United States of America v. Gilbane Federal et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Gilbane Federal and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Case Number: 2:2018cv00181
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D. Freudenthal granting #5 Motion to Stay filed by United States of America. This matter is stayed until 3/29/19.(Court Staff, sal)
November 29, 2018 #5 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Jon Stewart on this date. Dismissal pleading due by 3/29/19. (Court Staff, sal) Modified on 11/30/2018 (Court Staff, sal).
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Settlement and Motion to Stay by Plaintiff United States of America. Dismissal pleading due by 3/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stewart, Jon)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Gilbane Federal served on 11/9/2018, answer due on 11/30/2018; Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America served on 11/9/2018, answer due on 11/30/2018 (Court Staff, sth)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 Praecipe for summons filed by Plaintiff United States of America, 1 issued. (Court Staff, sth)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 Praecipe for summons filed by Plaintiff United States of America, 1 issued. (Court Staff, sth)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (no summonses issued) ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY029779.), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, ssw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Gilbane Federal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilbane Federal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jon Mark Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?