Plumbers and Pipefitters UA Local 192 et al v. Don Haught Inc

Plaintiff: Pipe Industry Health and Welfare Fund of Colorado, Pipe Trades Pension of Montana, International Training Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund and Plumbers and Pipefitters UA Local 192
Defendant: Don Haught Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv00215
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Wyoming
Presiding Judge: Nancy D Freudenthal
Referring Judge: Kelly H Rankin
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2019 Filing 13 Mail Returned as Undeliverable to Don Haught Inc re #12 Clerk's Entry of Default. (Court Staff, ssw)
May 17, 2019 Filing 12 CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT filed against Don Haught Inc by the Clerk of Court, Stephan Harris. (Copy mailed to defendant via certified mail and regular mail) (Court Staff, ssw) (Main Document 12 replaced on 5/17/2019) (Court Staff, ssw).
May 15, 2019 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT by International Training Fund, Pipe Industry Health and Welfare Fund of Colorado, Pipe Trades Pension of Montana, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters UA Local 192. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Evans, David)
May 15, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Entry of Default against Don Haught Inc. filed by Plaintiffs International Training Fund, Pipe Industry Health and Welfare Fund of Colorado, Pipe Trades Pension of Montana, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters UA Local 192. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Evans, David)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REQUIRING STATUS REPORT by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Status Report due by 5/17/2019.(Court Staff, sal)
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plumbers and Pipefitters UA Local 192, Pipe Industry Health and Welfare Fund of Colorado, International Training Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Pipe Trades Pension of Montana. Don Haught Inc served on 3/20/2019, answer due on 4/10/2019 (Evans, David)
March 15, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs International Training Fund, Pipe Industry Health and Welfare Fund of Colorado, Pipe Trades Pension of Montana, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters UA Local 192 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Evans, David)
March 15, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Plumbers and Pipefitters UA Local 192, Pipe Industry Health and Welfare Fund of Colorado, International Training Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Pipe Trades Pension of Montana as to All Plaintiffs. (Evans, David)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 Praecipe for Summons filed by Plaintiffs International Training Fund, Pipe Industry Health and Welfare Fund of Colorado, Pipe Trades Pension of Montana, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters UA Local 192, 1 issued. (Court Staff, sal)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of complexity by Plaintiffs International Training Fund, Pipe Industry Health and Welfare Fund of Colorado, Pipe Trades Pension of Montana, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters UA Local 192 ; this case is non-complex. (Court Staff, sal)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Autumn Alexandria Aspen on behalf of International Training Fund, Pipe Industry Health and Welfare Fund of Colorado, Pipe Trades Pension of Montana, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters UA Local 192 (Court Staff, sal)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David F Evans on behalf of International Training Fund, Pipe Industry Health and Welfare Fund of Colorado, Pipe Trades Pension of Montana, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters UA Local 192 (Court Staff, sal)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (summons issued) (Filing fee ($400) paid - receipt #CHY030035) filed by Plumbers and Pipefitters UA Local 192, Pipe Industry Health and Welfare Fund of Colorado, International Training Fund, Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Pipe Trades Pension of Montana. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Magistrate Consent) (Court Staff, sal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wyoming District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plumbers and Pipefitters UA Local 192 et al v. Don Haught Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Haught Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pipe Industry Health and Welfare Fund of Colorado
Represented By: Autumn Alexandria Aspen
Represented By: David F Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pipe Trades Pension of Montana
Represented By: Autumn Alexandria Aspen
Represented By: David F Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Training Fund
Represented By: Autumn Alexandria Aspen
Represented By: David F Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund
Represented By: Autumn Alexandria Aspen
Represented By: David F Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers and Pipefitters UA Local 192
Represented By: Autumn Alexandria Aspen
Represented By: David F Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?