Sletten Construction of Wyoming Inc v. Capitol Indemnity Corporation

Plaintiff: Sletten Construction of Wyoming Inc
Defendant: Capitol Indemnity Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv00186
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT REPORT OF MEETING AND PROPOSED JOINT DISCOVERY AND CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/1/2019 at 09:30 AM in Judge Johnson Chambers (Room No. 2018) before Honorable Alan B Johnson. (Court Staff, sbh)
December 10, 2018 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY MOTIONS AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS, INCLUDING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ANALOGOUS MOTIONS TO DISMISS IN CIVIL CASES by the Honorable Alan B Johnson (Court Staff, sbh)
November 21, 2018 Filing 10 STATE COURT ANSWER filed on 11/8/18, to Complaint by Capitol Indemnity Corporation. (Court Staff, ssw) (Main Document 10 replaced on 11/30/2018) (Court Staff, ssw).
November 20, 2018 Filing 9 STATE COURT SUMMONS Returned Executed filed on 10/29/18, by Sletten Construction of Wyoming Inc. Capitol Indemnity Corporation served on 10/11/2018, answer due on 11/1/2018. (Court Staff, ssw)
November 20, 2018 Filing 8 STATE COURT DOCKET SHEET. (Court Staff, ssw)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 TRANSMITTAL of State Court Record by Defendant Capitol Indemnity Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M) (Bestol, Kay) Text Modified on 11/21/2018 (Court Staff, ssw). (Attachment 11 replaced on 11/30/2018) (Court Staff, ssw).
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ON REMOVAL regarding #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Capitol Indemnity Corporation by the Honorable Alan B Johnson.(Court Staff, ssw)Copy of order mailed to Albany County District Court on 11/19/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
November 9, 2018 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury filed by Defendant Capitol Indemnity Corporation. (Bestol, Kay)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by Capitol Indemnity Corporation. (Bestol, Kay)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kay Lynn Bestol on behalf of Capitol Indemnity Corporation (Court Staff, szf)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT, filed by Sletten Construction of Wyoming Inc. in Albany County District Court for the Second Judicial District on September 7, 2018. (Court Staff, szf)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Second Judicial District Court - Albany County, 34646. (Filing fee $ 400), filed by Capitol Indemnity Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Court Staff, szf) Text Modified on 11/9/2018 (Court Staff, ssw). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/9/2018: #3 Consent to Proceed Before USMJ) (Court Staff, szf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sletten Construction of Wyoming Inc v. Capitol Indemnity Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sletten Construction of Wyoming Inc
Represented By: JoAnna S DeWald
Represented By: Beau Bryan Bump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capitol Indemnity Corporation
Represented By: Kay Lynn Bestol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?