Dearing et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Plaintiff: Edward Robinson Dearing and Molly Hartman Dearing
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv00205
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Alan B Johnson
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Filing 9 STATE COURT DOCKET SHEET. (Court Staff, sth)
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 Transmittal of State Court Records. (Tiedeken, Julie) Modified on 12/10/2018 (Court Staff, sth). Modified on 12/11/2018 (Court Staff, sth).
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT REPORT OF MEETING AND PROPOSED JOINT DISCOVERY AND CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/7/2019 at 09:30 AM in Judge Johnson Chambers (Room No. 2018) before Honorable Alan B Johnson. (Court Staff, sbh)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY MOTIONS AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS, INCLUDING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ANALOGOUS MOTIONS TO DISMISS IN CIVIL CASESby the Honorable Alan B Johnson (Court Staff, sbh)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 DISREGARD TO BE REFILED ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Tiedeken, Julie) Modified on 12/10/2018 (Court Staff, sth).
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Tiedeken, Julie)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON REMOVAL regarding #1 Notice of Removal by the Honorable Alan B Johnson. (Certified Copy of order sent to the Ninth Judicial District, Teton County, Wyoming via US Mail.)(Court Staff, sjlg)
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Molly Hartman Dearing, Edward Robinson Dearing in the Ninth Judicial District on October 15, 2018. (Court Staff, sjlg)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ninth Judicial District Teton County, 17844. (Filing fee $ 400), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Magistrate Consent Form) (Court Staff, sjlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dearing et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Robinson Dearing
Represented By: Robert Leonard Stepans
Represented By: Ryan R Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molly Hartman Dearing
Represented By: Robert Leonard Stepans
Represented By: Ryan R Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Julie Nye Tiedeken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?