Cunningham v. Air Voice Inc et al

Plaintiff: Craig Cunningham
Defendant: Dheer Gulati, Air Voice Inc, Marcos Taveras, Mukesh Mahajan, Vivek Babbar and TSS Consulting Group LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00182
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
0 Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
1 Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default and Request for Telephonic Hearing filed by Plaintiff Craig Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Court Staff, sal)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONSES Returned Executed by Craig Cunningham as to Air Voice Inc and TSS Consulting Group LLC. Air Voice Inc served on 11/14/2018, answer due on 12/5/2018. TSS Consulting Group LLC served on 11/20/2018, answer due on 12/11/2018. (Court Staff, sbh)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (five summonses issued) ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY029790.), filed by Craig Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (Issued summonses returned to plaintiff via US Mail on this date.) (Court Staff, sjlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham v. Air Voice Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dheer Gulati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Voice Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcos Taveras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mukesh Mahajan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivek Babbar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TSS Consulting Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?