Cunningham v. ASI LLC et al

Plaintiff: Craig Cunningham
Defendant: ASI LLC, Donald Cross, AVG Financial, Gina Bennett, Brixum Beneficial, Michael Ashberry and Robert Weiss
Case Number: 2:2018cv00183
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, and Failure to State a Claim filed by Plaintiff Craig Cunningham. (Court Staff, sal)
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONSES Returned Executed by Craig Cunningham as to Gina Bennett and Brixum Beneficial. Gina Bennett served on 11/18/2018, answer due on 12/10/2018. Brixum Beneficial served on 11/18/2018, answer due on 12/10/2018. (Court Staff, sbh)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, and Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendants Gina Bennett, Brixum Beneficial. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Hacker, Gregory)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory P Hacker on behalf of Gina Bennett, Brixum Beneficial (Hacker, Gregory)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE - Summons received on this date. Not issued nor returned to sender. (Court Staff, sal)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (seven summonses issued) ( Filing fee $400 receipt #Chy029789), filed by Craig Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (Issued summonses returned to plaintiff via US Mail on this date.) (Court Staff, sjlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham v. ASI LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASI LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVG Financial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Bennett
Represented By: Gregory P Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brixum Beneficial
Represented By: Gregory P Hacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Ashberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?