Weed v. Western World Insurance Group Inc

Plaintiff: Brandon Weed
Defendant: Western World Insurance Group Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv00194
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Western World Insurance Group Inc, identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc. for Western World Insurance Group Inc.. (Day, Stuart)
January 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of complexity by Defendant Western World Insurance Group Inc ; this case is non-complex. (Day, Stuart)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT REPORT OF MEETING AND PROPOSED JOINT DISCOVERY AND CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE by the Honorable Alan B. Johnson. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/1/2019 at 9:30 AM in Judge Johnson Chambers (Room No. 2018) before Honorable Alan B. Johnson. (Court Staff, sbh)
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY MOTIONS AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS, INCLUDING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ANALOGOUS MOTIONS TO DISMISS IN CIVIL CASESby the Honorable Alan B. Johnson (Court Staff, sbh)
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, by Western World Insurance Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Day, Stuart)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Western World Insurance Group, Inc.'s deadline to file its response to the Plaintiffs Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Money Damages is hereby extend to January 4, 2019. (Court Staff, sjgc) Text Modified on 12/26/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Money Damages filed by Defendant Western World Insurance Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Day, Stuart) Text Modified on 12/26/2018 (Court Staff, ssw).
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brandon Weed. Western World Insurance Group Inc served on 11/26/2018, answer due on 12/17/2018 (Vincent, John)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stuart R Day on behalf of Western World Insurance Group Inc (Day, Stuart)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiff Brandon Weed, 1 issued. (Court Staff, ssw)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and Money Damages filed by Brandon Weed (1 summons issued; Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY029874) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Cover Letter, #7 Mailing Envelope, #8 Consent Form) (Court Staff, sbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weed v. Western World Insurance Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Weed
Represented By: Aaron Joseph Vincent
Represented By: John R Vincent
Represented By: Janet E Millard
Represented By: Ann Elizabeth Davey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western World Insurance Group Inc
Represented By: Stuart R Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?