Conway to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Defendant Basin Electric Power Cooperative. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gilmer, Zane)
October 16, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zane Allen Gilmer on behalf of Basin Electric Power Cooperative (Gilmer, Zane)
October 15, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Hess Turner on behalf of Anthony Curtis Montoya, Gordon Noggle, John Shields, Tim L Walker (Court Staff, ssw)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 First NOTICE by Plaintiffs Anthony Curtis Montoya, Gordon Noggle, John Shields, Tim L Walker of filing FSLA Consent to Sue (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (Jubin, Thomas) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/12/2018) (Court Staff, ssw).
October 9, 2018 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $100 received for pro hac vice fee for Andrew Hess Turner. Receipt CHY029654. (Court Staff, sjk)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice admitting Andrew Hess Turner for Plaintiffs by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin.(Court Staff, szf)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Andrew H. Turner to appear pro hac vice; Check tendered; filed by Plaintiffs Anthony Curtis Montoya, Gordon Noggle, John Shields, Tim L Walker. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Court Staff, ssw)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas B Jubin on behalf of Anthony Curtis Montoya, Gordon Noggle, John Shields, Tim L Walker (Court Staff, ssw)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT for Unpaid Wages (1 summons issued) ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY029694.), filed by Gordon Noggle, Anthony Curtis Montoya, Tim L Walker, John Shields. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, ssw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noggle et al v. Basin Electric Power Cooperative
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Basin Electric Power Cooperative
Represented By: Zane Allen Gilmer
Represented By: Amy B Conway
Represented By: Matthew C Tews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Shields
Represented By: Andrew Hess Turner
Represented By: Thomas B Jubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim L Walker
Represented By: Andrew Hess Turner
Represented By: Thomas B Jubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon Noggle
Represented By: Andrew Hess Turner
Represented By: Thomas B Jubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Curtis Montoya
Represented By: Andrew Hess Turner
Represented By: Thomas B Jubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?