Woodie et al v. Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Kim Woodie, Big Bear Towing & Repair LLC and Paul Woodie
Defendant: National Indemnity Company and Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv00188
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/5/2019 11:00 AM in Judge Freudenthal Chambers (Room No. 2242) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. (Court Staff, sal)
December 7, 2018 Filing 14 STATE COURT DOCKET SHEET for Teton County District Court (Court Staff, szf)
December 7, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing State Court Records and Proceedings pursuant to #9 Notice on Removal by Defendants Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company, National Indemnity Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Coppede, John) Modified text on 12/7/2018 (Court Staff, szf).
December 4, 2018 Filing 12 REPLY BRIEF re #10 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Defendant National Indemnity Company. (Coppede, John)
November 30, 2018 Filing 11 Amended ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company. (Coppede, John)
November 27, 2018 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Paul Woodie. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Fix, William)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ON REMOVAL regarding #1 Notice of Removal, filed by National Indemnity Company, Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Certified copy of Order mailed to Teton County District Court on this date via U.S. mail.(Court Staff, sal)
November 26, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by Defendants Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company, National Indemnity Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Certificate of Filing in State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Coppede, John)
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury filed by Plaintiff Paul Woodie. (Fix, William) Security modified on 11/26/2018 (Court Staff, sal).
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by National Indemnity Company, identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for National Indemnity Company.. (Coppede, John)
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company, identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company.. (Coppede, John)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 BRIEF in Support of #3 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant National Indemnity Company. (Court Staff, ssw) Filer corrected on 11/14/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant , National Indemnity Company. (Court Staff, ssw) Filer corrected on 11/14/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed on 9/28/18, filed by Paul Woodie, Kim Woodie, Big Bear Towing & Repair LLC. (Court Staff, ssw)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ninth Judicial District - Teton County, 17841. (Filing fee $ 400), filed by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company, National Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Order) (Court Staff, ssw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodie et al v. Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Indemnity Company
Represented By: John A Coppede
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company
Represented By: John A Coppede
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Woodie
Represented By: William R Fix
Represented By: Jessica Elisa Simons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Big Bear Towing & Repair LLC
Represented By: William R Fix
Represented By: Jessica Elisa Simons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Woodie
Represented By: William R Fix
Represented By: Jessica Elisa Simons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?